Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-32770

Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:24-ap-03152
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Richard Anthony Patti
1507 Branard St.
Houston, TX 77006
Represented By
Richard Anthony Patti
contact info
Plaintiff
Celia Munisteri, Successor Independent Executor of the Estate of Theresa Grasso Munisteri, Deceased
Represented By
Cameron A. Secord
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:11 PM CDT
Monday, May 12, 2025
137 137 misc AO435 Transcript Request Mon 05/12 12:22 PM
AO 435 TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM (Expedited (7 days)) by Cameron Secord. This is to order a transcript of Show Cause Hearing 4.29.25 before Judge Eduardo Rodriguez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Judicial Transcribers of Texas (Filed By Celia Munisteri, Successor Independent Executor of the Estate of Theresa Grasso Munisteri, Deceased ). (Secord, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
136 136 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 132 Order Setting Hearing
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
135 135 motion Generic Motion Wed 05/07 11:50 AM
Motion to (I) Entorce the Settlement Order, and (II) for the Court to Set a Hearing for Defendant to Show Cause Why He Should Not Be Held In Contempt and Sanctioned Filed by Plaintiff Celia Munisteri, Successor Independent Executor of the Estate of Theresa Grasso Munisteri, Deceased (Secord, Cameron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Att: 10 Proposed Order
134 134 misc Certificate Wed 05/07 10:11 AM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Celia Munisteri, Successor Independent Executor of the Estate of Theresa Grasso Munisteri, Deceased ) Related [+] (Secord, Cameron)
Related: [-] 132 Order Setting Hearing
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
133 133 answer Response Tue 05/06 11:58 PM
First Response Related [+]. Filed by Richard Anthony Patti (Patti, Richard)
Related: [-] 116 Motion to Dismiss/Withdraw Document
Att: 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiff's Motion
132 132 order Setting Hearing Tue 05/06 3:54 PM
Amended Order Setting Hybrid Hearing Signed on 5/6/2025 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 01:30 PM at Houston, Courtroom 8B. (njc7)
Related: [-] 116 Motion to Dismiss/Withdraw Document,127 Order Setting in Person Hearing
Monday, May 05, 2025
131 131 audio MP3 Mon 05/05 4:00 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 4/29/2025 2:33:45 PM ]. File Size [ 48849 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:41:46 ]. (Show Cause Hearing - Doc.81 ). (admin)
Related: [-]