Rhode Island District Court
Judge:Melissa R Dubose
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00300
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2025 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
John Dell'Oro
Represented By
Kirby L. Aarsheim
Farrell Smith O'Connell Aarsheim Aprans LLP
contact info
Michael W. McMahon
Daigle Fisse & Kessenich, PLC
contact info
Ethan M. Garner
Daigle Fisse & Kessenich, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Alicia Chadwick
Represented By
Eric B. DiMario
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Eric DiMario
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas Chadwick
Represented By
Eric DiMario
Kiernan, Plunkett & Redihan
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 01/14 3:53 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter is hereby transferred to the calendar of District Judge Melissa R. DuBose for all further proceedings. Senior District Judge William E. Smith no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Senior District Judge William E. Smith on 1/14/2025.(Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order (form attached) Tue 10/22 10:03 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2024; Joinder of Parties due by 12/23/2024; Factual Discovery to close by 6/2/2025; Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosures shall be made by 7/21/2025; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 8/18/2025; Expert Discovery to close by 9/29/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 10/21/2025; and Pretrial Memorandum due by 10/21/2025 or 30 days after a decision on any dispositive motion. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 10/22/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
10 10 misc Rule 16 Statement Thu 10/17 4:36 PM
RULE 16 STATEMENT Proposed Joint Scheduling Statement by John Dell'Oro. (Aarsheim, Kirby)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
order Order Fri 10/04 4:38 PM
TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to file a joint proposed scheduling order for review by October 18, 2024. If the parties cannot agree on a schedule, they should reach out the judge's case manager, Nisshy Urizandi, to request a conference. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 10/4/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/25 8:41 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by John Dell'Oro.(Aarsheim, Kirby)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/25 8:40 AM
MOTION for ETHAN M. GARNER to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-2046637 ) filed by John Dell'Oro. (Aarsheim, Kirby)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/25 8:38 AM
MOTION for MICHAEL W. MCMAHON to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-2046630 ) filed by John Dell'Oro. (Aarsheim, Kirby)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/25 9:32 AM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Michael W. McMahon. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/25/2024. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/25 9:38 AM
TEXT ORDER granting8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ethan M. Garner. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/25/2024. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 08/30 2:42 PM
TEXT ORDER entering6 Stipulation filed by John Dell'Oro. John Dell'Oro answer due 9/27/2024. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 8/30/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Wed 08/28 9:27 AM
Joint STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER filed by John Dell'Oro. (Aarsheim, Kirby)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/28 9:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kirby L. Aarsheim on behalf of John Dell'Oro (Aarsheim, Kirby)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/19 2:03 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas Chadwick, Alicia Chadwick. John Dell'Oro served on 8/16/2024, answer due 9/6/2024. (DiMario, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 08/01 4:59 PM
Summons Issued as to John Dell'Oro. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Thu 08/01 4:58 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Thu 08/01 3:51 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-2026312 ), filed by thomas chadwick, Alicia Chadwick.(DiMario, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/01 4:57 PM
Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]