Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey L Cureton
Referred: Jeffrey L Cureton
Case #: 4:24-cv-00728
Nature of Suit230 Real Property - Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause28:1345 Property Ejectment
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2025 3:09 AM CST
Counter Claimant
Woodbridge Apartments
Represented By
James Nguyen
Hoover Slovacek
contact info
Counter Defendant
Cristina Hache
Counter Defendant
Trosky Hache
Defendant
Woodbridge Apartments
Represented By
James Nguyen
Hoover Slovacek
contact info
Plaintiff
Cristina Hache
PO Box 87372
Vancouver, WA 98687
Plaintiff
Trosky Hache
PO Box 87372
Vancouver, WA 98687
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
FDC Management Inc.
Terminated: 11/04/2024
Represented By
Adam B Reed
Adam B Reed & Associates
contact info
James Nguyen
Hoover Slovacek
contact info
Defendant
Woodbridge Properties
Terminated: 11/18/2024
Represented By
Chung Him Jeffrey Leung
Hoover Slovacek
contact info
Adam B Reed
Adam B Reed & Associates
contact info
James Nguyen
Hoover Slovacek
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
48 48 1 pgs order Order Unfiling Pleading Thu 05/01 2:29 PM
Order Unfiling47 due to the following deficiency: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d)(1)(A), discovery requests "must not be filed [with the Court] until they are used in the proceeding or the court orders filing." (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 5/1/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
47 47 respm Response/Objection Wed 04/30 5:09 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by FDC Management Inc. re:45 Scheduling Order,, (Edmunds, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
46 46 4 pgs order Order For ADR Wed 01/29 3:39 PM
ORDER FOR REFERRAL OF MEDIATION: The parties are to select or designate a mediator. The parties are to complete mediation during the month of August.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. Deadline for parties to designate a mediator is on or before 6/2/2025. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 1/29/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
45 45 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/29 3:35 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/12/2025. Motions due by 9/26/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 7/18/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2026 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 508, 501 W. 10th St., Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2025. Bench Trial set for 3/2/2026 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 508, 501 W. 10th St., Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 1/29/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
44 44 order Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge/Order Reassigning Case Wed 01/29 12:11 PM
ORDER: The Parties have indicated in their43 Joint Status Report that they consent to a trial before a United States Magistrate Judge. It is therefore ORDERED that the above-captioned case is hereby reassigned to United States Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton for all further proceedings and the entry of judgment. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/29/2025) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
43 43 discov Joint Submission on Discovery Matters Thu 01/23 11:26 PM
First Joint Submission on Discovery Matters and Status Report by Trosky Hache. (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
42 42 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 01/10 11:24 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Woodbridge Apartments. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Nguyen, James)
Related: [-]
41 41 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Counterclaim Fri 01/10 11:22 AM
Defendant's Original ANSWER to36 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Woodbridge Apartments. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice., First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Woodbridge ApartmentsAttorney James Nguyen added to party (Nguyen, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
40 40 8 pgs order Order Mon 12/30 11:36 AM
ORDER TO SUBMIT JOINT STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN: The parties are ordered to electronically file with the clerk of the court the signed Joint Status Report within 28 days of the date of the filing of this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 12/30/2024) (mmw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 25, 2024
39 39 service Waiver of Service Returned Wed 12/25 4:41 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Woodbridge Apartments. Waiver sent on 11/22/2024. (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
38 38 service Summons Issued Wed 11/20 1:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Woodbridge Apartments. (wxc)
Related: [-]
37 37 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Wed 11/20 1:30 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Trosky Hache. (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
36 36 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/18 11:05 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR RELIEF OF BREACH OF CONTRACT, BREACH OF THE IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY AND REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION against Woodbridge Properties filed by Trosky Hache. (One or more defendant(s) is no longer named.) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A1 - Lease,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A2 - Email re. mold,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A3 - Mold Lab Report,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) A4 - Mold Pictures,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) A5 - VA Medical Bill,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) A6 - Woodbridge Bill
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
35 35 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Wed 11/06 3:13 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT BUT REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT THAT DOES NOT NAME FDC MANAGEMENT INC. AS A DEFENDANT AND CONTAINS NO CLAIMS AGAINST FDC MANAGEMENT INC.30 : it is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint [doc.30 ] is GRANTED in that Plaintiff will be allowed to file a Second Amended Complaint that properly names Defendant Woodbridge Properties as Woodbridge Apartments and otherwise complies with the requirements set forth in this order. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs, no later than November 20, 2024, shall file such Second Amended Complaint. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 11/6/2024) (wxc)
Related: [-]
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/06 1:39 PM
NOTICE of Compliance with Second Order Requiring Compliance with Local Rules filed by Woodbridge Properties (Nguyen, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) JVN Completed Application,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Confirmation of Application Fee Payment
Monday, November 04, 2024
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Findings and Recommendations on Case Mon 11/04 3:20 PM
ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re28 : the law of the case does not preclude the granting of FDC's Motion to Dismiss. Therefore, the Court OVERRULES Plaintiffs' Objection (ECF No.32 ). For the reasons stated in the Magistrate Judge's FCR, the Court finds that Plaintiffs' claims against FDC Management should be dismissed. Consequently, The Court ADOPTS the reasoning in the Magistrate Judge's FCR and ORDERS that Plaintiffs' claims against FDC Management be DISMISSED with prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 11/4/2024) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 03, 2024
32 32 respm Response/Objection Sun 11/03 7:24 PM
OBJECTION filed by Trosky Hache re:28 Findings and Recommendations on Motion re:17 Motion to Dismiss filed by FDC Management Inc.. (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
31 31 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Thu 10/31 11:55 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Trosky Hache re30 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Initial Filing Memorandum (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Amend/Correct Thu 10/31 11:53 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct Plaintiffs' Initial Filing filed by Trosky Hache (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amendment Proposed Plaintiffs' second Amended Initial Complaint
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
29 29 order Order on Motion to Quash Wed 10/30 1:41 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting23 NonParty Woodbridge Apartments' Motion to Strike Summons Improperly Issued for the reasons stated therein. In their response to the motion, Plaintiffs, acknowledging that they have improperly named Defendant Woodbridge Apartments as Woodbridge Properties in the Amended Complaint request leave to file an Amended Complaint" in order to change Defendant Woodbridge's name from "Woodbridge Properties" to "Woodbridge Apartments." Plaintiffs, if they desire such relief, should file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint that complies with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure as well as the Local Rules for the Northern District of Texas. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/30/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
28 28 motion Findings and Recommendations Wed 10/23 3:22 PM
FINDINGS, CONCLUSIONS, AND RECOMMENDATION REGARDING DEFENDANT FDC MANAGEMENT INC.'S SECOND RULE 12(b)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re:17 : For the reasons set out above, the Court RECOMMENDS that Defendant FDC Management's Second Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [doc.17 ] be GRANTED and that all claims against Defendant FDC Management be DISMISSED for the reasons stated herein. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/23/2024) (wxc)
Related: [-]
27 27 2 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Wed 10/23 12:53 PM
SECOND ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES: it is ORDERED that, no later than November 6, 2024, Nguyen either complete the process to obtain admission to the NDTX, seek permission to proceed pro hac vice in this case, or file a motion to withdraw in this case. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/23/2024) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Mon 10/21 10:33 AM
NOTICE of Compliance with Order Requiring Compliance with Local Rules filed by FDC Management Inc. (Nguyen, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - JVN Application for Admission,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 - E-mail Confirming Receipt of Application
Friday, October 18, 2024
25 25 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 10/18 3:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam B Reed on behalf of FDC Management Inc., Woodbridge Properties. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) Related [+]
Related: [-] ed, Adam
Monday, October 14, 2024
24 24 respm Response/Objection Mon 10/14 2:28 AM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Trosky Hache re:23 First MOTION to Quash Summons Improperly Issued (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amendment Proposed Plaintiffs' Amended Initial Complaint
Friday, October 11, 2024
23 23 motion Quash Fri 10/11 12:00 PM
First MOTION to Quash Summons Improperly Issued filed by Woodbridge Apartments. Attorney James Nguyen added to party Woodbridge Apartments (Nguyen, James) Docket text modified on 10/11/2024 (twd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Order
Thursday, October 10, 2024
22 22 service Summons Returned Thu 10/10 12:55 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Woodbridge Properties ; served on 10/1/2024. (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit(s) Affidavit of Service for Defendant Woodbridge
Monday, October 07, 2024
21 21 2 pgs order Order Mon 10/07 1:31 PM
ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH LOCAL RULES: Nguyen is ORDERED to comply with various local civil rules of the Northern District of Texas (NDTX) no later than October 21, 2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 10/7/2024) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
20 20 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Wed 09/18 10:33 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to17 Motion to Dismiss by Defendant FDC Management Inc.. (Nguyen, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
19 19 respm Response/Objection Tue 09/17 8:22 PM
OBJECTION filed by Cristina Hache, Trosky Hache re:17 Second MOTION to Dismiss (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Exhibit A - Page of Lease Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Exhibit B - Lease Mold Addendum
Monday, September 16, 2024
18 18 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 09/16 5:22 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cristina Hache. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Dismiss Mon 09/16 12:06 PM
Second MOTION to Dismiss filed by FDC Management Inc. (Nguyen, James)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 14, 2024
16 16 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Sat 09/14 4:31 AM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Trosky Hache. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet for Amended Initial Filling
Thursday, September 12, 2024
15 15 service Summons Issued Thu 09/12 12:13 PM
Summons Issued as to Woodbridge Properties. (wxc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 09/10 8:39 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot10 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss based on the Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff on 9/10/2024. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 9/10/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/10 3:09 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR RELIEF OF BREACH OF CONTRACT, BREACH OF THE IMPLIED WARRANTY OF HABITABILITY AND REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION against All Defendants filed by Cristina Hache, Trosky Hache. Clerk to issue summonses for new federal and non-federal defendants. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Exhibit A1 Lease,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Exhibit A2 Emails,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Exhibit A3 Lab report,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Exhibit A4 Mold,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Exhibit A5 Medical Bill,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Exhibit A6 FDC Bill of charges
Monday, September 09, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order Setting Deadline/Hearing Mon 09/09 12:10 PM
ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT: it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall, no later than September 23, 2024, file an amended complaint that complies with the requirements set forth in this order. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey L. Cureton on 9/9/2024) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
11 11 respm Response/Objection Thu 09/05 6:29 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Trosky Hache re:10 MOTION to Dismiss (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Plaintiffs' Exhibit B
10 10 motion Dismiss Thu 09/05 1:45 PM
MOTION to Dismiss (Rule 12(b)(6)) for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant FDC Management Inc. (Nguyen, James) Modified motion event and docket text per MJ chambers on 9/5/2024 (bdb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - Lease,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 09/04 12:09 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by FDC Management Inc. (Nguyen, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 - Lease,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/03 10:34 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,, filed by FDC Management Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney James Nguyen added to party FDC Management Inc.(pty:dft) (Nguyen, James)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 18, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Sun 08/18 4:58 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to FDC Management Inc. ; served on 8/12/2024. (Hache, Trosky)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration(s) Constable's Affidavit
Thursday, August 01, 2024
6 6 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Thu 08/01 4:55 PM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (sre)
Related: [-]
5 5 qcref Pittman Thu 08/01 4:53 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set (see Special Order 3). Magistrate No magistrate judge assigned preliminarily assigned. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 08/01 4:48 PM
Summons Issued as to FDC Management Inc. (sre)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Thu 08/01 4:47 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Cristina Hache, Trosky Hache. (sre)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 08/01 4:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Cristina Hache, Trosky Hache. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (sre)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/01 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against FDC Management Inc. filed by Cristina Hache, Trosky Hache. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number 400003415) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (sre)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Thu 08/01 4:55 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:5,6. Thu Aug 1 16:55:43 CDT 2024 (crt)
Related: [-]