Colorado District Court
Judge:Charlotte N Sweeney
Case #: 1:24-cv-02140
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025
Case in other court:Adams County District Court, 2024 CV 031022
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2025 1:19 AM MST
Defendant
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
Hillary D. Patterson
Patterson Ripplinger PC
contact info
N. Rae Marusin
Patterson Ripplinger PC
contact info
Timothy Michael Murphy
Ogborn Mihm LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Alanna Everett
Represented By
Shannon Kay VanMatre
Matlin Injury Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
24 24 order Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 03/18 11:23 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to23 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice, this case is dismissed with prejudice; each party to bear their own fees and costs. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 3/18/25. Text Only Entry (jdyne, )
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Stipulation of Dismissal of Case Tue 03/18 10:53 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Patterson, Hillary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
22 22 order Minute Order Tue 10/22 1:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER: A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 12/4/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom A 702 before Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney. The parties' Proposed Final Pretrial Order is due by 11/26/2025. In addition to filing, the parties are directed to email the proposed order in editable format to Sweeney_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 10/22/2024. Text Only Entry (cnsja, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
21 21 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/16 2:53 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2025. Discovery due by 6/27/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 8/1/2025. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on October 15, 2024. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
20 20 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 10/16 2:52 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: Scheduling Conference held on 10/15/2024. FTR: Courtroom A401. (rvill, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
19 19 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 10/02 10:30 AM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Marusin, N. Rae)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
18 18 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/01 6:59 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters . Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 10/1/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
17 17 misc Letter Reassigning Case Mon 09/30 2:43 PM
CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to16 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge, all parties do not consent. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-02410-CNS. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Mon 09/30 1:50 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Marusin, N. Rae)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 08/29 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of N. Rae Marusin by N. Rae Marusin on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney N. Rae Marusin added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Marusin, N. Rae)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 08/22 2:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER Timothy M. Murphy's Motion to Withdraw (ECF No.13 ) is GRANTED. Timothy M. Murphy shall be permitted to withdraw as counsel for Defendant. The Clerk is directed to remove Timothy M. Murphy from electronic notification in this case. PLEASE READ ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/22/2024.(norlin, )
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Withdraw as Attorney Thu 08/22 10:23 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Murphy, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/08 10:31 PM
ANSWER to9 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Patterson, Hillary)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Mon 08/05 10:45 AM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shannon Kay VanMatre on behalf of Alanna EverettAttorney Shannon Kay VanMatre added to party Alanna Everett(pty:pla) (VanMatre, Shannon)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
10 10 4 pgs order Order Fri 08/02 2:34 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM On or before October 1, 2024, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #8 ), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on:October 15, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937# . If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should confer with opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 8/2/2024. (norlin, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
9 9 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 1:38 PM
COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Alanna Everett.(ykare, )
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 08/02 1:36 PM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (ykare, )
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 08/02 1:34 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (ykare, )
Related: [-]
6 6 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Fri 08/02 1:32 PM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Cover Sheet, Summons, Complaint upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 7/11/2024, filed by Plaintiff Alanna Everett (ykare, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Fri 08/02 1:15 PM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (ykare, )
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 08/01 5:30 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Timothy M. Murphy by Timothy Michael Murphy on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Timothy Michael Murphy added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Murphy, Timothy)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 08/01 5:29 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Hillary D. Patterson by Hillary D. Patterson on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Patterson, Hillary)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/01 5:28 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Patterson, Hillary)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 08/01 5:26 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Adams County District Court, Case Number 2024 CV 031022. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9803720), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Patterson, Hillary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - AOS,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Property Info,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - SOS Summary,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet