Rhode Island District Court
Judge:Melissa R Dubose
Referred: Amy E Moses
Case #: 1:24-cv-00303
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2025 3:27 AM EST
Defendant
Jackys Galaxie Bristol Inc
Represented By
Samuel M. Brewster
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Douglas J. Hoffman
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jonathan R. Shank
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Jackys Galaxie Lincoln Inc
Represented By
Samuel M. Brewster
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Douglas J. Hoffman
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jonathan R. Shank
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Jackys Galaxie North Providence Inc
Represented By
Samuel M. Brewster
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Douglas J. Hoffman
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jonathan R. Shank
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Jackys Galaxie Providence Inc.
Represented By
Samuel M. Brewster
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Douglas J. Hoffman
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jonathan R. Shank
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Jackys Galaxie Tiverton Inc
Represented By
Samuel M. Brewster
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Douglas J. Hoffman
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jonathan R. Shank
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Kin Wah Ko
Represented By
Samuel M. Brewster
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Douglas J. Hoffman
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Jonathan R. Shank
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jingang Gao
Represented By
Tiffany Troy
Troy Legal, PLLC
contact info
Aaron B. Schweitzer
Troy Law, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 89 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/14 3:05 PM
Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Amy E Moses. Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond no longer assigned to the case. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
27 27 order Scheduling Order (form attached) Fri 05/02 4:36 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 7/2/2025; Joinder of Parties due by 7/2/2025; Factual Discovery to close by 9/15/2025; and Dispositive Motions due by 10/15/2025. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 5/2/2025. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 22, 2025
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Sat 03/22 10:32 AM
NOTICE by Jingang Gao re Rule 16 Conference, Plaintiff's Proposed Pre-Trial Order (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
minutes Rule 16 Conference Tue 03/18 4:46 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Melissa R. DuBose: Rule 16 Conference held on 3/14/2025. (T. Troy, D. Hoffman, J. Shank) Counsel to submit proposed scheduling order for the Court's review. (Zoom at 10:00 AM) (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
25 25 misc Rule 16 Statement Mon 03/03 5:52 PM
RULE 16 STATEMENT Plaintiff's Written Statement by Jingang Gao. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 02/28 11:33 AM
TEXT ORDER granting24 Motion to Continue Rule 16 Hearing. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 2/28/2025. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Hearing (Form Attached) Fri 02/28 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference rescheduled for 3/14/2025 at 10:00 AM by Remote Hearing before District Judge Melissa R. DuBose. This is a non-public conference. (Zoom Meeting ID: 160 864 9573, Passcode: 109144) (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
24 24 motion Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines Mon 02/24 3:33 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines Initial Pre-Trial Conference filed by Jingang Gao. Responses due by 3/10/2025. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Hearing (Form Attached) Thu 02/20 4:21 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Conference set for 3/5/2025 at 2:00 PM by Remote Hearing before District Judge Melissa R. DuBose. This is a non-public conference. (Zoom Meeting ID: 160 864 9573, Passcode: 109144) (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 01/14 3:51 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter is hereby transferred to the calendar of District Judge Melissa R. DuBose for all further proceedings. Senior District Judge William E. Smith no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Senior District Judge William E. Smith on 1/14/2025.(Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
22 22 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/21 2:09 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Jackys Galaxie Bristol Inc, Jackys Galaxie Lincoln Inc, Jackys Galaxie North Providence Inc, Jackys Galaxie Providence Inc., Jackys Galaxie Tiverton Inc, Kin Wah Ko.(Shank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 10:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jingang Gao. Jackys Galaxie Tiverton Inc served on 10/8/2024, answer due 10/29/2024. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 10:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jingang Gao. Jackys Galaxie Lincoln Inc served on 10/8/2024, answer due 10/29/2024. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 10:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jingang Gao. Jackys Galaxie Bristol Inc served on 10/8/2024, answer due 10/29/2024. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 10:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jingang Gao. Jackys Galaxie Providence Inc. served on 10/8/2024, answer due 10/29/2024. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/16 10:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jingang Gao. Jackys Galaxie North Providence Inc served on 10/8/2024, answer due 10/29/2024. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/27 11:53 AM
MOTION for Samuel M. Brewster to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number CRIDC-2048165 ) filed by All Defendants. (Shank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/27 11:49 AM
MOTION for Douglas J. Hoffman to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number BRIDC-2048161 ) filed by All Defendants. (Shank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/27 1:35 PM
TEXT ORDER granting15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Douglas J. Hoffman. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/27/2024. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/27 2:50 PM
TEXT ORDER granting16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Samuel M. Brewster. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/27/2024. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 09/20 3:33 PM
TEXT ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Reset Deadlines: Jackys Galaxie Bristol Inc answer due 10/21/2024; Jackys Galaxie Lincoln Inc answer due 10/21/2024; Jackys Galaxie North Providence Inc answer due 10/21/2024; Jackys Galaxie Providence Inc. answer due 10/21/2024; Jackys Galaxie Tiverton Inc answer due 10/21/2024; Kin Wah Ko answer due 10/21/2024. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/20/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 09/18 5:56 PM
MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint,,, until October 19, 2024 filed by Jackys Galaxie Bristol Inc, Jackys Galaxie Lincoln Inc, Jackys Galaxie North Providence Inc, Jackys Galaxie Providence Inc., Jackys Galaxie Tiverton Inc, Kin Wah Ko. Responses due by 10/2/2024. (Shank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/18 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan R. Shank on behalf of All Defendants (Shank, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/12 10:15 AM
MOTION for Aaron B. Schweitzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-2040309 ) filed by Jingang Gao. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/12 10:21 AM
TEXT ORDER granting12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Aaron B. Schweitzer. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 9/12/2024. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/11 6:05 PM
MOTION for Aaron B. Schweitzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( filing fee paid $ 100.00, receipt number ARIDC-2040309 ) filed by Jingang Gao. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/05 12:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jingang Gao. Kin Wah Ko served on 8/29/2024, answer due 9/19/2024. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/05 12:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jingang Gao. Jackys Galaxie Tiverton Inc served on 8/29/2024, answer due 9/19/2024. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/05 12:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jingang Gao. Jackys Galaxie Lincoln Inc served on 8/29/2024, answer due 9/19/2024. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/05 12:31 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jingang Gao. Jackys Galaxie Bristol Inc served on 8/29/2024, answer due 9/19/2024. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/05 12:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jingang Gao. Jackys Galaxie Providence Inc. served on 8/29/2024, answer due 9/19/2024. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/05 12:28 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jingang Gao. Jackys Galaxie North Providence Inc served on 8/29/2024, answer due 9/19/2024. (Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 08/02 1:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Kin Wah Ko. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 08/02 12:34 PM
Summons Issued as to Jackys Galaxie Bristol Inc, Jackys Galaxie Lincoln Inc, Jackys Galaxie North Providence Inc, Jackys Galaxie Providence Inc., Jackys Galaxie Tiverton Inc.(Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons
2 2 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Fri 08/02 12:32 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/02 12:13 PM
Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Lincoln D. Almond. (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Thu 08/01 9:48 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-2026410 ), filed by JINGANG GAO.(Troy, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 01 Plaintiffs W2 Form,
Att: 2 Exhibit 02 Consent to Become Party Plaintiff Jin Gang Gao,
Att: 3 Exhibit 03 Document Preservation Demand,
Att: 4 Exhibit 04 Notice of Lien and Assignment,
Att: 5 Exhibit 05 Notice that Retalaition is Illegal under FLSA and RIGL,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet 06 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 7 Exhibit 07 Proposed Summons Jacky's Galaxie North Providence Inc,
Att: 8 Exhibit 08 Proposed Summons Jacky's Galaxie Providence Inc,
Att: 9 Exhibit 09 Proposed Summons Jacky's Bristol Inc,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 Proposed Summons Jacky's Galaxie Lincoln Inc,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 Proposed Summons Jacky's Galaxie Tiverton Inc,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 Proposed Summons Kin Wah Ko /gd