Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Philip R Lammens
Referred: Philip R Lammens
Case #: 5:24-cv-00394
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2025 3:29 AM EST
Defendant
JJ & GL Group Inc
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Bertha L. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Juan Jaime Rodriguez
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Bertha L. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Los Magueyes Mexican Restaurant of Belleview Inc
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Bertha L. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Los Magueyes Mexican Restaurant of Beverly Hills Inc
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Bertha L. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Gloria Rayas Cervantes
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Bertha L. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Enefren Rios Martinez
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Bertha L. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Carlos Rayas
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Mediator
Suhaill Machado Morales
Represented By
Suhaill Machado Morales
Smm Law P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kaycie Roland
Represented By
Michael Alexander Boehringer
Pollard PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Jonathan Pollard
contact info
Christopher S Prater
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Viera
Represented By
Michael Alexander Boehringer
Pollard PLLC
contact info
Jonathan Edgar Pollard
Jonathan Pollard
contact info
Christopher S Prater
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
52 52 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 04/25 10:11 AM
ORDER granting 51 Motion to Stay. On or before August 1, 2025, as warranted by the circumstances, the parties shall file an appropriate motion to reopen the case or to extend the stay upon good cause shown. The parties are advised that a motion must be filed to reopen the case; a notice or any pleading other than a motion will fail to bring the matter to the Court's attention. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 4/25/2025. (JWM)
Related: [-]