Arkansas Eastern District Court
Judge:James M Moody Jr
Case #: 4:24-cv-00653
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2024
Terminated:Oct 17, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 2:16 AM CST
Defendant
Evolve Bank & Trust
Represented By
Daniel W. Van Horn
Butler Snow LLP
contact info
Andrew B. Schrack
Butler Snow LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jordan Bell
Represented By
Martha Tucker Ayres
Table Law PLLC
contact info
Jarrett L. Ellzey
Ellzey & Associates PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
David Henderson
Represented By
Martha Tucker Ayres
Table Law PLLC
contact info
Jarrett L. Ellzey
Ellzey & Associates PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Moran
Represented By
Martha Tucker Ayres
Table Law PLLC
contact info
Jarrett L. Ellzey
Ellzey & Associates PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Carmelot St-Louis
Represented By
Martha Tucker Ayres
Table Law PLLC
contact info
Jarrett L. Ellzey
Ellzey & Associates PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charlie Anderson
Represented By
Martha Tucker Ayres
Table Law PLLC
contact info
Jarrett L. Ellzey
Ellzey & Associates PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, October 17, 2024
12 12 misc Transfer Case Email Thu 10/17 3:36 PM
E-MAIL received from U.S. District Court Western District of Tennessee, confirming the case was received and opened in their district as case number 2:24-cv-02786. (jak)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Note Thu 10/17 9:21 AM
Docket Note: Case electronically transferred to the USDC, Tennessee Western on this date. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order Wed 10/16 4:52 PM
CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring this case to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Tennessee as part of MDL No. 3127 In Re: Evolve Bank & Trust Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. Signed by the Acting Clerk of the Panel Marcella R. Lockert. (jbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/09 6:02 PM
NOTICE by Evolve Bank & Trust of October 7, 2024 Conditional Transfer Order Issued by Judicial Panel on Multijurisdiction Litigation(Schrack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Notice,
Att: 2 Document B to Notice
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Wed 10/09 6:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Evolve Bank & Trust (Schrack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/09 6:00 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B. Schrack on behalf of Evolve Bank & Trust (Schrack, Andrew)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/09 5:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Van Horn on behalf of Evolve Bank & Trust (Van Horn, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/03 9:51 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Evolve Bank & Trust by Carmelot St-Louis, Jordan Bell, David Henderson, Jose Moran, Charlie Anderson. (Ellzey, Jarrett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
5 5 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 08/14 4:26 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jarrett L. Ellzey. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/14/2024. (kog)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Reassignment Mon 08/12 12:01 PM
(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned this case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. (kbc)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Mon 08/12 11:24 AM
ORDER directing the clerk to reassign this case to Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/12/2024. (ljb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 08/06 2:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jarrett L. Ellzey. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4796899. Filed by All Plaintiffs(Ayres, Martha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A JLE Certificate,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B JLE Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
1 1 70 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/01 8:38 AM
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Evolve Bank & Trust, filed by All Plaintiffs. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee $405 paid. Receipt Number LIT7301.) (ajj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet