1
|
|
1
SEALED COMPLAINT as to Dexter Lino (1). Violations of 18 U.S.C. §§ 666 and 1951. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (job) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of Dexter Lino. (job) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Attorney update in case as to Dexter Lino. Attorney Martin Spencer Bell for Dexter Lino added. (job) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Dexter Lino. CJA, attorney Martin Bell for Raoul Zaltzberg appointed counsel. Approved. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker) (job) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker: Initial Appearance as to Dexter Lino held on 2/6/2024. Bond Hearing as to Dexter Lino held on 2/6/2024. AUSA Jacob Fiddelman present for the Government. Def. present with attorney Martin Bell for Raoul Zaltzberg. BAIL DISPOSITION:$50,000 personal recognizance bond; Co-signed by one financially responsible person by February 20, 2024;Travel restricted to SDNY, EDNY; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; No contact by the defendant or anyone at the defendant's direction with current or former NYCHA contractors; Defendant to be released on own signature, Remaining conditions to be met by February 20, 2024. (job) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Dexter Lino. $50.000 personal recognizance bond; To be co-signed by one financially responsible person. Additional conditions... (job) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/29/2024) (job). [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ORDER as to Dexter Lino: Upon the application of the United States of America dated February 5, 2024, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed (1) to unseal the complaints in each of the cases listed in Exhibit A to the Government's February 5, 2024 letter and file them on the public docket, and (2) to file this Order and the Government's February 5, 2024 letter and its three Exhibits on the public docket of each of those cases. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/6/2024) (ap) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
LETTER by USA as to Dexter Lino addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Catherine Ghosh / Jerry Fang / Sheb Swett / Meredith Foster / Jacob Fiddelman dated 2/5/2024 re: The Government writes regarding bail conditions. Document filed by USA. (Exhibits attached). (ap) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Dexter Lino. Time excluded from 3/4/24 until 4/8/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/4/24)(jbo) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
AFFIRMATION of AUSA Jacob R. Fiddelman in Support by USA as to Dexter Lino re:8 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (jbo) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Dexter Lino. Time excluded from 4/5/24 until 5/8/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 4/5/24)(jbo) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
AFFIRMATION of AUSA Jacob R. Fiddelman in Support by USA as to Dexter Lino re:10 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (jbo) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Dexter Lino. Time excluded from 5/6/2024 until 6/7/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein on 5/6/2024)(job) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
AFFIRMATION of AUSA Jacob R. Fiddelman in Support by USA as to Dexter Lino re:12 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (job) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Dexter Lino. Time excluded from 6/6/2024 until 7/8/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 6/6/2024)(job) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
AFFIRMATION of AUSA Jacob R. Fiddelman in Support by USA as to Dexter Lino re:14 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (job) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Dexter Lino. (jbo)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Dexter Lino. Time excluded from 7/8/2024 until 8/7/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/8/2024)(job) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
AFFIRMATION of AUSA Sheb Swett in Support by USA as to Dexter Lino re:16 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (job) [1:24-mj-00454-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Case Designated ECF as to Dexter Lino. (jbo)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Gary Stein: Change of Plea Hearing as to Dexter Lino held on 7/31/2024. Plea entered by Dexter Lino (1) Guilty as to Count 1. Defendant, present with counsel Raoul Zaltzberg. A.U.S.A. Meredith Foster present for the Government. Defendant waived Grand Jury Indictment. Defendant Arraigned. Defendant withdraws plea of not guilty and enters a plea of guilty to Count 1 of 1. Magistrate Gary Stein recommends that the District Judge Rearden accept the plea. Rebecca Forman, court reporter, was present. PSI Ordered. Sentencing date or Control Date: Wednesday, October 30, 2024. (jbo)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Change of Not Guilty Plea to Guilty Plea as to Dexter Lino (1) Count 1. (jbo)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Dexter Lino. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary Stein on 7/31/24)(jbo)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Dexter Lino (1) count(s) 1. (jbo)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Dexter Lino. (jbo)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE ON A FELONY PLEA ALLOCUTION by Dexter Lino. (jbo)
Related: [-]
|