Utah District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00250
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Friday Aug 02, 2024 1:38 AM MDT
Defendant
Eric Nicholas Gapco (1)
Represented By
Emily A. Stirba
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Michael P. Kennedy
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/02/2024 3:40 AM MDT
Friday, July 19, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Eric Nicholas Gapco (1). Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (haa) [2:24-mj-00728-DBP]
Related: [-]
6 6 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 07/19/2024, filed on 07/25/2024 in case as to Eric Nicholas Gapco. (sg) [2:24-mj-00728-DBP]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
3 3 ORDER SETTING HEARING OR TRIAL as to Eric Nicholas Gapco. Initial Appearance set for 7/23/2024 at 03:00 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 07/22/2024.(tls) [2:24-mj-00728-DBP]
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Detention by USA as to Eric Nicholas Gapco. (Kennedy, Michael) [2:24-mj-00728-DBP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
5 5 **SEALED DOCUMENT** PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Eric Nicholas Gapco (kna) [2:24-mj-00728-DBP]
Related: [-]
8 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead: Initial Appearance/Detention Hearing as to Eric Nicholas Gapco held on 7/23/2024. Defendant present with counsel and in custody. Defendant requests counsel. Financial Affidavit submitted and reviewed. The Court grants the motion and appoints FPD counsel, Emily Stirba. Charges, rights and penalties explained. Defendant acknowledges understanding of the nature of the pending charges. Government is seeking detention in this matter. Defendant moves the Court to set detention hearing at a later date. The Court grants the motion sets the matter for hearing. Defendant is remanded to USMS custody pending further order of the Court. Arraignment set for 8/1/2024 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Detention Hearing set for 8/1/2024 at 02:00 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Attorney for Plaintiff: Michael Kennedy, Attorney for Defendant: Emily Stirba, FPD. Interpreter: Not Needed. Probation Officer: Wyatt Stanworth. Court Reporter: Electronic. (Time Start: 3:21:54, Time End: 3:30:10, Room 8.400). (tls) [2:24-mj-00728-DBP]
Related: [-]
9 9 DOCKET TEXT ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Eric Nicholas Gapco. No attached document. Detention Hearing set for 8/1/2024 at 02:00 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 07/23/2024.(tls) [2:24-mj-00728-DBP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
10 10 ***AMENDED*** ORDER SETTING HEARING OR TRIAL as to Eric Nicholas Gapco. Arraignment and Detention Hearing RESET FOR 8/1/2024 at ***NEW TIME*** 01:15 PM in Rm 8.400 before Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 7/30/2024 Related [+] [2:24-mj-00728-DBP]
Related: [-] b
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Emily A. Stirba appearing for Eric Nicholas Gapco (Stirba, Emily) [2:24-mj-00728-DBP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
12 12 INDICTMENT as to Eric Nicholas Gapco (1) count(s) 1s, 2s. Assigned to Judge David Sam. (jrj)
Related: [-]