California Northern District Court
Judge:Rita F Lin
Case #: 3:24-cv-04636
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:77 Securities Fraud
Case Filed:Jul 31, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 27, 2025 12:21 AM PST
Defendant
Abraham Shafi
Represented By
Britt H. Evangelist
Swanson & Mcnamara LLP
contact info
Jaimie L. Nawaday
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Mary McNamara
Swanson & Mcnamara LLP
contact info
Philip Moustakis
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Defendant
Barbara Woortmann
Represented By
Britt H. Evangelist
Swanson & Mcnamara LLP
contact info
Jaimie L. Nawaday
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Mary McNamara
Swanson & Mcnamara LLP
contact info
Philip Moustakis
Seward & Kissel LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Securities And Exchange Commission
44 Montgomery Street Suite 2800
San Francisco, CA 94104
Represented By
Jason H. Lee
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Monique C. Winkler
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Marc David Katz
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Matthew Gary Meyerhofer
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Sheila Ellen O'Callaghan
Securities And Exchange Commission
contact info
Christopher Baldwin Marshall
contact info


Docket last updated: 34 minutes ago
Thursday, January 16, 2025
41 41 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Thu 01/16 9:10 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Vacating Hearing: Notice is hereby given that the Motions to Dismiss (Dkt. Nos. 20 and 23 are submitted without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The hearing set for 1/21/2025 is VACATED. The Court will issue a written order on the motions. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/16/2025)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
40 40 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 11/22 2:14 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byBarbara Woortmann. (Moustakis, Philip)
Related: [-] 23 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint,
39 39 respm Reply to Opposition/Response Fri 11/22 2:09 PM
REPLY Related [+] filed byAbraham Shafi. (Nawaday, Jaimie)
Related: [-] 20 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint,
Friday, November 01, 2024
38 38 respm Opposition/Response to Motion Fri 11/01 4:59 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE Related [+] filed bySecurities And Exchange Commission. (O'Callaghan, Sheila)
Related: [-] 23 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, ,20 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint,
37 37 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 11/01 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Christopher Baldwin Marshall on behalf of Securities And Exchange Commission (Marshall, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
36 36 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/29 10:45 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Continuing Motion Hearing: Notice is hereby given that the Motion Hearing Re: 20 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and 23 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint set for 12/10/2024 is continued to 1/21/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 15, 18th Floor before Judge Rita F. Lin. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
35 35 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 10/23 9:44 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Initial Disclosures, Joint Case Management Statement, and Initial Case Management Conference filed by Abraham Shafi, Barbara Woortmann. (Nawaday, Jaimie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
34 34 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 10/17 2:47 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options re Barbara Woortmann (Nawaday, Jaimie)
Related: [-]
33 33 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 10/17 2:46 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options re Abraham Shafi (Nawaday, Jaimie)
Related: [-]
32 32 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Thu 10/17 10:57 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Katz, Marc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
31 31 3 pgs order Order on Stipulation Thu 10/03 12:10 PM
ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 30 Stipulation Regarding Briefing Schedule. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Thu 10/03 12:11 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint and23 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint . Responses due by 11/1/2024. Replies due by 11/22/2024. Motion Hearing set for 12/10/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 15, 18th Floor before Judge Rita F. Lin. (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
30 30 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Wed 10/02 11:48 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule filed by Securities And Exchange Commission. (O'Callaghan, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/01 3:02 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Rita F. Lin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 10/01/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
28 28 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 10/01 1:40 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 10/01 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Britt H. Evangelist on behalf of Abraham Shafi, Barbara Woortmann (Evangelist, Britt)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 10/01 11:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Mary McNamara on behalf of Abraham Shafi, Barbara Woortmann (McNamara, Mary)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
25 25 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/30 5:44 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Barbara Woortmann.. (Nawaday, Jaimie)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/30 5:40 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Barbara Woortmann (Nawaday, Jaimie)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Dismiss Mon 09/30 5:36 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, filed by Barbara Woortmann. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 12/19/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. Responses due by 10/15/2024. Replies due by 10/22/2024.(Moustakis, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
22 22 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Mon 09/30 5:31 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Abraham Shafi.. (Nawaday, Jaimie)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/30 5:28 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Abraham Shafi (Nawaday, Jaimie)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Dismiss Mon 09/30 5:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, filed by Abraham Shafi. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 12/19/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. Responses due by 10/15/2024. Replies due by 10/22/2024.(Nawaday, Jaimie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jaimie L. Nawaday in Support Thereto,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Questionnaire,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Mon 09/30 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Sheila Ellen O'Callaghan on behalf of Securities And Exchange Commission (O'Callaghan, Sheila)
Related: [-]
18 18 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/30 10:56 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S.Hixson granting 16 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/30 10:47 AM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S.Hixson granting 15 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/27 12:00 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19893490.) filed by Barbara Woortmann. (Moustakis, Philip)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/27 11:48 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19893340.) filed by Barbara Woortmann. (Nawaday, Jaimie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/25 5:37 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/25 5:36 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (rmm2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/25 9:59 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19883434.) filed by Abraham Shafi. (Moustakis, Philip)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/25 8:55 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19882834.) filed by Abraham Shafi. (Nawaday, Jaimie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/27 1:35 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Securities And Exchange Commission. Service waived by Barbara Woortmann waiver sent on 8/1/2024, answer due 9/30/2024. (Meyerhofer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/27 1:31 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Securities And Exchange Commission. Service waived by Abraham Shafi waiver sent on 8/1/2024, answer due 9/30/2024. (Meyerhofer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Thu 08/01 11:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Abraham Shafi, Barbara Woortmann. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 08/01 10:59 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/31/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/7/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 08/01 10:42 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/15/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
5 5 Proposed Summons. (Meyerhofer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 Proposed Summons. (Meyerhofer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Summons. (Meyerhofer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Securities And Exchange Commission.. (Meyerhofer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs COMPLAINT against Abraham Shafi, Barbara Woortmann. Filed by Securities And Exchange Commission.(Meyerhofer, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ONLY ONE SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED PER CASE, USE AN ATTACHMENT TO SUMMONS IF NEEDED TO LIST ADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS INFORMATION [err201].This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:4 Proposed Summons filed by Securities And Exchange Commission,3 Proposed Summons filed by Securities And Exchange Commission (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]