Texas Western District Court
Judge:Robert Pitman
Case #: 1:24-cv-00875
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Feb 03, 2025
Case in other court:395th Judicial District Court, Williamson County, 24-00951-C395
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 29, 2025 3:56 AM CST
Defendant
Spinnaker Insurance Company
Represented By
Steven F. Hudgins
The Hudgins Law Firm
contact info
Kevin Orr
The Hudgins Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Melinda Russett
Represented By
Perry J. Dominguez
Perry Dominguez Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Naomi Lara
Perry Dominguez Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, February 03, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 02/03 1:00 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (cnr)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/03 9:39 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT RULE 41(a) STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Melinda Russett.(Dominguez, Perry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Case No Longer Stayed Mon 02/03 12:59 PM
Case No Longer Stayed. (cnr)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/03 1:03 PM
Case reassigned to Judge Robert Pitman. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to the case. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 01/02 1:19 PM
Text Order GRANTING9 Motion to Stay entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of the parties' joint advisory of settlement, IT IS ORDERED that this case is STAYED until February 2, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before February 2, 2025, the parties shall file either dismissal papers or a joint motion to extend the stay. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Wed 01/22 10:58 AM
Case Stayed until 2/2/2025 (bc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
9 9 misc Advisory to the Court Thu 12/26 1:16 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Spinnaker Insurance Company . (Hudgins, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/26 10:17 AM
Text Order GRANTING8 Motion entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that this case is STAYED until December 27, 2024, while the appraisal process is completed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report or a motion to extend the stay on or before December 27, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 09/27 10:36 AM
Case Stayed, ( Status Report due by 12/27/2024,) (dm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 09/25 11:04 AM
Agreed MOTION to Abate Case Pending Appraisal Outcome by Spinnaker Insurance Company.(Hudgins, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
7 7 misc Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Tue 09/10 11:31 AM
Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan by Spinnaker Insurance Company. (Hudgins, Steven)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/22 2:12 PM
ORDER Striking attorney Kevin Orr as counsel of record. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
5 5 service Certificate of Service Tue 08/06 9:18 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spinnaker Insurance Company Amended (Hudgins, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order Fri 08/02 1:48 PM
ORDER that the removing party, if it has not already done so, shall within ten (10) days from the date of this order supplement the record with state court pleadings. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order to File Pro Hac Motion Fri 08/02 1:46 PM
Order Directing Kevin Orr to File a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice within 14 days. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (kp)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Deficiency Notice Fri 08/02 1:46 PM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE: re 1 Notice of Removal, your Certificate of Service indicates ECF service on attorney for Plaintiff, who had not been added to the docket at the time of filing the Notice of Removal, and therefore had not been served via CM/ECF. Please file an Amended Certificate of Service as a SEPARATE PLEADING. Use the "Certificate of Service" event under the "Service of Process" menu. State alternate means of service to counsel. (kp)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 08/02 11:35 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Spinnaker Insurance Company (Filing fee $405 receipt number ATXWDC-19057357), filed by Spinnaker Insurance Company.(Hudgins, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 9 Supplement
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 08/02 1:44 PM
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Fri 08/02 1:45 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Fri 08/02 1:45 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Melinda Russett, Spinnaker Insurance Company. (kp)
Related: [-]