Day v. Amherst Madison, Inc.
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robert C Chambers |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00396 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 29, 2025 4:34 AM EST |
Defendant
Amherst Madison, Inc.
a West Virginia corporation c/o Robert R. McCoy 2 Port Amherst Drive
Charleston, WV 25306 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Day
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Defendant
Leslie Day
|
Represented By
|
Third Party Plaintiff
Amherst Madison, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 23, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS granting15 MOTION by Amherst Madison, Inc. to Stay Action; directing that all further proceedings in this case are STAYED pending resolution of Case No. 3:24-cv-00542. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/23/2024. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mkw) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MOTION by Amherst Madison, Inc. to Stay Action. (Attachment: #1 Proposed Order) (Sullivan, Megan) |
|
Thursday, October 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties, amended pleadings due by 12/31/2024. Discovery requests to be completed by 8/1/2025 and all depositions by 9/15/2025. Expert Witness List by parties bearing the burden of proof due by 4/1/2025, by party not bearing burden of proof due by 5/15/2025, and to solely contradict or rebut evidence due by 6/15/2025. Dispositive Motions except those filed under Rule 12(b) due by 10/6/2025; any response shall be filed within 14 days of the filing of the motion, with replies due within 7 days of the filing of the response. Settlement Meeting and Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures by 11/24/2025. Plaintiff's portion of proposed Pretrial Order to defendant due by 12/1/2025. Proposed Integrated Pretrial Order due by 12/8/2025. Pretrial Conference set for 12/15/2025 at 10:00 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers. Proposed Jury Charges due by 1/12/2026. Final Settlement Conference at 9:30 AM on 1/20/2026 in Huntington. Trial set for 1/21/2026 at 8:30 AM in Huntington before Judge Robert C. Chambers; further CANCELING the scheduling conference set for 11/4/2024. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 10/17/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa) |
|
Thursday, October 10, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PLANNING MEETING by Nicholas Day, Amherst Madison, Inc. (Sullivan, Megan) (Modified on 10/10/2024 to add party filer) (mkw) |
|
Thursday, September 26, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF RULE 14(C) TENDER AGAINST LESLIE DAY by Amherst Madison, Inc. re:7 Answer and Third Party Complaint (Sullivan, Megan) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by David A. Bosak on 9/19/2024. Leslie Day waiver mailed on 9/9/2024, answer due 11/8/2024. (Sullivan, Megan) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Amherst Madison, Inc. (Sullivan, Megan) |
|
9 | 9
![]() ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions - 9/30/2024. Rule 26(f) Meeting - 10/15/2024. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting - 10/21/2024. Scheduling/status conference at 11:30 AM on 11/4/2024 in Huntington. Entry of Scheduling Order - 11/12/2024. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures - 11/18/2024. Signed by Judge Robert C. Chambers on 9/10/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (jsa) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 as to Amherst Madison, Inc. (mkw) |
|
7 | 7
![]() ANSWER1 Complaint, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT AND RULE 14(C) TENDER by Amherst Madison, Inc. against Leslie Day. (Sullivan, Megan) (Modified on 9/9/2024 to correct the name of the third party defendant) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() CLERK'S ORDER. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert, the above-styled civil action is referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph K. Reeder for discovery disputes. Signed by Clerk of Court Rory L. Perry II on 9/3/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (klc) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS ACCEPTED FOR SERVICE BY SECRETARY OF STATE on 8/19/2024 as to Amherst Madison, Inc.. Certified Mail Number: 92148901125134100003987530 . (sbj) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Eifert. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (skm) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 as to Nicholas Day. (skm) |
|
2 | 2
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Amherst Madison, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (skm) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8704267. (skm) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned
Mon 08/05 9:08 AM
CASE assigned to Judge Robert C. Chambers. (klc) |