California Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:24-cv-01375
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 29, 2025 1:31 AM PST
Defendant
Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By
Matthew Scott Foy
Gordon & Rees Llp - San Francisco
contact info
Jennifer N. Wahlgren
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Does 1 through 20
Plaintiff
The Serbian Orthodox Church - School Congregation of Saint Petka
Represented By
Gino D Serpe
Law Offices Of Gino D Serpe
contact info
Erika E. Alba
Woolsey Morcom, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
18 18 minutes Status Conference Fri 05/16 10:04 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Status Conference held. As discussed, the deadlines to complete fact discovery and designate experts are continued to July 18, 2025 . The parties may designate rebuttal experts no later than August 15, 2025 . (Plaintiff Attorneys Gino Serpe & Erika Alba). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer Wahlgren). (no document attached) (kxb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
17 17 minutes ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 04/25 3:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: At the parties' request and with good cause appearing, the June 11, 2025 Mandatory Settlement Conference ("MSC") is vacated and reset for June 3. 2025 at 2:00 p.m. The deadline to lodge confidential briefs, including MSC participant names and attorney contact information, is May 27. 2025 .(no document attached) (kxb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 03/20 1:11 PM
ANSWER to15 Amended Complaint by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company.(Wahlgren, Jennifer) (anh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 02/18 9:49 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company, filed by The Serbian Orthodox Church - School Congregation of Saint Petka. (Serpe, Gino) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Policy
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Tue 02/11 3:39 PM
ORDER Granting Leave to File First Amended Complaint [Doc. No.13 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 2/11/2205. (anh)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Tue 02/11 10:59 AM
Joint MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by The Serbian Orthodox Church - School Congregation of Saint Petka.(Serpe, Gino) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
12 12 order Scheduling Order Wed 01/15 12:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery and Other Pre-Trial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 1/15/2025.(anh)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Settlement Conference Case Management Conference Wed 01/15 10:17 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Settlement Conference and Case Management Conference held on 1/13/2025. The Case did not settle and scheduling order dates were issued. (Plaintiff Attorneys Erika Alba & Gino Serpe). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer Wahlgren). (no document attached) (kxb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
10 10 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 10/29 2:00 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Protective Order [Doc. No.9 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/29/2024. (anh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
9 9 motion Protective Order Thu 10/24 7:00 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Wahlgren, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/22 3:52 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Scott Foy on behalf of Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Foy, Matthew)Attorney Matthew Scott Foy added to party Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
7 7 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 10/09 4:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference ("ENE") held. Because settlement discussions are ongoing the Court vacated the Case Management Conference. (Plaintiff Attorneys Erika Alba & Gino Serpe). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer Wahlgren). As discussed during the ENE, the parties must file a motion for entry of protective order on or before October 25, 2024 . Counsel must meet and confer no later than October 31, 2024 , regarding the exchange of informal discovery, including documentation discussed in the parties' June and July 2024 correspondence, and an on-site meeting between consultants. Plaintiff must informally produce an estimate to repair or replace the damaged fresco no later than November 21, 2024 . The party consultants must meet on-site on or before November 30, 2024 . The Court sets a Settlement Conference on January 13, 2025 , at 2:00 p.m. Counsel and party representatives with full settlement authority must participate. The Settlement Conference will be held by Zoom. The deadline to lodge confidential Settlement Conference briefs and participant names and contact information is January 8, 2025 . All parties must read and fully comply with Sections IV and V of Magistrate Judge Crawford's Chamber Rules for Civil Pretrial Procedures. If the case does not settle, the Court will hold a Case Management Conference immediately following the Settlement Conference. (no document attached) (kxb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
6 6 notice Joint Discovery Plan Wed 10/02 6:13 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company (Wahlgren, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
5 5 5 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Fri 09/06 3:13 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 9/6/2024.(anh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Wed 08/28 4:45 PM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company . Identifying Corporate Parent Brotherhood Mutual Holding Company for Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Wahlgren, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 08/28 4:40 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company.(Wahlgren, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer N. Wahlgren added to party Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 08/02 11:22 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc1) (jms)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 11:16 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19068515.), filed by The Serbian Orthodox Church - School Congregation of Saint Petka. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1375-CAB-KSC. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Alba, Erika)(axc1) (jms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet Civil Cover Sheet