Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Wendy B Vitter
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:24-cv-01933
Nature of Suit371 Torts - Personal Property - Truth in Lending
Cause15:1601 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 29, 2025 3:40 AM CST
Defendant
Nga Baird
Represented By
Anders F. Holmgren
Flanagan Partners LLP
contact info
Alixe L. Duplechain
Flanagan Partners LLP
contact info
Thomas M. Flanagan
Flanagan Partners LLP
contact info
Defendant
Gulf Coast Bank & Trust Company
Sr Vice President Chief Financial Officer 200 St Charles Ave
New Orleans, LA 70130
Represented By
Christian Hebert-Pryor
Ricci Partners LLC
contact info
Michael Steven Ricci
Ricci Partners, LLC
contact info
Jonathan L Schultis
Ricci Partners, LLC
contact info
Sara Huffman Hayden
Ricci Partners, LLC
contact info
Atticus Clay Hanrahan
Ricci Partners, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Lloyd & Taylor Mortgage LLC
Represented By
Patrick S. McGoey
Schonekas, Evans, Mcgoey & Mceachin, LLC
contact info
Ian Lewis Atkinson
Schonekas, Evans, Mcgoey & Mceachin, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rance Mangipano
Represented By
Christian Hebert-Pryor
Ricci Partners LLC
contact info
Michael Steven Ricci
Ricci Partners, LLC
contact info
Jonathan L Schultis
Ricci Partners, LLC
contact info
Sara Huffman Hayden
Ricci Partners, LLC
contact info
Atticus Clay Hanrahan
Ricci Partners, LLC
contact info
Defendant
New World Realty LLC
Represented By
Anders F. Holmgren
Flanagan Partners LLP
contact info
Alixe L. Duplechain
Flanagan Partners LLP
contact info
Thomas M. Flanagan
Flanagan Partners LLP
contact info
Defendant
Samantha Tuyet Nguyen Tran
Represented By
Patrick S. McGoey
Schonekas, Evans, Mcgoey & Mceachin, LLC
contact info
Ian Lewis Atkinson
Schonekas, Evans, Mcgoey & Mceachin, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Trieu Law LLC
Represented By
Casey Bordelon Wendling
Deutsch Kerrigan
contact info
Melissa M. Lessell
Deutsch Kerrigan, LLP
contact info
Beverly Aloisio DeLaune
Deutsch Kerrigan, L.L.P.
contact info
Joan Sheridan
Deutsch Kerrigan, LLP
contact info
Connie P. Trieu
Trieu Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
My Thi Nhu Tran
Represented By
Vladimir Thomas
Law Office Of Vladimir Thomas
contact info
Plaintiff
Tung Duc Vo
Represented By
Vladimir Thomas
Law Office Of Vladimir Thomas
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
115 115 misc Response/Reply Tue 05/13 3:06 PM
Response by All Defendants to107 Notice Plaintiffs' "Formal Notice of Objection to Judicially-Facilitated Coercion; Preservation of Constitutional Statutory, and Ethical Violation; and Reservation of Rights" (Flanagan, Thomas) Modified text on 5/13/2025 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
114 114 misc Response/Reply Thu 05/08 11:43 PM
Response/Reply by Gulf Coast Bank & Trust Company, Rance Mangipano to108 Notice (Other) (Ricci, Michael)
Related: [-]
113 113 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 05/08 6:12 PM
ANSWER to61 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Gulf Coast Bank & Trust Company, Rance Mangipano.(Ricci, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
112 112 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 05/07 9:14 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by All Plaintiffs re100 MOTION to Recuse pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a) . (Thomas, Vladimir)
Related: [-]