Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Sarah E Pitlyk
Case #: 4:24-cv-01076
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Oct 25, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 29, 2025 3:44 AM CST
Defendant
Mayflower Transit, LLC
1 Premier Drive
Fenton, MO 63026
Represented By
Brian A. Lamping
Thompson Coburn Llp - St. Louis
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Casale
Thompson Coburn Llp - St. Louis
contact info
Defendant
United Van Lines, LLC
1 Premier Drive
Fenton, MO 63026
Represented By
Brian A. Lamping
Thompson Coburn Llp - St. Louis
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Casale
Thompson Coburn Llp - St. Louis
contact info
Defendant
Unigroup, C.A.
1 Premier Drive
Fenton, MO 63026
Represented By
Brian A. Lamping
Thompson Coburn Llp - St. Louis
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Casale
Thompson Coburn Llp - St. Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of Orlando, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of Atlanta, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Withers/Suddath Relocation Systems, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
The Suddath Companies
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Van Lines, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of Texas, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of St. Petersburg, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of Pensacola, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
City/Suddath Relocation Systems, LLC
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of Oregon, LLC
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of Northern California, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of Minnesota, LLC
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of Melbourne, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of Jacksonville, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of Ft. Lauderdale, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of Charlotte, LLC
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Suddath Relocation Systems of California, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Daryl Flood Relocation, Inc.
815 S. Main Street
Jacksonville, FL 32207
Represented By
Aleksas Barauskas
Terrell Hogan Yegelwel PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, October 25, 2024
35 35 order A Docket Text Order Fri 10/25 5:02 PM
Docket Text ORDER: re:34 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs With Prejudice (Barauskas, Aleksas); ORDERED SO ORDERED. (Case Terminated.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 10/25/2024. (KRZ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
34 34 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/24 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs With Prejudice (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
33 33 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Tue 09/24 12:49 PM
Docket Text ORDER: The Court received notice that the parties have reached a settlement. Doc.32 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all pending deadlines are vacated in this matter. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel must file a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment within 30 days. Failure to timely comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 10/24/2024.) Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 09/24/2024. (ANR)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
32 32 3 pgs notice Notice of Settlement Mon 09/23 9:45 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Joint Notice of Settlement in Principle and Request to Continue All Case Deadlines by Mayflower Transit, LLC (Lamping, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
31 31 order CJRA Order Fri 09/13 3:48 PM
CJRA ORDER (NMG). Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen termed. Case reassigned to District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk for all further proceedings (KEK)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
30 30 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/23 2:02 PM
Docket Text Order: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Doc.28 ) is GRANTED. Answers due by 9/25/24. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 8/23/34. (SGP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
29 29 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 08/22 5:56 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Casale for Defendants Mayflower Transit, LLC, Unigroup, C.A., United Van Lines, LLC. (Casale, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/22 4:11 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Mayflower Transit, LLC, Unigroup, C.A., United Van Lines, LLC. (Lamping, Brian)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 08/22 4:08 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Brian A. Lamping for Defendants Mayflower Transit, LLC, Unigroup, C.A., United Van Lines, LLC. (Lamping, Brian)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
26 26 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 08/20 3:53 PM
AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Oregon, LLC, Suddath Van Lines, Inc... (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 08/20 3:51 PM
AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Minnesota, LLC.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 08/20 3:50 PM
AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Charlotte, LLC, Suddath Van Lines, Inc... (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 08/20 3:48 PM
AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City/Suddath Relocation Systems, LLC, Suddath Van Lines, Inc... (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
22 22 notice Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency (Teams & Cape) Mon 08/12 8:19 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re14 Disclosure Statement,12 Disclosure Statement,6 Disclosure Statement,8 Disclosure Statement,4 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiffs City/Suddath Relocation Systems, LLC, Suddath Relocation Systems of Atlanta, LLC, Suddath Relocation Systems of Charlotte, LLC, Suddath Relocation Systems of Minnesota, LLC, Suddath Relocation Systems of Oregon, LLC. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: : Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity but failed to properly complete the Court adopted form with diversity information. LLCs, LLPs must include all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations and his/her/its state of citizenship in Section 2. A mere statement that regarding these members is not sufficient. These entities must be entered into CM/ECF where prompted. An amended Disclosure Statement must be filed immediately, using the Court adopted form.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (CBL)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
21 21 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 1:04 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Withers/Suddath Relocation Systems, Inc., The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 1:02 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Suddath Companies. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 1:01 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Van Lines, Inc., The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:59 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Texas, Inc., The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:58 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of St. Petersburg, Inc., The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:57 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Pensacola, Inc., The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:52 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Orlando, Inc., The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:50 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Oregon, LLC, The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:49 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Northern California, Inc., The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:48 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Minnesota, LLC, The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:45 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Melbourne, Inc., The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:43 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Jacksonville, Inc., The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:42 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Ft. Lauderdale, Inc., The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:35 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Charlotte, LLC, The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:33 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of California, Inc., The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:31 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Suddath Relocation Systems of Atlanta, LLC, The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:30 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Daryl Flood Relocation, Inc., The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Fri 08/09 12:21 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by City/Suddath Relocation Systems, LLC, The Suddath Companies.. (Barauskas, Aleksas)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
3 3 misc Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08 Fri 08/02 6:26 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Fri 08/02 2:26 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs City/Suddath Relocation Systems, LLC, Daryl Flood Relocation, Inc., Suddath Relocation Systems of Atlanta, LLC., Suddath Relocation Systems of California, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Charlotte, LLC , Suddath Relocation Systems of Ft. Lauderdale, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Jacksonville, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Melbourne, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Minnesota, LLC , Suddath Relocation Systems of Northern California, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Oregon, LLC , Suddath Relocation Systems of Orlando, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Pensacola, Inc., Suddath Relocation Systems of St. Petersburg, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Texas, Inc. , Suddath Van Lines, Inc. , The Suddath Companies Process Server: Aronson Process Service, LLC (Barauskas, Aleksas) Modified on 8/2/2024 (JWD)
Related: [-]
1 1 38 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 2:24 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant All Plaintiffs with receipt number AMOEDC-10746282, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by City/Suddath Relocation Systems, LLC, Daryl Flood Relocation, Inc., Suddath Relocation Systems of Atlanta, LLC., Suddath Relocation Systems of California, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Charlotte, LLC , Suddath Relocation Systems of Ft. Lauderdale, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Jacksonville, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Melbourne, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Minnesota, LLC , Suddath Relocation Systems of Northern California, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Oregon, LLC , Suddath Relocation Systems of Orlando, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Pensacola, Inc., Suddath Relocation Systems of St. Petersburg, Inc. , Suddath Relocation Systems of Texas, Inc. , Suddath Van Lines, Inc. , The Suddath Companies(Barauskas, Aleksas) Modified on 8/2/2024 (JWD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 15 pgs Exhibit A - Agency Agreement,
Att: 2 15 pgs Exhibit B - First Amended Agreement,
Att: 3 26 pgs Exhibit C - Second Amended Agreement,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit D - Internal Announcement,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit E - 409 Policy,
Att: 6 102 pgs Exhibit F - Redemption Policy,
Att: 7 3 pgs Exhibit G - Artemis NDA,
Att: 8 1 pgs Original Filing Form Original Filing Form,
Att: 9 Summons Summons - Mayflower,
Att: 10 Summons Summons - United,
Att: 11 2 pgs Summons Summons - Unigroup,
Att: 12 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
misc Case Opening Notification Fri 08/02 4:29 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable John M. Bodenhausen. 3 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Aleksas Barauskas. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD)
Related: [-]