California Central District Court
Judge:John W Holcomb
Referred: Autumn D Spaeth
Case #: 8:24-cv-01687
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Sep 04, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of Orange County, 30-02022-0142242
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 29, 2025 1:31 AM PST
Defendant
California Cemetery and Funeral Services, LLC
Represented By
Carrie M Francis
Stinson LLP
contact info
Defendant
SCI Direct, Inc.
Represented By
Carrie M Francis
Stinson LLP
contact info
Defendant
SCI Shared Resources, LLC
Represented By
Carrie M Francis
Stinson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Represented By
Carrie M Francis
Stinson LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyra Rydlund
Represented By
Harvey C Berger
Berger And Williams, LLP
contact info
Matthew Ryan Baker
Berger And Williams, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
14 14 2 pgs misc Status Report Tue 03/04 1:14 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Status of Arbitration Proceedings filed by Defendants SCI Direct, Inc., SCI Shared Resources, LLC, California Cemetery and Funeral Services, LLC. (Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
13 13 misc Status Report Fri 12/06 12:22 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Report Regarding Status of Arbitration Proceedings filed by Defendants SCI Direct, Inc., SCI Shared Resources, LLC, California Cemetery and Funeral Services, LLC. (Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 09/05 11:58 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE PURSUANT TO PRIVATE AGREEMENT11 by Judge John W. Holcomb. This matter is STAYED pending the conclusion of the parties' arbitration proceedings. The parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report no later than December 6, 2024, and every 90 days thereafter, that advises the Court regarding the status of the arbitration proceedings. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close this case administratively. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (yl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
11 11 stip Stay Case Tue 09/03 2:20 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Arbitration Pursuant to Private Agreement filed by Defendants California Cemetery and Funeral Services, LLC, Does, SCI Direct, Inc., SCI Shared Resources, LLC.(Attorney Carrie M Francis added to party Does(pty:dft))(Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 22, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 08/22 8:04 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge John W. Holcomb. Scheduling Conference set for 10/25/2024 at 11:00 AM before Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Thu 08/22 8:02 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge John W. Holcomb. (cla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Tue 08/20 11:59 AM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott to Judge John W. Holcomb for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 8;24-cv-01687 JWH(ADSx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
7 7 misc Statement Tue 08/13 9:03 AM
STATEMENT Consent to Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate filed by Defendants California Cemetery and Funeral Services, LLC, SCI Direct, Inc., SCI Shared Resources, LLC (Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Fri 08/09 9:41 AM
ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants California Cemetery and Funeral Services, LLC, SCI Direct, Inc., SCI Shared Resources, LLC.(Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
5 5 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 08/05 1:07 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Friday, August 02, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 08/02 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SCI Shared Resources, LLC, identifying Service Corporation International. (Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 08/02 1:34 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant California Cemetery and Funeral Services, LLC, identifying Service Corporation International. (Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 08/02 1:32 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant SCI Direct, Inc., identifying Service Corporation International. (Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 08/02 12:58 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Orange, case number 30-2022 0142242 Receipt No: ACACDC-37953418 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant SCI Shared Resources, LLC, SCI Direct, Inc., California Cemetery and Funeral Services, LLC. (Attorney Carrie M Francis added to party SCI Direct, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie M Francis added to party SCI Shared Resources, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Carrie M Francis added to party California Cemetery and Funeral Services, LLC(pty:dft))(Francis, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 08/05 1:02 PM
CONFORMED EFILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants California Cemetery and Funeral Services, LLC, Does, SCI Direct, Inc., SCI Shared Resources, LLC., filed by Plaintiff Kyra Rydlund. [FILED IN STATE COURT 5/23/2024 SUBMITTED AS ATTACHMENT NO. 1 EXHIBIT A TO THE NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ] (sh)
Related: [-]