Maryland District Court
Judge:J Mark Coulson
Case #: 1:24-cv-02257
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 29, 2025 4:32 AM EST
Defendant
David Chambers
2510 Kinderbrook Lane
Bowie, MD 20715
Represented By
Megan Nicole Watson
Mccandlish Holton, PC
contact info
Defendant
Michael C. Mundey
645 Central Ave E #200
Edgewater, MD 21037
Represented By
Megan Nicole Watson
Mccandlish Holton, PC
contact info
Defendant
Blades of Green, Inc.
Represented By
Megan Nicole Watson
Mccandlish Holton, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gloria Tillery
Morgan and Morgan DC, PLLC 1901 Pennsylvania Ave NW, ste 300
Washington, DC 20006
Represented By
Christopher David Getty
contact info
Christopher Michael FitzPatrick, I
Christopher Fitzpatrick
contact info

GPO Jan 30 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying 30 Mundey's 12(b)(6) Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/29/2025. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 69 minutes ago
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
41 41 3 pgs order Order Tue 02/25 10:14 AM
MARGINAL ORDER Approving40 Rule 26(f) Report filed by Gloria Tillery. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 2/25/2025. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
40 40 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/24 1:26 PM
NOTICE by Gloria Tillery regarding Rule 26(f) conference (Getty, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
39 39 2 pgs order Memorandum to Parties Thu 01/30 10:09 AM
MEMORANDUM to Parties re: Informal Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/30/2025. (daws, Chambers)
Related: [-]
38 38 5 pgs order Order Thu 01/30 10:08 AM
LETTER ORDER re: Proposed Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/30/2025. (daws, Chambers)
Related: [-]
37 37 5 pgs order Memorandum and Order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 01/30 7:59 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying30 Mundey's 12(b)(6) Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 1/29/2025. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
36 36 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 12/05 2:19 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gloria Tillery.(Getty, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
35 35 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 12/05 12:08 PM
QC NOTICE:32 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Gloria Tillery,34 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Gloria Tillery was filed incorrectly. **Duplicate filings. Counsel who is listed and who electronically signed the document is not the attorney whose filing credentials were used to file the document. Please refile the Response using the "Response" event and link to the corresponding Motion. Ensure the login credentials of the filing attorney are used. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/03 3:10 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gloria Tillery.(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Wed 11/27 1:47 PM
ORDER approving31 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 11/27/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 11/27 11:46 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re30 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , RESPONSE to Motion Opposition on Motion to Dismiss filed by Gloria Tillery.(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
31 31 motion Withdraw Wed 11/27 11:17 AM
MOTION to Withdraw with Substitution of Counsel by Gloria Tillery(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, November 22, 2024
30 30 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 11/22 1:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael C. Mundey(Watson, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
29 29 order 25 Pct Mag - ORDER: Consent to Proceed before Mag Judge Thu 11/14 12:40 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 11/13/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Wed 11/13 4:24 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Blades of Green, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Senske Lawn and Tree, LLC, Other Affiliate GTCR, Party with Financial Interest Erie Insurance Exchange for Blades of Green, Inc..(Watson, Megan)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 11/13 8:12 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gloria Tillery. All Defendants.(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
25 25 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Tue 11/12 4:52 PM
QC NOTICE:23 Affidavit of Service filed by Gloria Tillery,24 Affidavit of Service filed by Gloria Tillery,21 Affidavit of Service filed by Gloria Tillery,22 Affidavit of Service filed by Gloria Tillery,20 Affidavit of Service filed by Gloria Tillery was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Refile using the event "Summons Returned Executed" and input the date of service for each party. This can be done in one entry, with multiple documents attached. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
24 24 service Affidavit of Service Mon 11/11 8:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Return Executed served on Blades of Green, Inc on 10/22/24, filed by Gloria Tillery.(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Affidavit of Service Mon 11/11 8:25 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Return Executed served on M. Mundy on 10/15/2024, filed by Gloria Tillery.(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Affidavit of Service Mon 11/11 8:24 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Return Executed served on M. Mundy on 10/15/2024, filed by Gloria Tillery.(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Affidavit of Service Mon 11/11 8:23 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Return Executed served on M. Mundy on 10/15/2024, filed by Gloria Tillery.(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Affidavit of Service Mon 11/11 8:22 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons Return Executed served on D. Chambers on 10/17/2024, filed by Gloria Tillery.(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
17 17 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/04 10:57 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Michael C. Mundey(Watson, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/04 10:51 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Blades of Green, Inc., David Chambers, Michael C. Mundey.(Watson, Megan)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Mon 11/04 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Blades of Green, Inc., David Chambers, Michael C. Mundey or counsel for Blades of Green, Inc., David Chambers, Michael C. Mundey are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 11/18/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 11/04 11:49 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Michael C. Mundey. (ECF No. 17). This case has been tentatively assigned to Magistrate Judge Coulson. Pursuant to the Courts direct assignment program, the parties are precluded from filing any fully or partially dispositive motions until consent to Judge Coulson's jurisdiction is obtained from all parties or the case is reassigned to a District Judge, if consent from all parties is not obtained. (ECF No. 2). Because the time to file any preliminary motion is tolled until such time that consent is obtained from all parties or the case is reassigned to a District Judge, the Court's order denying Defendant's motion is without prejudice to Defendant's right to renew the motion at the appropriate time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 11/4/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Wed 10/23 2:45 PM
QC NOTICE:13 Affidavit of Service filed by Gloria Tillery,14 Affidavit of Service filed by Gloria Tillery,12 Affidavit of Service filed by Gloria Tillery was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Refile using the event "Summons Returned Executed" and input the date of service for each party served. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
14 14 service Affidavit of Service Tue 10/22 11:15 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served on D. Chambers on 10/17/2024, filed by Gloria Tillery.(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Tue 10/22 11:14 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served on M. Mundy on 10/15/2024, filed by Gloria Tillery.(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Affidavit of Service Tue 10/22 11:14 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served on M. Mundy on 10/15/2024, filed by Gloria Tillery.(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
11 11 service Summons Reissued Thu 10/17 2:31 PM
Summons Reissued as to Blades of Green, Inc..(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/16 1:42 PM
NOTICE by Gloria Tillery Request for Summons (FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 10/09 3:56 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Blades of Green, Inc., David Chambers, Michael C. Mundey.(kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/04 10:47 AM
NOTICE by Gloria Tillery Request for Summons (FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
order 25 Pct Mag - Order Cancelling Show Cause Hearing Thu 09/12 4:08 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re:5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 9/12/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 09/11 3:55 PM
NOTICE by Gloria Tillery General Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge (FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
5 5 order 25 Pct Mag - Order to Show Cause Tue 08/20 9:46 AM
ORDER directing Gloria Tillery to show cause for failure to comply with[LINK:Standing Order 2019-07] . Show Cause Hearing set for 9/27/2024 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Gloria Tillery files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/20/2024. (kk5s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
2 2 order 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order Mon 08/05 2:38 PM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/5/2025. (ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Mon 08/05 2:39 PM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Gloria Tillery or counsel for Gloria Tillery are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 8/19/2024. (ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Mon 08/05 2:40 PM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by Gloria Tillery was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summonses. To correct this problem, file completed Summonses using the event Notice (Other) and link completed Summonses to 1 . (ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gloria Tillery.(FitzPatrick, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Paid Mon 08/05 2:37 PM
Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number AMDDC-11409012 (ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]