Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Denise Page Hood
Referred: Elizabeth A Stafford
Case #: 2:24-cv-12011
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Terminated:Feb 12, 2025
Case in other court:Genesee County Circuit Court, 24-120633
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 28, 2025 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
Main Line Soles, LLC
Represented By
Miles Macik
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Jonathan F. Karmo
Howard And Howard
contact info
Defendant
Jack Reidenbach
Represented By
Miles Macik
Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC
contact info
Jonathan F. Karmo
Howard And Howard
contact info
Plaintiff
Rohr-Sceglio, LLC
Represented By
Faith M. Gaudaen
Kemp Klein Law Firm
contact info
George F. Rizik, II
Rizik & Rizik
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
13 13 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Wed 02/12 5:09 PM
STIPULATED ORDER to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
minutes Settlement Conference Fri 01/31 11:20 AM
Minute Entry for remote proceedings before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford: Settlement Conference held on 1/31/2025 Disposition: Settlement reached (Court Reporter: Digitally Recorded) (DAll)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
12 12 notice Appear* Wed 01/29 4:08 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR REMOTELY: Completion of Settlement Conference set for 1/31/2025 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford (DAll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
11 11 notice Appear* Thu 10/17 3:05 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Confidential Settlement Statements due 1/22/2025,Settlement Conference set for 1/29/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Stafford (DAll)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
10 10 order Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge* Thu 10/10 1:04 PM
ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Stafford : Settlement Conference to be conducted before March 28, 2025. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (LSau)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 10/10 1:01 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/15/2025 Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 5/16/2025 Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2025 02:00 PM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Bench Trial set for 9/9/2025 09:30 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. Related [+] (LSau)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Wed 10/02 4:10 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference Hearing on October 7, 2024 is Cancelled re7 Notice to Appear (LSau)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
8 8 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Mon 09/30 12:13 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Gaudaen, Faith)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
7 7 notice Appear* Mon 09/16 2:49 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2024 10:15 AM before District Judge Denise Page Hood (Joint Rule 26f due 9/30/24) (LSau)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
6 6 order Substitution/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 09/11 2:08 PM
ORDER of Attorney Substitution with stipulation. Signed by District Judge Denise Page Hood. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/08 3:34 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Macik, Miles)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
4 4 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 08/02 8:48 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants identifying Corporate Parent Main Line Soles, LLC for Main Line Soles, LLC. (Karmo, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Fri 08/02 8:46 AM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Defendants identifying Corporate Parent Reidenbach for Jack Reidenbach. (Karmo, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs notice Appearance Fri 08/02 7:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Miles Macik on behalf of Main Line Soles, LLC, Jack Reidenbach. (Macik, Miles)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Genesee County Circuit Court, case number 2024-120633-CB. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9885488 - Fee: $405 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Karmo, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit