Texas Western District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-01105
Case Filed:Aug 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 03, 2024 3:01 AM CDT
Defendant
Jorge Alberto Davalos-Flores (1)
Represented By
Alejandro Rafael Almanzan
Federal Public Defender, Txw
contact info
Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brian M. Nowinski
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/03/2024 3:14 AM CDT
Thursday, August 01, 2024
Arrest of Jorge Alberto Davalos-Flores (rqr)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney as to Jorge Alberto Davalos-Flores. (rqr)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Jorge Alberto Davalos-Flores. (rqr)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney:Initial Appearance as to Jorge Alberto Davalos-Flores held on 8/1/2024. Defendant requests appointment of counsel. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Jorge Alberto Davalos-Flores (Court Reporter FTR GOLD.) (rqr)
Related: [-]
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jorge Alberto Davalos-Flores (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (rqr)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-San Antonio for Jorge Alberto Davalos-Flores. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rqr)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: as to Jorge Alberto Davalos-Flores. Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 8/6/2024 10:30 AM before Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney.. Signed by Judge Elizabeth S. Chestney. (rqr)
Related: [-]