Arizona District Court
Case #: 4:24-mj-08005
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2024
Terminated:Jul 16, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Aug 04, 2024 12:22 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jose Ruben Solis, Jr.
Us Attorneys Office - Tucson, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Elizabeth Hernandez-Silva (1)
Terminated: 07/16/2024
Represented By
Victoria A Brambl
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/04/2024 12:47 AM MST
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
Arrest of Elizabeth Hernandez-Silva on 7/3/2024. (JAM)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Elizabeth Hernandez-Silva. (JAM)
Related: [-]