Original Case: 1:22-cv-00458

Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv.us-01719
Typecivil u.s. / united states
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Dec 10, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 11, 2024 7:00 AM EST
Defendant - Appellant
SOUL VAPOR, LLC, a corporation
Represented By
Jerad Najvar
NAJVAR LAW FIRM
contact info
Caleb David
SHUMAN, MCCUSKEY & SLICER, PLLC
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
AURELIUS JEFFREY, an individual
Represented By
Jerad Najvar
NAJVAR LAW FIRM
contact info
Caleb David
SHUMAN, MCCUSKEY & SLICER, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Jennifer Maureen Mankins
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES ATTORNEY
contact info
Lindsey Powell
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Michael Murali
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Catherine Meredith Padhi
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info
Stephen Carl Tosini
U. S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/11/2024 6:29 AM EST
Friday, August 02, 2024
1 1 1 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:22-cv-00458. Case manager: GAboutabl. [1001613052] 24-1719 GMA [Entered: 08/02/2024 12:14 PM]
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case. Originating case number: 1:22-cv-00458. Mailed to: Michael Murali, Jerad Najvar, and Stephen Tosini. [1001613055] 24-1719 GMA [Entered: 08/02/2024 12:18 PM]
Related: [-]