Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:Richard L Young
Referred: Mark J Dinsmore
Case #: 1:24-cv-01320
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Terminated:Dec 16, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 4:49 AM EST
Defendant
HYK OUTDOORS LLC
Represented By
Jason P. Blair
Smith, Gambrell & Russell, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
HIKER INDUSTRIES, LLC
Represented By
Brad R. Maurer
Dentons Bingham Greenebaum Llp (indianapolis)
contact info
James M. Hinshaw
Dentons Bingham Greenebaum Llp (indianapolis)
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/05/2024 10:37 AM EDT
Monday, August 05, 2024
1 1 18 pgs COMPLAINT against HIKER INDUSTRIES, LLC, filed by HIKER INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8275973)(Hinshaw, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 15 Proposed Summons,
Att: 16 Proposed Summons
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Hinshaw on behalf of Plaintiff HIKER INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Hinshaw, James)
Related: [-]