Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Mark Pittman
Case #: 4:24-cv-00737
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 3:04 AM CST
Defendant
Michael Chad Cunningham
Represented By
Noelle M Reed
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom
contact info
Daniel Scott Mayerfeld
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Michelle Prejean Scheffler
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Adam Joseph Greenup
Snell & Wilmer
contact info
Jacob G Lefkowitz
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Aleem A Dhalia
Snell & Wilmer LLP
contact info
Ralph H Duggins
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Katherine R Hancock
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Zachary Adam Cooper
Snell & Wilmer
contact info
Defendant
Jason Andrew Potter
Represented By
Noelle M Reed
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom
contact info
Daniel Scott Mayerfeld
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Michelle Prejean Scheffler
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Adam Joseph Greenup
Snell & Wilmer
contact info
Jacob G Lefkowitz
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Aleem A Dhalia
Snell & Wilmer LLP
contact info
Ralph H Duggins
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Katherine R Hancock
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Zachary Adam Cooper
Snell & Wilmer
contact info
Defendant
duPont Publishing Inc.
Represented By
Noelle M Reed
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom
contact info
Daniel Scott Mayerfeld
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Michelle Prejean Scheffler
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Adam Joseph Greenup
Snell & Wilmer
contact info
Jacob G Lefkowitz
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Aleem A Dhalia
Snell & Wilmer LLP
contact info
Ralph H Duggins
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Katherine R Hancock
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Zachary Adam Cooper
Snell & Wilmer
contact info
Defendant
duPont Registry Connect LLC
Represented By
Noelle M Reed
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom
contact info
Daniel Scott Mayerfeld
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Michelle Prejean Scheffler
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Adam Joseph Greenup
Snell & Wilmer
contact info
Jacob G Lefkowitz
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP
contact info
Aleem A Dhalia
Snell & Wilmer LLP
contact info
Ralph H Duggins
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Katherine R Hancock
Cantey Hanger LLP
contact info
Zachary Adam Cooper
Snell & Wilmer
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Represented By
David Lattimore Evans
David L. Evans
contact info
Plaintiff
Givemethevin, LLC
Represented By
Timothy Davis
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Charles W Fillmore
The Fillmore Law Firm LLP
contact info
Trevor Paul
Jackson Walker LLP
contact info
Bryan D Bruner
Bruner & Bruner, P.C.
contact info
Lynne Brooks Frank
Bruner & Bruner PC
contact info
H Dustin Fillmore, III
The Fillmore Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
86 86 1 pgs order Judgment Fri 04/04 1:10 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT: This final judgment is issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a). In accordance with the Parties Agreed Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (ECF No.85 ), this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall transmit a true copy of this judgment to the Parties. Additionally, the Clerk of the Court shall return to Bruner & Bruner, P.C., counsel for Plaintiff, the $5,000 cash deposited by counsel in lieu of bond pursuant to this Courts previous Order (ECF No.30 ). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/4/2025) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
85 85 3 pgs misc Stipulation Mon 03/31 2:57 PM
Agreed STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Givemethevin, LLC. (Frank, Lynne)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Mon 03/31 3:17 PM
Civil Case Terminated per Stipulation of Dismissal- Pursuant to LR 79.2 and LCrR 55.2, exhibits may be claimed during the 60-day period following final disposition (to do so, follow the procedures found at[LINK:Exhibit Guide] ). The clerk will discard exhibits that remain unclaimed after the 60-day period without additional notice. (Clerk to notice any party not electronically noticed.) (wxc)
Related: [-]