Delaware District Court
Judge:John Campbell Barker
Case #: 1:24-cv-00913
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:1 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 3:43 AM EST
Defendant
Xencor, Inc.
Represented By
Daniel G. Mackrides
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Eric W. Dittmann
contact info
Naveen Modi
contact info
Daniel Zeilberger
contact info
Adam Wyatt Poff
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Robert M. Vrana
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Isaac S. Ashkenazi
contact info
Simon F. Kung
contact info
Ashley N. Mays-Williams
contact info
Plaintiff
Merus N.V.
Represented By
Jessica M. Stookey
contact info
Jack B. Blumenfeld
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Camille H. Mangiaratti
contact info
Peter J. Armenio
contact info
Jeremy A. Tigan
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP
contact info
Colleen Tracy James
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 05/06 9:19 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge John Campbell Barker of the Eastern District of Texas. Please include the initials of the Judge (JCB) after the case number on all documents filed. (alb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
29 29 misc Letter Mon 03/31 12:10 PM
Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Xencor's March 28, 2025 letter opposing Merus' request to set a Rule 16 conference - re28 Letter. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Fri 03/28 1:21 PM
Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Adam W. Poff regarding a response to Plaintiff's request to schedule a Rule 16 Conference - re27 Letter. (Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Letter Fri 03/28 11:49 AM
Letter to The Honorable Colm F. Connolly from Jeremy A. Tigan regarding Request for a Rule 16 Conference. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
26 26 misc Statement Wed 12/11 5:27 PM
STATEMENT re25 Notice (Other) Defendant Xencor, Inc.'s Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority by Xencor, Inc.. (Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
25 25 notice Notice - Other Mon 12/09 5:20 PM
NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Merus N.V. re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, November 15, 2024
24 24 misc Request for Oral Argument Fri 11/15 3:53 PM
REQUEST for Oral Argument by Xencor, Inc. re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Request for Oral Argument Fri 11/15 1:17 PM
REQUEST for Oral Argument by Merus N.V. re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
22 22 respm Brief - Reply Thu 11/14 4:48 PM
REPLY BRIEF re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Xencor, Inc.. (Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
21 21 misc Declaration Thu 10/31 4:36 PM
DECLARATION re20 Answering Brief in Opposition by Merus N.V..(Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
20 20 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Thu 10/31 4:34 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Merus N.V..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 11/7/2024. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
19 19 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Thu 10/24 9:08 AM
SO ORDERED, re18 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME, Set Briefing Schedule: re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . (Answering Brief due 10/31/2024., Reply Brief due 11/14/2024). Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/24/2024. (mws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
18 18 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 10/23 2:58 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for (1) Plaintiff to file an answering brief in opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (D.I. 12), and (2) Defendant to file a reply brief in support of its Motion to October 31, 2024 and November 14, 2024, respectively - filed by Merus N.V.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
order SO ORDERED Tue 10/15 9:59 AM
SO ORDERED, re15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Dittmann, Isaac S. Ashkenazi, Ashley N. Mays-Williams, Naveen Modi, Daniel Zeilberger, and Simon F. Kung filed by Xencor, Inc.. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/15/2024. (mws)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Tue 10/15 10:39 AM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Isaac S. Ashkenazi, Naveen Modi, Simon F. Kung, Ashley N. Mays-Williams, Daniel Zeilberger, Eric W. Dittman for Xencor, Inc. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
17 17 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Mon 10/14 2:10 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Naveen Modi, Daniel Zeilberger, and Simon F. Kung. ( re15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Dittmann, Isaac S. Ashkenazi, Ashley N. Mays-Williams, Naveen Modi, Daniel Zeilberger, and Simon F. Kung )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4522586).(Vrana, Robert)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Mon 10/14 2:07 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Eric W. Dittmann, Isaac S. Ashkenazi, and Ashley N. Mays-Williams. ( re15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Dittmann, Isaac S. Ashkenazi, Ashley N. Mays-Williams, Naveen Modi, Daniel Zeilberger, and Simon F. Kung )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4522585).(Vrana, Robert)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 10/14 2:03 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Eric W. Dittmann, Isaac S. Ashkenazi, Ashley N. Mays-Williams, Naveen Modi, Daniel Zeilberger, and Simon F. Kung - filed by Xencor, Inc.. (Vrana, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
14 14 misc Declaration Thu 10/10 4:58 PM
DECLARATION re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim //DECLARATION OF SIMON F. KUNG by Xencor, Inc..(Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
13 13 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Thu 10/10 4:56 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Xencor, Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 10/24/2024. (Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Thu 10/10 4:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by Xencor, Inc..(Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Thu 10/10 4:52 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc. for Xencor, Inc. filed by Xencor, Inc.. (Poff, Adam)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 08/26 8:29 AM
SO ORDERED, re10 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 10, 2024, filed by Xencor, Inc. Reset Answer Deadlines: Xencor, Inc. answer due 10/10/2024. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/26/2024. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
10 10 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Fri 08/23 5:03 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to October 10, 2024 - filed by Xencor, Inc.. (Mackrides, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 08/22 1:21 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Camille H. Mangiaratti, Peter J. Armenio, Colleen Tracy James, Jessica M. Stookey for Merus N.V. added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
9 9 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 04 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Thu 08/08 2:38 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Peter J. Armenio, Colleen Tracy James, Jessica M. Stookey, and Camille H. Mangiaratti. ( re8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Armenio, Colleen Tracy James, Jessica M. Stookey, and Camille H. Mangiaratti )( Payment of $ 200, receipt number ADEDC-4471707).(Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/08 2:36 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Armenio, Colleen Tracy James, Jessica M. Stookey, and Camille H. Mangiaratti - filed by Merus N.V.. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 08/08 2:45 PM
SO ORDERED, re8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter J. Armenio, Colleen Tracy James, Jessica M. Stookey, and Camille H. Mangiaratti, filed by Merus N.V. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 8/8/2024. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Wed 08/07 2:17 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/07 12:47 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 08/05 2:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Merus N.V..Xencor, Inc. served on 8/5/2024, answer due 8/26/2024. (Tigan, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 08/05 1:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Xencor, Inc. on 8/5/2024. (oam)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Mon 08/05 1:31 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Merus N.V.. (oam)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Mon 08/05 1:31 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 9,358,286 B2; 9,944,695 B2; 11,926,859 B2. (oam)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Mon 08/05 1:30 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (oam)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/05 1:29 PM
COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Xencor, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4468317.) - filed by Merus N.V..(oam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-5,
Att: 2 Exhibit 6-14,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet