Wallace v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Bloom |
Referred: | Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-22972 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Nov 04, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 4:44 AM EST |
Defendant
Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Carlos Burruezo
911 Outer Road
Orlando, FL 32814 |
|
Plaintiff
Lynette Wallace
14520 Monroe St.
Miami, FL 33176 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, November 04, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. All pending motions are denied as MOOT and all deadlines are TERMINATED. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/31/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() MOTION to Voluntary Dismiss case by Lynette Wallace. Responses due by 11/14/2024. (ebz) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 10/28 2:55 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: On September 24, 2024, the Court granted the Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel, ECF No.13 . In that Order, Plaintiff was directed to either retain counsel or notify the Court of her intention to proceed pro se . Id. To date, Plaintiff has failed to comply. Accordingly, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that on or before November 4, 2024 , Plaintiff shall comply with the requirements of the Order and shall either retain counsel or notify the Court of her intention to proceed pro se . Failure to comply will result in sanctions, including dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ap01) |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 10/29 10:41 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Deadline to obtain new counsel 11/4/2024. Per DE 18 Order. (ebz) |
||
Monday, October 21, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION before Carlos Burruezo. Mediation Hearing set for 5/8/2025 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/18/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
Friday, October 18, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() NOTICE of Mediator Selection. and Scheduling Mediation Selected/Added Carlos Burruezo as Mediator. (Masterson, Brittany) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Brian Moody on behalf of Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. Attorney Eric Brian Moody added to party Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (Moody, Eric) |
|
Friday, September 27, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 11/26/2024., Discovery due by 4/29/2025., Fact Discovery due by 4/29/2025., Expert Discovery due by 4/29/2025., Joinder of Parties due by 11/26/2024., Mediation Deadline 5/13/2025., In Limine Motions due by 8/11/2025., Dispositive Motions due by 5/21/2025., Motions due by 5/21/2025., Pretrial Stipulation due by 8/11/2025., Jury Trial set for 8/25/2025 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 8/19/2025 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 5/13/2025.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/27/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL re12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. R Edward Rosenberg representing Wallace, Lynette (Plaintiff) withdrawn from case. Deadline to obtain new counsel 10/24/2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by R. Edward Rosenberg for / by Lynette Wallace. Responses due by 10/8/2024.(Rosenberg, R) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lightning Cayman Merger Sub, Ltd., Corporate Parent Sedgwick, L.P., Corporate Parent The Carlyle Group, Corporate Parent Sedgwick Holdings II, L.P., Other Affiliate Stone Point Capital, Other Affiliate La Caisse de depot et placement du Quebec, Other Affiliate Onex Corporation for Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Masterson, Brittany) |
|
10 | 10
![]() ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand and Incorporated Motion to Strike Claim for Compensatory and Punitive Damages under the ADEA and Compensatory Damages under the FMLA by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Masterson, Brittany) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brittany Dominque Masterson on behalf of Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. Attorney Brittany Dominque Masterson added to party Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft). (Masterson, Brittany) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
Thu 09/05 1:28 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No.6 , Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file it's answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or before September 16, 2024. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ebn) |
|
6 | 6
![]() Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Complaint by Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amy Kathleen Recla on behalf of Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. Attorney Amy Kathleen Recla added to party Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.(pty:dft). |
|
utility
~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline
Fri 09/06 4:21 PM
Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. response/answer due 9/16/2024. Per DE 7 Order. (ebz) |
||
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/6/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (ar24) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 08/05 1:37 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Marty Fulgueira Elfenbein is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ar24) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17732308, filed by Lynette Wallace.(Rosenberg, R) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |