Nebraska District Court
Judge:Brian C Buescher
Referred: Michael D Nelson
Case #: 8:24-cv-00306
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Terminated:Dec 30, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 2:34 AM CST
Defendant
United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Kenneth W. Hartman
Baird, Holm Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Kerry Dobson
Represented By
Gary M. Klinger
Milberg, Coleman Law Firm - Illinois
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, December 30, 2024
10 10 motion Notice of Case Dismissal Mon 12/30 11:56 AM
NOTICE of Case Dismissal Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice by Attorney Gary M. Klinger on behalf of Plaintiff Kerry Dobson (Klinger, Gary)
Related: [-]
utility Remark - Public Mon 12/30 1:03 PM
Remark - Public: This case has been dismissed pursuant to the filing of a Notice of Case Dismissal. (TCL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/06 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Kenneth W. Hartman on behalf of Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company (Hartman, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
8 8 order Order - Text Only ~Util - Set/Reset All Deadlines Mon 11/04 5:05 PM
TEXT ORDER - After review of the parties' Joint Status Report and Request to Continue Stay7 , this case shall remain stayed. The parties shall file another joint report regarding the status of the approval of the class action settlement on or before January 3, 2024 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
Related: [-]
7 7 oth_doc Status Report Mon 11/04 11:29 AM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Attorney Gary M. Klinger on behalf of Plaintiff Kerry Dobson.(Klinger, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 08/23 4:39 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed pending approval of the class action settlement in Skinner v United of Omaha Life Insurance Company, No. D01CI240006396. The Clerk of Court shall terminate all pending deadlines, including the deadline for the defendant to file an answer or other responsive pleading. On or before October 22, 2024, the parties shall file a joint report regarding the status of the approval of the class action settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (ADB)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Stay Fri 08/23 12:49 PM
JOINT MOTION to Stay by Attorney Gary M. Klinger on behalf of Plaintiff Kerry Dobson.(Klinger, Gary)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Fri 08/23 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Attorney Gary M. Klinger on behalf of Plaintiff Kerry Dobson (Klinger, Gary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 08/14 2:54 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. Waiver sent on 8/7/2024. (Klinger, Gary)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Mon 08/05 3:13 PM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
Related: [-]
1 1 58 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/05 1:34 PM
COMPLAINT with jury demand Class Action Complaint against United of Omaha Life Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5136871), by Attorney Gary M. Klinger on behalf of Kerry Dobson(Klinger, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons