Indiana Southern District Court
Judge:Sarah Evans Barker
Referred: Kellie M Barr
Case #: 1:24-cv-01321
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983d Civil Rights (Death)
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 4:49 AM EST
Defendant
KERRY J. FORESTAL
Represented By
Anthony W. Overholt
Frost Brown Todd LLP
contact info
Defendant
MARION COUNTY, INDIANA SHERIFF'S OFFICE
Represented By
Anthony W. Overholt
Frost Brown Todd LLP
contact info
Defendant
THE HEALTH AND HOSPITAL CORPORATION OF MARION COUNTY d/b/a ESKENAZI HEALTH
Represented By
Pamela G. Schneeman
Clark Johnson & Knight, Ltd.
contact info
Rosemary L. Borek
Clark Johnson & Knight, Ltd.
contact info
Plaintiff
JOHN DURM, JR.
Represented By
Michael W. Phelps
Hankey Marks & Crider
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2025
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS - Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, dkt. 9, is GRANTED as to the claims against the Marion County Sheriff's Office and Sheriff Forestall. The case shall proceed as to the remaining parties. SEE ORDER. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 3/31/2025. (KAA)

Docket last updated: 08/07/2024 11:57 AM EDT
Monday, August 05, 2024
1 1 12 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by JOHN DURM, JR. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AINSDC-8277060)(Phelps, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael W. Phelps on behalf of Plaintiff JOHN DURM, JR. (Phelps, Michael)
Related: [-]