Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean D Jordan
Referred: Bill Davis
Case #: 4:24-cv-00698
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 2:38 AM CST
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
Represented By
Peter Samir Wahby
Greenberg Traurig, Llp - Dallas
contact info
Cory Ford
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Morgan Jones
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Plaintiff
Dilip Jana
800 Fairlawn St
Allen, TX 75002


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
62 62 notice Notice (Other) Mon 05/05 9:37 AM
Plaintiff's Declaration of Defendant's Incomplete/Evasive Initial Disclosure and Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Supplemental Initial Disclosure52 by Dilip Jana(CLC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Thursday, May 01, 2025
61 61 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/01 4:39 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE to the Court on Order (Dkt60 ) to Strike Plaintiff's Response (Dkt58 ) by Dilip Jana(CLC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
60 60 2 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 05/01 1:51 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is ORDERED that Jana's response, Dkt.58 , is STRUCK and that Walmart's motion, Dkt.51 , is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bill Davis on 5/1/2025. (CLC)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
59 59 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 04/28 4:02 PM
RESPONSE in Support re51 MOTION for Protective Order Defendants Reply in Support of its Motion for Entry of Protective Order filed by Walmart, Inc. . (Jones, Morgan)
Related: [-]