Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Ed Kinkeade
Case #: 3:24-cv-01995
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Case in other court:County Court at Law No. 3, Dallas County, CC-24-04450-C
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 3:05 AM CST
Defendant
Arch Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Kristin C Cummings
Zelle LLP
contact info
Mariana P Best
Zelle LLP
contact info
Defendant
Crawford & Company
Represented By
Bradley E Chambers
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC
contact info
Alexis Nicole Del Rio
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC
contact info
Emma Perez McKellar
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC
contact info
Defendant
St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Registered Agent: The Summit Enterprises, Inc. 1301 E. Collins Blvd.
Richardson, TX 75801
Represented By
Wm Lance Lewis
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC
contact info
Alissa Puckett
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC
contact info
Defendant
American Specialty Insurance & Risk Services Inc
Represented By
Kristin C Cummings
Zelle LLP
contact info
Mariana P Best
Zelle LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
TNT Gaming Center LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Weber Johnson
Law Office Of Mark A Ticer
contact info
Mark A Ticer
Law Office Of Mark A Ticer
contact info
Plaintiff
TNT Family Entertainment Inc
Represented By
Jennifer Weber Johnson
Law Office Of Mark A Ticer
contact info
Mark A Ticer
Law Office Of Mark A Ticer
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Neal Anderson
Terminated: 12/10/2024
Represented By
Bradley E Chambers
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC
contact info
Alexis Nicole Del Rio
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC
contact info
Emma Perez McKellar
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC
contact info
Defendant
Christian Auxier
Terminated: 12/10/2024
Represented By
Bradley E Chambers
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC
contact info
Alexis Nicole Del Rio
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC
contact info
Emma Perez McKellar
Baker Donelson Bearman Caldwell & Berkowitz PC
contact info
Defendant
Michael Trumbull
Terminated: 12/10/2024
Represented By
Wm Lance Lewis
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC
contact info
Alissa Puckett
Quilling Selander Lownds Winslett & Moser PC
contact info
Defendant
Nancy Weis
Terminated: 01/07/2025
Represented By
Kristin C Cummings
Zelle LLP
contact info
Mariana P Best
Zelle LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
39 39 11 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Wed 03/12 9:41 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Because Arch met its burden of proof in moving for abatement, the Court grants Arch's Opposed Motion to Abate Pending Examinations Under Oath (Doc. No. 4). The Court hereby ABATES this case. Plaintiff TnT Family SHALL submit its representatives for EUOs as requested by Arch pursuant to the Policy.Plaintiffs and Arch are DIRECTED to file a joint status report by May 19, 2025, informing the Court whether the EUOs of Plaintiff TnT Family's representatives have been completed. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 3/11/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
38 38 respm Reply Tue 01/28 10:33 AM
REPLY filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company re:4 Opposed MOTION to Abate Pending Examinations Under Oath With Brief in Support (Cummings, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Thursday, January 09, 2025
37 37 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 01/09 1:39 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: In light of Plaintiffs' Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Nancy Weis Only and Without Prejudice (Doc. No. 35), the Court hereby DENIES as moot Defendant Nancy Weis' Motion for Partial Dismissal (Doc. No. 3). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 1/9/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
36 36 respm Response/Objection Tue 01/07 7:41 PM
RESPONSE filed by TNT Gaming Center LLC, TNT Family Entertainment Inc re:4 Opposed MOTION to Abate Pending Examinations Under Oath With Brief in Support (Johnson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 5a,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 5b,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 6,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 7,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) 8,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) 9,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) 10,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) 11,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) 12,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) 13,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) 14,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) 15,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) 16,
Att: 18 Proposed Order Proposed Order
35 35 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/07 7:31 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant Nancy Weis Only and Without Prejudice filed by TNT Gaming Center LLC, TNT Family Entertainment Inc (Johnson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
34 34 order Order Tue 12/10 12:07 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The Court hereby RESETS the parties' response and reply deadlines for: (1) Defendant Nancy Weis' Motion for Partial Dismissal (Doc. No. 3); and (2) Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company's Opposed Motion to Abate Pending Examinations Under Oath (Doc. No. 4). In light of the upcoming holidays, the Court is allowing additional time for filing the responses and replies. Responses to said motions shall be filed by January 7, 2025. Replies shall be filed by January 28, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/10/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
33 33 22 pgs order Memorandum Opinion and Order Tue 12/10 11:56 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - Before the Court is the Motion for Remand (the "Motion")(Doc. No. 10) filed by Plaintiffs TnT Gaming Center LLC and TnT Family Entertainment, Inc. Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company file a Response in Opposition (the "Response") (Doc. No. 23). Plaintiffs filed a Reply (the "Reply") (Doc. No. 29) in further support. The Court has carefully considered the Motion, the Response, the Reply, the relevant portions of the record, and the applicable law. Having considered the allegations in Plaintiffs' state court petition, the Court concludes there is no reasonable basis to predict that Plaintiffs might recover against the non-diverse Defendants Michael Trumbull, Christian Auxier, and Neal Anderson. Accordingly, the Court finds Defendants Michael Trumbull, Christian Auxier, and Neal Anderson were improperly joined which compels their DISMISSAL without prejudice. Because the remaining parties are completely diverse in their citizenship and the jurisdictional amount in controversy is met, the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over this matter and hereby DENIES Plaintiffs' Motion to remand. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 12/10/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
32 32 order Order Thu 11/07 6:20 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Pending determination of Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand (Doc. No. 10), the Court hereby STAYS Defendant Nancy Weis' Motion for Partial Dismissal (Doc. No. 3) and Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company's Opposed Motion to Abate Pending Examinations Under Oath (Doc. No. 4) (together, the "Defendants' Motions"). The parties' deadlines to file a response and reply to Defendants' Motions are hereby terminated . See Doc. No. 31. The Court will reset the parties' responsive briefing deadlines, if necessary, by separate order. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 11/7/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
31 31 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Thu 10/17 11:20 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Response to Defendant Nancy Weis' Motion for Partial Dismissal and Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company's Opposed Motion to Abate Pending Examinations Under Oath (the "Motion") (Doc. No.30). Having carefully considered the Motion, the Court finds good cause for the requested extension of time and GRANTS the Motion. The requested deadline of December 1, 2024, falls on a Sunday, therefore the Court modifies the extended deadline. Plaintiffs shall file their response to the pending motions by December 2, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 10/17/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
30 30 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/16 4:44 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to4 Opposed MOTION to Abate Pending Examinations Under Oath With Brief in Support ,3 MOTION for Partial Dismissal filed by TNT Family Entertainment Inc, TNT Gaming Center LLC (Johnson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Their Response
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
29 29 respm Reply Wed 10/09 9:53 PM
REPLY filed by TNT Family Entertainment Inc, TNT Gaming Center LLC re:10 MOTION to Remand (Ticer, Mark)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
28 28 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 09/27 1:11 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TNT Gaming Center LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Johnson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 09/27 1:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by TNT Family Entertainment Inc. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Johnson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
26 26 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 09/26 12:13 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Crawford & Company. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (McKellar, Emma)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Amended Document Thu 09/26 12:10 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Neal Anderson. Amendment to19 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. . (McKellar, Emma)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Amended Document Thu 09/26 12:06 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Christian Auxier. Amendment to18 Cert. Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement. . (McKellar, Emma)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
23 23 respm Response/Objection Wed 09/25 5:54 PM
RESPONSE filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company re:10 MOTION to Remand (Cummings, Kristin)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Wed 09/25 1:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Nancy Weis. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Cummings, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
21 21 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 09/24 1:47 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Michael Trumbull. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Puckett, Alissa)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
20 20 order Order Mon 09/23 1:34 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company ("Arch") removed this case to federal court on the basis of diversity jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a). Doc. No. 1 at 3. Certificates of interested parties assist the Court in determining whether recusal is necessary. Furthermore, when the Court's subject matter jurisdiction is based on § 1332(a), Rule 7.1(a)(2) requires that each party's disclosure statement "name--and identify the citizenship of--every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party[.]" Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) (emphasis added). Defendants Christian Auxier and Neal Anderson filed their respective Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties (Doc. Nos. 18 & 19) but neither filing includes the disclosure statement of that named Defendant's citizenship as required by Rule 7.1(a)(2). Accordingly, said named Defendants shall each file an amended certificate of interested parties by September 30, 2024. Further, the docket reflects that Defendants Nancy Weis, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Michael Trumbull, and Crawford & Company have not filed a separately signed certificate of interested parties as required by Local Civil Rule 81.1. Plaintiffs TnT Gaming Center LLC and TnT Family Entertainment, Inc. ("Plaintiffs") likewise have not filed a certificate of interested parties as required by Local Civil Rule 81.2. These parties shall file said document by September 30, 2024. Finally, Defendants Arch and American Specialty Insurance Risk Services, Inc. appear to be under the mistaken impression that because Arch removed this matter arguing improper joinder of Defendants Michael Trumbull, Christian Auxier, and Neal Anderson, "these named defendants are longer parties to this litigation." Doc. No. 14-28 at 1 n.1 see id. at 2-3. This is a completely inaccurate statement. Removal of this case is proper only if Defendants Michael Trumbull, Christian Auxier, and Neal Anderson were all improperly joined. See Hicks v. Martinrea Auto. Structures (USA), Inc. , 12 F.4th 511, 514 (5th Cir. 2021). In their Motion to Remand, Plaintiffs specifically challenge removal of this case on the basis of improper joinder of these named Defendants. See generally Doc. No. 10. This remand motion is not yet ripe and, therefore, the Court has not determined whether removal of this matter was in fact proper. See Hicks , 12 F.4th at 515 (discussing Rule 12(b)(6)-type inquiry courts use in determining "whether there is 'no possibility of recovery by the plaintiff against an in-state defendant'" thereby demonstrating improper joinder) (quoting Smallwood v. Ill. Cent. R.R. Co. , 385 F.3d 568, 573 (5th Cir. 2004) (en banc)). To be sure, as of the entry of this Order, Defendants Michael Trumbull, Christian Auxier, and Neal Anderson are still parties to this action. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/23/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
19 19 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 09/20 5:20 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Neal Anderson. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (McKellar, Emma)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 09/20 5:17 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Christian Auxier. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (McKellar, Emma)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/19 1:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Neal Anderson. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Chambers, Bradley)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/19 1:20 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Christian Auxier. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Chambers, Bradley)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 09/19 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexis Nicole Del Rio on behalf of Neal Anderson, Christian Auxier, Crawford & Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Del Rio, Alexis)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
14 14 misc Amended Document Mon 09/09 5:06 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Arch Specialty Insurance Company. Amendment to1 Notice of Removal,,,,,,,. . (Cummings, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A - Index,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B - State Court Docket,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C-1 - State Petition,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) C-2,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) C-3,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) C-4,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) C-5,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) C-6,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) C-7,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) C-8,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) C-9,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) C-10,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) C-11,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) C-12,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) C-13,
Att: 18 Exhibit(s) C-14,
Att: 19 Exhibit(s) C-15,
Att: 20 Exhibit(s) C-16,
Att: 21 Exhibit(s) C-17,
Att: 22 Exhibit(s) C-18,
Att: 23 Exhibit(s) C-19,
Att: 24 Exhibit(s) C-20,
Att: 25 Exhibit(s) C-21,
Att: 26 Exhibit(s) C-22,
Att: 27 Exhibit(s) C-23,
Att: 28 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 29 Exhibit(s) E-1,
Att: 30 Exhibit(s) E-2,
Att: 31 Exhibit(s) E-3,
Att: 32 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 33 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 34 Exhibit(s) H,
Att: 35 Exhibit(s) I,
Att: 36 Exhibit(s) J,
Att: 37 Exhibit(s) K
Thursday, September 05, 2024
13 13 6 pgs order Order Thu 09/05 11:44 AM
ORDER: This Order governs requests to file materials in this case under seal. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/5/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Order Thu 09/05 11:32 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Civil Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where the attorney of record for a party does not reside or maintain their principal office in this district. Defendants Crawford & Company, Neal Anderson, and Christian Auxier shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Civil Rule 83.10(a) by September 19, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/5/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order Thu 09/05 11:13 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER Jurisdictional Deficiency. The Court has "an independent obligation to determine whether subject-matter jurisdiction exists, even in the absence of a challenge from any party." Arbaugh v. Y&H Corp. , 546 U.S. 500, 514 (2006) (citing Ruhrgas AG v. Marathon Oil Co. , 526 U.S. 574, 583 (1999)). Defendant Arch Specialty Insurance Company ("Arch") removed this case to federal court on the basis of diversity jurisdiction, 28 U.S.C. § 1332(a). Doc. No. 1 at 3. Accordingly, the parties' citizenship must be completely diverse in that one of the plaintiffs cannot share the same state citizenship as one of the defendants. See Corfield v. Dallas Glen Hills LP , 355 F.3d 853, 857 (5th Cir. 2003). "When jurisdiction depends on citizenship, citizenship must be 'distinctly and affirmatively alleged.'" Getty Oil Corp., a Div. of Texaco v. Ins. Co. of N. Am. , 841 F.2d 1254, 1259 (5th Cir. 1988). Defendant Arch's citizenship allegations as to Teresa Walles and Tara Harris, as members of Plaintiff TnT Gaming Center LLC ("TnT Gaming"), and as to Defendant Neal Anderson are insufficient for diversity purposes. "For natural persons, § 1332 citizenship is determined by domicile, which requires residency plus an intent to make the place of residency one's permanent home." SXSW, L.L.C. v. Fed. Ins. Co. , 83 F.4th 405, 407 (5th Cir. 2023) (citing Gilbert v. David , 235 U.S. 561, 568-69 (1915)); accord MidCap Media Fin., L.L.C. v. Pathway Data, Inc. , 929 F.3d 310, 313 (5th Cir. 2019) ("Citizenship and residence, as often declared by this court, are not synonymous terms.") (quoting Robertson v. Cease , 97 U.S. 646, 648 (1878)). The allegation that Teresa Walles and Tara Harris "are natural persons who reside and/or are domiciled in the State of Texas" does not distinctly and affirmatively allege their citizenship for diversity purposes. Doc. No. 1 at 4 (emphasis added). Without their citizenship, the citizenship of Plaintiff TnT Gaming cannot be determined. See Carden v. Arkoma Assocs. , 494 U.S. 185, 196 (1990). Likewise, the allegation that Defendant Anderson is "a resident of the State of Texas" does not distinctly and affirmatively allege his citizenship for diversity purposes. Id. at 6. Even though it asserts that Defendant Anderson has been improperly joined, Defendant Arch must nevertheless properly allege his citizenship. Defendant Arch, the party seeking the federal forum, bears the burden of establishing the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. See St. Paul Reinsurance Co. v. Greenburg , 134 F.3d 1250, 1253 (5th Cir. 1998). Because Defendant Arch failed to "distinctly and affirmatively" allege each party's citizenship, it is not certain that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction. See Getty Oil , 841 F.2d at 1259. Defendant Arch may amend its Notice of Removal in accordance with this Order by September 12, 2024. If Defendant Arch fails to amend or to do so sufficiently, this case will be remanded without further notice. 28 U.S.C. § 1447(c) (in action removed from state court, federal court must remand case any time before final judgment if court determines it lacks subject matter jurisdiction). (Ordered by Judge Ed Kinkeade on 9/5/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
10 10 motion Remand Wed 09/04 7:55 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by TNT Family Entertainment Inc, TNT Gaming Center LLC with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Johnson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
9 9 misc Court Request For Recusal Tue 09/03 2:49 PM
Court Request for Recusal: Judge Karen Gren Scholer recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Ed Kinkeade for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:24-cv-1995-K. (frw)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/23 9:23 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that7 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, to and including November 1, 2024 , is GRANTED . (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 8/23/2024) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/22 5:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to4 Opposed MOTION to Abate Pending Examinations Under Oath With Brief in Support ,3 MOTION for Partial Dismissal filed by TNT Family Entertainment Inc, TNT Gaming Center LLC (Johnson, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
6 6 misc Court Request For Recusal Wed 08/21 11:50 AM
Court Request for Recusal: Senior Judge A. Joe Fish recused. Pursuant to instruction in Special Order 3-249, the Clerk has reassigned the case to Judge Karen Gren Scholer for all further proceedings. Future filings should indicate the case number as: 3:24-cv-1995-S. (cea)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
5 5 respm Appendix in Support Mon 08/12 8:01 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company re4 MOTION to Stay (Opposed) Pending Examinations Under Oath With Brief in Support (Cummings, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) A-1,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A-2,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) A-3,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) A-4,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) A-5,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) A-6,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) A-7,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) A-8,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) A-9,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) C
4 4 motion Stay Mon 08/12 7:40 PM
MOTION to Stay (Opposed) Pending Examinations Under Oath With Brief in Support filed by Arch Specialty Insurance Company with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Cummings, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
3 3 motion Dismiss Mon 08/12 6:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss (Partial Dismissal and Brief in Support) filed by Nancy Weis with Brief/Memorandum in Support.Attorney Kristin C Cummings added to party Nancy Weis(pty:dft) (Cummings, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 05, 2024
2 2 qcref Fish Tue 08/06 9:51 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (cfk)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 08/05 5:50 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by American Specialty Insurance & Risk Services, Inc., Arch Specialty Insurance Company. (Filing fee $405; receipt number ATXNDC-14816365) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Cummings, Kristin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cover Sheet Supplement,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) A - Index,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) B - State Court Docket,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) C-1 - State Petition,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) C-2,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) C-3,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) C-4,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) C-5,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) C-6,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) C-7,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) C-8,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) C-9,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) C-10,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) C-11,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) C-12,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) C-13,
Att: 18 Exhibit(s) C-14,
Att: 19 Exhibit(s) C-15,
Att: 20 Exhibit(s) C-16,
Att: 21 Exhibit(s) C-17,
Att: 22 Exhibit(s) C-18,
Att: 23 Exhibit(s) C-19,
Att: 24 Exhibit(s) C-20,
Att: 25 Exhibit(s) D - COIP,
Att: 26 Exhibit(s) E-1,
Att: 27 Exhibit(s) E-2,
Att: 28 Exhibit(s) E-3,
Att: 29 Exhibit(s) F