New York Northern District Court
Judge:Brenda K Sannes
Referred: Miroslav Lovric
Case #: 6:24-cv-00956
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 29, 2025 4:29 AM EST
Defendant
Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By
Erin W Grewe
Campbell Conroy & O'Neil, PC
contact info
Defendant
Shen Zhen Shi Xin Cai Shi Xun Dian Zi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si
Defendant
Shenzhen Tejiali Technology Co., LTD
Plaintiff
Gregory George
Represented By
Kevin A. Luibrand
Luibrand Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
20 20 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 05/05 9:00 AM
TEXT ORDER: The deadline for Plaintiff to complete service of process on Defendants Shenzhen Tejiali Technology Co., LTD AND Shen Zhen Shi Xin Cai Shi Xun Dian Zi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si, and to file affidavits of service expired on 5/2/2025. At Dkt. No. 16, Plaintiff filed what appears to be an affidavit of service which is to a large degree in a foreign language. Text Notice dated 3/13/2025 directed Plaintiff to file a fully translated affidavit of service in the English language. Plaintiff has failed to comply with Text Notice dated 3/13/2025. The Clerk of Court is unable to schedule a deadline for these two Defendants to respond to the complaint without a clearly translated affidavit of service. Additionally, the Court is unable to conclude from this filing that service of process was properly made. Even as filed, it appears that the foreign language affidavit of service indicates that only one of these two Defendants was properly served. A properly translated affidavit of service may explain all of that. No later than 5/12/2025, Plaintiff shall comply with Text Notice dated 3/13/2025 as previously filed on the Docket. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 5/5/2025. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
19 19 14 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 8:51 AM
ORDER granting18 Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 5/1/2025. (jdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
18 18 misc Stipulation Wed 04/30 1:35 PM
STIPULATION Protective Order by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Grewe, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
17 17 adr Stipulation Selecting Mediator Thu 04/10 10:51 AM
STIPULATION SELECTING MEDIATOR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that Terence P. OConnor has been selected, contacted and has agreed to serve as Mediator for this action. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, that counsel will participate in the mediation session in good faith and confer with the Mediator regarding the scheduling of additional conferences, bearing in mind the deadline for completion of Mediation set forth in the Court's Order Referring the Case to Mediation. Stipulation signed by: Kevin A. Luibrand and Erin W. Grewe. Dated: 4/09/2025(Grewe, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
notice Notice - Other Thu 03/13 9:51 AM
TEXT NOTICE: re16 Affidavit of Service, Counsel is advised to file an affidavit of service that must be filed in the English language demonstrating which Defendant was actually served, when, by whom, who accepted service, and what documents did the process serve on a particular Defendant. This filing being in a foreign language makes all those facts unclear. (bas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
16 16 service Affidavit of Service Wed 03/12 11:30 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Hague warning page, summons, complaint and General Order #25 served on Shenzhen Tejiali Technology Co., LTD on 12/13/2024, filed by Gregory George. (Luibrand, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mandatory Mediation Thu 03/06 3:03 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mandatory Mediation. Deadline for Mediator Selection is 4/3/2025. Deadline for completion of Mandatory Mediation is 6/30/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/6/2025. (jdc )
Related: [-]
14 14 order Uniform Pretrial Scheduling Order Thu 03/06 3:01 PM
UNIFORM PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Anticipated length of trial: 5. Preferred Trial Location: Albany. Joinder of Parties due by 4/1/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 4/1/2025. Discovery due by 11/3/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Disclosure Deadline is 8/5/2025. Defendants Expert Disclosure Deadline is 9/19/2025. Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline is 10/6/2025. Motions to be filed by 12/1/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/6/2025. (jdc )
Related: [-]
13 13 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/06 2:52 PM
TEXT ORDER: On or before 5/16/2025, the parties shall file status reports regarding the progress of the litigation. A telephone conference is scheduled for 5/30/2025 at 11:00AM, via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 3/6/2025.(jdc )
Related: [-]
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Thu 03/06 2:48 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric: an initial conference was held on 3/6/2025. Pretrial deadlines were discussed and set. A telephone conference is scheduled for 5/30/2025 at 11:00AM, via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. Appearances: K. Luibrand, Esq. for the Plaintiff and E. Grewe, Esq. for Defendant Amazon. (jdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
12 12 misc Civil Case Management Plan Fri 02/28 12:36 PM
CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Gregory George. (Luibrand, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
11 11 order Order on Letter Request Tue 02/04 8:50 AM
TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion10 is GRANTED insofar as and to the extent that the deadline for Plaintiff to complete service of process on Defendants Shenzhen Tejiali Technology Co., LTD and Shen Zhen Shi Xin Cai Shi Xun Dian Zi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si and to file affidavits of service is extended to 5/2/2025. The Rule 16 Initial Conference will proceed as scheduled on 3/6/2025 at 11:00 a.m., via Teams teleconference, before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/27/2025. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court. The Court will not delay any further the setting of schedules and proceeding with discovery. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 2/4/2025. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
10 10 motion Letter Request/Motion Mon 02/03 4:22 PM
Letter Motion from Kevin A. Luibrand, Esq. for Gregory George requesting extension of time to serve process submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Luibrand, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
9 9 misc FRCP 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/27 2:17 PM
FRCP 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amazon.com, Inc.. (Grewe, Erin)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/27 2:15 PM
Amazon's ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Amazon.com, Inc..(Grewe, Erin)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Fri 09/13 9:26 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons, complaint and General Order #25 served on Amazon.com, Inc. on August 23, 2024, filed by Gregory George. (Luibrand, Kevin)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Fri 09/13 10:16 AM
***Answer due date updated for Amazon.com, Inc.: Answer due 9/13/2024. (amt)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
6 6 order Order on Letter Request Mon 09/09 1:03 PM
TEXT ORDER: Letter Motion5 is GRANTED In Part and DENIED In Part insofar as and to the extent that the deadline for Plaintiff to complete service of process on Defendants Shenzhen Tejiali Technology Co., LTD and Shen Zhen Shi Xin Cai Shi Xun Dian Zi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si and to file affidavits of service is extended to 2/3/2025. No later than 9/20/2024, Plaintiff shall file on the docket an affidavit of service as to Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. The Rule 16 Initial Conference scheduled for 12/11/2024 is RE-SCHEDULED for 3/6/2025 at 11:00 a.m., via Teams teleconference, before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. The Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/27/2025. Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court. SO ORDERED by U.S. Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric on 9/9/2024. (jdc )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
5 5 motion Letter Request/Motion Fri 09/06 3:11 PM
Letter Motion from Kevin A. Luibrand, Esq. for Gregory George requesting extension of time to serve process submitted to Judge Miroslav Lovric . (Luibrand, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
4 4 misc G.O. 25 Filing Order Mon 08/05 12:15 PM
G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 12/11/2024 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 12/4/2024. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (mmg).
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 08/05 12:14 PM
Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc., Shen Zhen Shi Xin Cai Shi Xun Dian Zi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si, Shenzhen Tejiali Technology Co., LTD.(mmg).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Issued as to Shen Zhen Shi Xin Cai Shi Xun Dian Zi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si,
Att: 2 Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc.
notice Notice - Other Mon 08/05 1:02 PM
TEXT NOTICE: The Initial Conference Scheduled for 12/11/2024 at 10:00AM before Magistrate Judge Miroslav Lovric, will be held via Microsoft Teams Teleconferencing. The Courtroom Deputy will send a teams link to the parties to participate. (jdc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
2 2 notice Notice - Other Mon 08/05 12:12 PM
NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons as to Shenzhen Tejiali Technology Co., LTD. Filed by Gregory George. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Waiver of Service for Shenzhen Tejiali Technology Co., Ltd.,
Att: 2 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service as to Shen Zhen Shi Xin Cai Shi Xun Dian Zi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si,
Att: 3 Proposed Waiver of Service as to Shen Zhen Shi Xin Cai Shi Xun Dian Zi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si,
Att: 4 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service as to Amazon.com, Inc.,
Att: 5 Proposed Waiver of the Service as to Amazon.com, Inc.
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/05 12:05 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Amazon.com, Inc., Shen Zhen Shi Xin Cai Shi Xun Dian Zi Ke Ji You Xian Gong Si, Shenzhen Tejiali Technology Co., LTD (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6823100) filed by Gregory George.. (mmg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet