California Northern District Court
Judge:Edward M Chen
Case #: 3:24-cv-04471
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause42:11601 - International Child Abduction Remedies Act
Case Filed:Jul 24, 2024
Terminated:Nov 13, 2024
Case in other court:Georgia Northern, 1:24-cv-02752
Last checked: Monday Jan 20, 2025 12:24 AM PST
Petitioner
Casimiro Jose Canha Cavaco Dias
Represented By
Richard Min
Burger Green And Min LLP
contact info
Michael Banuchis
Green Kaminer Min & Rockmore LLP
contact info
William T. Davis
Naggiar & Sarif, LLC
contact info
Kelly J Shindell
Delacey, Riebel, Shindell, LLP
contact info
Respondent
Rula Nabil Khoury Cavaco Dias
Represented By
Aaron J. Cheung
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP
contact info
Rommy L. Flores
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Danielle Erin Hesse
Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Anthony Joseph, I
Masters Law Group, LLC
contact info
Michael Eric Manely, I
The Manely Firm, P.C.
contact info
Dina R. Khismatulina
The Manely Firm, P.C.
contact info
Thad Alan Davis
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Nicole Waddick
One Embarcadero Center
contact info
William Feldman
One Embarcadero Center
contact info
Jennifer Lynn King
Law Officve Of Jennifer L. King
contact info
Renee Richardson
The Manely Firm, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Respondent
Maggie Nabil Khoury
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Represented By
Michael Eric Manely, I
The Manely Firm, P.C.
contact info
Dina R. Khismatulina
The Manely Firm, P.C.
contact info
Jennifer Lynn King
Law Officve Of Jennifer L. King
contact info
Renee Richardson
The Manely Firm, P.C.
contact info
Respondent
Michel Nabil Khoury
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Represented By
Michael Eric Manely, I
The Manely Firm, P.C.
contact info
Dina R. Khismatulina
The Manely Firm, P.C.
contact info
Jennifer Lynn King
Law Officve Of Jennifer L. King
contact info
Renee Richardson
The Manely Firm, P.C.
contact info
Respondent
Nabil Khoury
Terminated: 08/29/2024
Represented By
Michael Eric Manely, I
The Manely Firm, P.C.
contact info
Dina R. Khismatulina
The Manely Firm, P.C.
contact info
Jennifer Lynn King
Law Officve Of Jennifer L. King
contact info
Renee Richardson
The Manely Firm, P.C.
contact info

GPO Sep 12 2024
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK'S OFFICE TO TAKE POSSESSION OF PASSPORTS (emclc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2024)
GPO Sep 20 2024
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 66 Petitioner's Motion for Access. (emclc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2024)
GPO Sep 24 2024
FURTHER ORDER RE INTERIM ACCESS AND VISITATIONre 66 MOTION Access Order filed by Casimiro Jose Canha Cavaco Dias (emclc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2024)
GPO Oct 01 2024
ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen granting in part and denying in part 109 Petitioner's Motion for Mental Examinations. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2024)
GPO Oct 16 2024
ORDER re Visitations - Phase 1. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/16/2024. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2024)
GPO Oct 18 2024
FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/18/2024. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2024)
GPO Oct 22 2024
ORDER re Visitations - Phase 2. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 10/22/2024. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2024)
GPO Mar 21 2025
ORDER re Conditional Discharge. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 3/21/2025. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2025)
GPO Apr 18 2025
ORDER re 194 Respondent's Letter of 4/17/2025. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/18/2025. (emclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2025)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
195 195 2 pgs order Order Fri 04/18 7:16 AM
ORDER re 194 Respondent's Letter of 4/17/2025. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/18/2025. (emclc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
194 194 misc Letter Thu 04/17 11:18 AM
Letter from Thad A. Davis to the Court regarding Updates to the Parties' Domestic Violence Proceedings in California Superior Court .(Davis, Thad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C