California Northern District Court
Judge:Noel Wise
Case #: 5:24-cv-04742
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 1:33 AM PST
Defendant
Criteo Corporation
Represented By
Katherine Anne Sharpless
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Michael Benjamin Sachs
Clark Hill LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sunil Ingle
Represented By
Aanand Mehtani
Mehtani Law Offices
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
33 33 notice Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney Wed 05/07 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal filed by Katherine Anne Sharpless, no longer appearing on behalf of Criteo Corporation in this case (Sharpless, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
32 32 adr ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator Tue 05/06 7:38 AM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Katherine Huibonhoa as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
31 31 misc Joint Case Management Statement Mon 03/17 3:04 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Sunil Ingle. (Sharpless, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
30 30 oth_evt Clerks Notice ADI Mon 02/24 7:29 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to the Honorable Noël Wise in the San Jose Division for all further proceedings. 1. All future filings shall bear the initials NW immediately after the case number. 2. All case management conference dates are vacated and will be reset by the Court. 3. All hearing dates presently scheduled are VACATED . However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be RENOTICED for hearing before Judge Wise by the moving party for a date consistent with the Court?s law and motion calendar, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. 4. Deadlines for ADR compliance and discovery cutoffs remain unchanged. 5. All pretrial conference and trial dates currently set for after May 27, 2025 , and all other deadlines associated with the case, will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. 6. All pretrial conference and trial dates scheduled on or before May 27, 2025 are vacated. Other pretrial deadlines ( eg. , motions in limine, pretrial statements, proposed joint trial exhibits, etc.) will remain in place. The Court will notify the parties when a status conference will be held to schedule a new pretrial conference and trial dates for affected cases. 7. Matters currently referred to a Magistrate Judge will remain before that Magistrate Judge absent further notice. 8. On or before March 17, 2025 , the parties shall file a Joint Case Management Statement (separate statements are appropriate if either party is proceeding without counsel). The statement should not exceed ten pages in length and should address all issues outlines in the [LINK:Standing Order for All Judges of the Northern District.] the approved form for such statements can be accessed [LINK:here] : a. The parties are not required to complete a section if inapplicable. As number 20, the statement shall provide the following information: (i) a list or description of each party; (ii) a summary of all claims, counter-claims, cross-claims, or third party claims and the date the complaint and cross-complaint(s) were filed; and (iii) a brief procedural history of the case (chart format welcomed) including, but not limited to, any ADR proceedings or settlement conferences that have been scheduled or concluded and any appellate proceedings that are pending or concluded. b. If the parties believe that an immediate case management conference is needed, the parties shall explain why and identify the urgent matters that require attention. If there is no immediate need, a case management conference will be scheduled or reset pursuant to Paragraph 2 of this Order as needed. 9. The Joint Case Management Statement will not constitute a motion to extend or modify dates. If emergency relief is needed to modify a deadline, and the deadline is not of the type that can be modified via stipulation of the parties without a court order, the requesting party or parties shall additionally file a motion or stipulation for such relief in compliance with Local Rule 6. IT IS SO ORDERED. Dated: 02/24/2025 FOR THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE Mark B. Busby, Clerk of Court (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/24 1:54 PM
This case is directly assigned to District Judge Noel Wise. Judge P. Casey Pitts no longer assigned to the case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (kab-adi, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Mon 02/24 1:54 PM
Hearing dates previously set before Judge P. Casey Pitts VACATED re: 30 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. (tsh, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation selecting Mediation Fri 12/20 6:40 PM
ORDER granting 28 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 12/20/2024. (nmc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Mon 12/23 8:41 AM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
28 28 2 pgs motion Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation Thu 12/19 9:20 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Criteo Corporation filed by Criteo Corporation. (Sharpless, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
27 27 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/26 3:42 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge P. Casey Pitts on 11/26/2024. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 1/25/2025. Dispositive Motion due by 12/15/2025. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/1/2026. Opening Reports due by 2/10/2026. Rebuttal Reports due by 3/10/2026. Close of Expert Discovery due by 4/10/2026. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 4/10/2026. Joint Witness List due by 4/10/2026. Joint Exhibit List due by 4/10/2026. Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2026 at 10:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 5/18/2026 at 09:30 AM. Jury Trial set for 5/18/2026, 5/19/2026, 5/20/2026, 5/22/2026, 5/26/2026, 5/27/2026, 5/29/2026, 6/1/2026, 6/2/2026 and 6/3/2026 at 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor before Judge P. Casey Pitts. (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
26 26 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 11/21 2:11 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Casey Pitts: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/21/2024 via Zoom webinar. Within 28 days, the parties shall file a stipulation selecting ADR process. If the selected ADR process is private mediation, the parties shall also identify a mediator. Scheduling Order to issue. Total Time in Court: 6 min (2:00-2:06 PM). Court Reporter: Lee-Anne Shortridge. Plaintiff Attorney: Aanand Mehtani. Defendant Attorney: Michael Sachs. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER) (Date Filed: 11/21/2024)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
25 25 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Tue 11/12 10:00 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2024 at 02:00 PM - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/pcp] Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at PCPcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 11/20/2024 at 12:00 PM PST. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Hearings Tue 11/12 9:58 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER. After reviewing the parties requests to appear remotely for the November 21, 2024 initial case management conference 20 , 22 , 23 , the Court grants the request. The case management conference will be held via Zoom videoconference at 2:00 PM and all parties shall appear remotely. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
23 23 2 pgs motion Appear by Telephone Mon 11/11 11:48 AM
First MOTION to Appear by Telephone or Other Remote Means filed by Sunil Ingle. (Mehtani, Aanand)
Related: [-]
22 22 3 pgs motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Mon 11/11 11:22 AM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Permit Remote Appearance at November 21, 2024 CMC filed by Sunil Ingle.(Mehtani, Aanand) Modified on 11/12/2024 (anj, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 07, 2024
21 21 15 pgs misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 11/07 5:39 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Mehtani, Aanand)
Related: [-]
20 20 3 pgs motion Appear by Telephone Thu 11/07 4:04 PM
MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Criteo Corporation.(Sachs, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/29 2:58 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/7/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2024 at 01:00 PM in San Jose, Courtroom 8, 4th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nmc, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 10/29 1:46 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge P. Casey Pitts for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen no longer assigned to case, except for discovery purposes. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 10/29 12:56 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 1 pgs misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 10/29 11:35 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Criteo Corporation.. (Sharpless, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
15 15 3 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Thu 10/24 1:26 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Criteo Corporation (Sharpless, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
14 14 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 10/15 4:29 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendant(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 10/29/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 10/15 3:18 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sharpless, Katherine)
Related: [-]
12 12 15 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/15 3:16 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Criteo Corporation. (Sharpless, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
11 11 3 pgs misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Wed 09/18 12:19 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Criteo Corporation. (Sharpless, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Tue 09/10 10:51 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING 11/5/24 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2024 is continued to 11/12/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Case Management Statement due by 11/5/2024. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/svk] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
9 9 1 pgs misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 09/03 3:59 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sunil Ingle.. (Mehtani, Aanand)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
8 8 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Thu 08/22 3:07 PM
2ND CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff(s) shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 9/5/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 08/22 11:07 AM
Summons Issued as to Criteo Corporation. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 3 pgs order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 08/22 11:02 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2024 09:30 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (anj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
4 4 2 pgs misc Proposed Summons Fri 08/16 1:42 PM
Proposed Summons. (Mehtani, Aanand)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Thu 08/22 10:55 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/19/2024. (kxo, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 08/05 10:09 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Sunil Ingle (Mehtani, Aanand)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 08/05 9:58 PM
Civil Cover Sheet by Sunil Ingle . (Mehtani, Aanand)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 08/05 9:56 PM
COMPLAINT against Criteo Corporation ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19694965.). Filed by Sunil Ingle. (Mehtani, Aanand)
Related: [-]