Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Sara Darrow
Referred: Ronald L Hanna
Case #: 4:24-cv-04145
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 2:19 AM CST
Defendant
Rock Island County Forest Preserve
Represented By
Joseph Anthony Giambrone
Del Galdo Law Group LLC
contact info
Kurt Austin Zimmer
Del Galdo Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Katy Kilgore
Represented By
Nathan Charles Volheim
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
contact info
Travis Phillip Lampert
Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
order Order Assigning Referral Judge Fri 04/25 11:37 AM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
21 21 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Tue 02/11 5:00 PM
ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on February 11, 2025. The Court GRANTS Defendant's20 Unopposed Motion for Entry of Agreed Confidentiality Order. (ARR)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
20 20 motion Protective Order Fri 01/31 11:32 AM
MOTION for Protective Order Unopposed Motion for Entry of Confidentiality Order by Defendant Rock Island County Forest Preserve. Responses due by 2/14/2025(Zimmer, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Proposed Agreed Confidentiality Order
Monday, December 16, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/16 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Non-Opposition re16 MOTION to Strike14 Amended Complaint (Lampert, Travis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
18 18 service Certificate of Service Thu 12/05 4:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Rock Island County Forest Preserve (Zimmer, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
17 17 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 12/02 4:33 PM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by Rock Island County Forest Preserve.(Zimmer, Kurt)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Strike Mon 12/02 4:32 PM
MOTION to Strike14 Amended Complaint by Defendant Rock Island County Forest Preserve. Responses due by 12/16/2024 (Zimmer, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 11/19 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Joseph Anthony Giambrone on behalf of Rock Island County Forest Preserve (Giambrone, Joseph)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Strike Tue 11/19 10:49 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on November 19, 2024. In light of Plaintiff's filing of the14 First Amended Complaint, Defendant's12 Partial Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss and 12(f) Motion to Strike is MOOT. Defendant must respond to the14 First Amended Complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(3). See Civil LR 7.1(E). (ARR)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 11/18 3:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rock Island County Forest Preserve, filed by Katy Kilgore.(Lampert, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Sunday, November 17, 2024
order Order Removing JEH as MJ Re DJ Hawley Apt Sun 11/17 4:02 PM
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/04 4:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Rock Island County Forest Preserve.(Zimmer, Kurt)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Strike Mon 11/04 4:54 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , MOTION to Strike1 Complaint by Defendant Rock Island County Forest Preserve. Responses due by 11/18/2024 (Zimmer, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 10/07 11:56 AM
TEXT ORDER granting11 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD re1 Complaint. Defendant Rock Island County Forest Preserve's responsive pleading is due 11/4/2024. Entered by Magistrate Judge Jonathan E. Hawley on 10/7/24. (WG)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 10/04 4:33 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Defendant Rock Island County Forest Preserve. Responses due by 10/18/2024 (Zimmer, Kurt)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Fri 10/04 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Kurt Austin Zimmer on behalf of Rock Island County Forest Preserve (Zimmer, Kurt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed (21 days to answer) Wed 09/18 10:17 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Katy Kilgore. Rock Island County Forest Preserve served on 9/11/2024, answer due 10/2/2024. (Lampert, Travis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued Tue 08/20 2:09 PM
Alias Summons Issued as to Rock Island County Forest Preserve. Returned to counsel to effect service. (RES)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 08/20 1:55 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Katy Kilgore as to Rock Island County Forest Preserve. (Lampert, Travis)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 08/19 11:15 AM
Alias Summons Issued as to Rock Island County Forest Preserve. Returned to counsel to effect service. (RES)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 18, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Sun 08/18 2:48 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Katy Kilgore as to Rock Island County Forest Preserve. (Lampert, Travis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 08/06 12:20 PM
Summons Issued as to Rock Island County Forest Preserve. Returned to Counsel to effect service. (RES)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 08/06 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Nathan Charles Volheim on behalf of Katy Kilgore (Volheim, Nathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Tue 08/06 11:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Travis Phillip Lampert on behalf of Katy Kilgore (Lampert, Travis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Attorney Complaint Tue 08/06 11:40 AM
COMPLAINT against Rock Island County Forest Preserve ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILCDC-4533870.), filed by Katy Kilgore.(Lampert, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B