New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nina R Morrison
Referred: Lara K Eshkenazi
Case #: 1:24-cv-05494
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 3:25 AM EST
Defendant
Mostafa Sadoqi
Represented By
Thomas S. D'Antonio
Hodgson Russ LLP
contact info
Defendant
St. John's University
Represented By
Barbara A. Gross
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Jennifer S Kim
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Zehra Cevher
Represented By
Olena Tatura
Akin Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles M Fortmann
Represented By
Olena Tatura
Akin Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Friday, November 01, 2024
11 11 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/01 5:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to address Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss Complaint ,10 MOTION for pre motion conference filed by Charles M Fortmann, Zehra Cevher. (Tatura, Olena)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
10 10 motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 10/25 5:58 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference by Mostafa Sadoqi. (D'Antonio, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pre Motion Conference Fri 10/25 5:02 PM
Letter MOTION for pre motion conference to address Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss Complaint by St. John's University. (Gross, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 10:12 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer S Kim on behalf of St. John's University (aty to be noticed) (Kim, Jennifer)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Barbara A. Gross on behalf of St. John's University (aty to be noticed) (Gross, Barbara)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/27 2:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles M Fortmann, Zehra Cevher. Mostafa Sadoqi waiver sent on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Tatura, Olena)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/27 2:19 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charles M Fortmann, Zehra Cevher. St. John's University waiver sent on 8/27/2024, answer due 10/28/2024. (Tatura, Olena)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 1 pgs misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Wed 08/07 9:08 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 08/07 9:08 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 08/07 9:02 AM
Summons Issued as to Mostafa Sadoqi, St. John's University. (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/07 8:31 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Nina R. Morrison and Magistrate Judge Lara K. Eshkenazi. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
1 1 67 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT against ST. John's University, Mostafa Sadoqi filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18150580 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Charles M Fortmann, Zehra Cevher. (Tatura, Olena)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A - Right to Sue for Dr Fortmann,
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit B - Right to Sue for Dr Cevher,
Att: 3 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 2 pgs Proposed Summons