New York Southern District Court
Judge:Loretta A Preska
Case #: 1:24-cv-05977
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:0794 Job Discrimination (Handicap)
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 3:32 AM EST
Defendant
Research Foundation of the City University of New York
Represented By
Christopher John Moro
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Alexia Willis
Nixon Peabody LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sonia Toure
Represented By
Jonathan Adam Bernstein
Isaacs Bernstein, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
25 25 motion Stay Mon 05/05 5:54 PM
LETTER MOTION to Stay Defendant's subpoenas addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Alexandria Jean-Pierre dated 5/5/2025. Document filed by Sonia Toure..(Jean-Pierre, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Opposing counsel Subpoenas,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Proposed Protective Order
Friday, March 07, 2025
adr Mediation Conference Not Held Fri 03/07 4:45 PM
MEDIATION CONFERENCE NOT HELD Mediation Conference scheduled for 03/07/2025 was not held. Mediation Status due by 3/24/2025.(sni)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/25 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexandria Jean-Pierre on behalf of Sonia Toure..(Jean-Pierre, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/13 4:03 PM
ORDER: As discussed at the hearing held on February 11, 2025 on Plaintiff's counsel's Order to Show Cause, Plaintiff has discharged her counsel. In accordance with New York Rule of Professional Conduct 1.16(b)(3), counsel for Plaintiff's unopposed request to withdraw (dkt. nos. 13-15) is hereby GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/13/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
21 21 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/12 2:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Following the conference with the parties held yesterday, February 11, 2025, having determined that mediation will be unlikely to resolve the instant dispute, the Court hereby permits the parties to instead proceed to discovery and adopts the following Scheduling Order in the interest of proportionality. Completing Fact Discovery 1. Document discovery shall be completed by May 9, 2025. 2. Fact depositions shall be completed by June 6, 2025. The parties have agreed that each side will be limited to one deposition, with Plaintiff's deposition to be first and Mr. Terry Huang's deposition to follow. 3. The depositions may be full-day depositions (that is, up to seven hours of testimony), and the parties may apply to the Court by letter for permission to take additional depositions. Additional depositions will only be granted on good cause shown, considering the scope of the case and what is necessary and proportional. Expert Discovery 1. The parties may apply to the Court by letter for permission to engage in expert discovery. Summary Judgment 1. The parties may submit pre-motion letters in accordance with the Court's Individual Practices no later than July 7, 2025. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 6/6/2025. Discovery due by 5/9/2025. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/12/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
23 23 misc Pro Se Consent to Receive Electronic Service Fri 02/14 11:02 AM
PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Sonia Toure consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Sonia Toure. (jjc)
Related: [-]
minutes Show Cause Hearing Tue 02/11 12:24 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Show Cause Hearing held on 2/11/2025. (mph)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
20 20 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 02/10 6:17 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:19 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Research Foundation of the City University of New York,ENDORSEMENT: The hearing scheduled for tomorrow February 11, 2025, shall begin at 12:00 p.m., instead of the previously scheduled time of 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/10/2025) ( Show Cause Hearing set for 2/11/2025 at 12:00 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (ks)
Related: [-]
19 19 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 02/10 4:50 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re:15 Order to Show Cause,,,,,. Document filed by Research Foundation of the City University of New York..(Moro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/10 4:48 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Research Foundation of the City University of New York..(Moro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
17 17 service Certificate of Service Other Wed 01/29 10:21 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause, Affirmation, Memorandum of Law served on Christopher Moro on 01/28/2025. Document filed by Sonia Toure..(Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Certificate of Service Other Wed 01/29 10:20 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause, Affirmation, Memorandum of Law served on Sonia Toure on 01/28/2025. Document filed by Sonia Toure..(Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 01/28 4:33 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon the Affirmation of Jonathan A. Bernstein, Esq., dated January 23, 2025, and the accompanying Memorandum of Law, and all the papers and proceedings had herein, it is hereby ORDERED, that the Plaintiff and Defendants show cause before this Court, at 500 Pearl Street, Room 12A, New York, New York 10007 on February 11, 2025 at 10:00a.m. or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an order should not be issued: granting Isaacs Bernstein, P.C. leave to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.4 of the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York and such other and fmther relief as the Court may deem just and proper; and it is further ORDERED, that service by email to Defendant's counsel and to Plaintiff of a copy of this Order to Show Cause, together with a copy of the papers upon which it was granted, on or before January 30, 2025 shall be deemed good and sufficient service; and it is further ORDERED, that opposing papers, if any, shall be served upon and filed with the Court on or before Feb. 10, 2025 5pm. Show Cause Hearing set for 2/11/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Show Cause Response due by 2/10/2025. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/28/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Fri 01/24 9:47 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. 13 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, was reviewed and approved as to form. (nd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
14 14 3 pgs respoth Memorandum of Law (non-motion) Thu 01/23 5:56 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW re:13 Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief, . Document filed by Sonia Toure..(Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Proposed Order to Show Cause With Emergency Relief Thu 01/23 5:51 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITH EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Sonia Toure..(Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affirmation in Support
Friday, January 03, 2025
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Fri 01/03 9:54 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 3/7/2025 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Tue 11/26 12:27 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 12/26/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
12 12 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Mon 11/04 11:35 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 11/18/2024. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 10/30 4:40 PM
ANSWER to8 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Research Foundation of the City University of New York..(Moro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/30 4:36 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Research Foundation of the City University of New York..(Moro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
9 9 misc Exhibit to Pleading Fri 09/27 3:26 PM
EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re:8 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Sonia Toure..(Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint
8 8 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/27 3:24 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Research Foundation of the City University of New York with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Sonia Toure. Related document:1 Complaint..(Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/27 10:19 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexia Willis on behalf of Research Foundation of the City University of New York..(Willis, Alexia)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/27 10:17 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Moro on behalf of Research Foundation of the City University of New York..(Moro, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
notice Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge Tue 09/03 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Ricardo to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (ar)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 08/12 10:24 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Research Foundation of the City University of New York waiver sent on 8/9/2024, answer due 10/8/2024. Document filed by Sonia Toure..(Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 08/07 10:23 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Research Foundation of the City University of New York..(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 08/07 10:18 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jonathan Adam Bernstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Wed 08/07 10:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jonathan Adam Bernstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: RESEARCH FOUNDATION OF THE CITY UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 08/07 10:21 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 08/07 10:22 AM
Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 08/07 10:22 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 08/06 4:42 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Research Foundation of the City University of New York, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Sonia Toure..(Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 08/06 4:41 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 4:40 PM
COMPLAINT against RESEARCH FOUNDATION OF THE CITY UNIVERSITY OF NEW YORK. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29713145)Document filed by Sonia Toure..(Bernstein, Jonathan)
Related: [-]