California Eastern District Court
Judge:Troy L Nunley
Case #: 2:24-cv-02118
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Terminated:Sep 03, 2024
Case in other court:Sacramento County Superior Court, 24CV0013460
Last checked: Sunday Feb 02, 2025 12:19 AM PST
Defendant
Johnathan Adler
Defendant
Equity Trust Company
Represented By
Victoria Weatherford
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pedram Granfar
Defendant
Oxford Gold Group, Inc.
Plaintiff
Dusty Stanaway
Represented By
Maria C. Severson
Aguirre & Severson, LLP
contact info
Michael Jules Aguirre
Aguirre & Severson, LLP
contact info
Joseph Patrick Sullivan, NCAED
contact info
Joseph Sullivan, NCAED
contact info


Docket last updated: 83 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
22 22 order Minute Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 09/03 11:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/3/2024: Pursuant to the Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (ECF No.21 ) and FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and fees. CASE CLOSED. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 09/03 10:45 AM
NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Dusty Stanaway. (Severson, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, August 30, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/30 3:46 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Maria C. Severson on behalf of Dusty Stanaway. Attorney Severson, Maria C. added. (Severson, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/30 3:43 PM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael Jules Aguirre on behalf of Dusty Stanaway. Attorney Aguirre, Michael Jules added. (Aguirre, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
18 18 service Certificate / Proof of Service Tue 08/27 10:26 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Equity Trust Company re14 Civil New Case Documents for TLN, 13 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case,12 Consent/Decline of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Certificate / Proof of Service Tue 08/27 10:24 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Equity Trust Company re14 Civil New Case Documents for TLN, 13 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case,12 Consent/Decline of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Certificate / Proof of Service Tue 08/27 10:21 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Equity Trust Company re14 Civil New Case Documents for TLN, 13 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case,12 Consent/Decline of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
15 15 service Certificate / Proof of Service Tue 08/20 3:30 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Equity Trust Company re14 Civil New Case Documents for TLN,12 Consent/Decline of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Civil New Case Documents for TLN Tue 08/20 2:54 PM
AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Salmeron, A)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
13 13 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Tue 08/20 2:53 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan. The new case number is: 2:24-cv-2118-TLN-SCR. (Salmeron, A)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
12 12 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Mon 08/19 4:49 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Certificate / Proof of Service Mon 08/19 8:34 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Equity Trust Company re7 Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Certificate / Proof of Service Mon 08/19 8:29 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Equity Trust Company re7 Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Certificate / Proof of Service Mon 08/19 8:23 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Equity Trust Company re7 Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
8 8 service Certificate / Proof of Service Mon 08/12 3:26 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Equity Trust Company re7 Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Mon 08/12 2:15 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
Friday, August 09, 2024
6 6 service Certificate / Proof of Service Fri 08/09 11:44 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Equity Trust Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Corporate Disclosure Statement,3 Certificate / Proof of Service. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate / Proof of Service Fri 08/09 11:42 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Equity Trust Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Corporate Disclosure Statement,3 Certificate / Proof of Service. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Certificate / Proof of Service Fri 08/09 11:37 AM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Equity Trust Company re1 Notice of Removal,2 Corporate Disclosure Statement,3 Certificate / Proof of Service. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
3 3 service Certificate / Proof of Service Tue 08/06 2:05 PM
CERTIFICATE / PROOF of SERVICE by Equity Trust Company re2 Corporate Disclosure Statement,1 Notice of Removal,. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/06 2:02 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Equity Trust Company. (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 08/06 2:00 PM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 24CV013460 by Equity Trust Company. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11675980) (Weatherford, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 29 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet