California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-02983
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 07, 2024 12:34 AM PDT
Defendant
Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (1)
Represented By
Samuel J. Pope
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Celia Gonzalez-Puga
Represented By
Michael S Pedretti
Law Offices Of Michael S. Pedretti
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Kelvin T. Chew
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/07/2024 3:03 AM PDT
Sunday, August 04, 2024
Arrest of Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (no document attached) (fjp)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
1 1 3 pgs COMPLAINT as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand.(fjp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Michael S Pedretti for Celia Gonzalez-Puga appointed. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand: Initial Appearance set for 8/5/2024 before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (no document attached) (mef)
Related: [-]
3 3 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand: Arraignment of MW Celia Gonzalez-Puga set for 8/6/2024 before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (no document attached) (mef)
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Initial Appearance as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand held on 8/5/2024. Appointed Federal Defenders for Yvette Virginia Hildebrand. Bond set as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA(or close friend). Bond due by 8/12/24 at 12:00pm. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 8/15/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Arraignment set for 9/3/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. ) (CD# 8/5/2024 DEB 24-1:4:12-5:01). (Plaintiff Attorney Allison Rogge AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Remy Bogna, Stephanie Kim FD-S/A). (aje)
Related: [-]
7 7 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (1) $15,000 P/S secured by 1 FRRA.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 8/5/2024. (cxl)
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (cxl)
Related: [-]
11 11 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Yvette Virginia Hildebrand re10 Bond. Complete bond packet due by 8/12/2024 at 12:00pm or defendant must self-surrender to the USMS (cxl)
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 8/5/24. (aje)
Related: [-]