California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-01835
Case Filed:May 09, 2024
Terminated:May 24, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 07, 2024 12:59 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
David J. Kete
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jose Maria Ruiz (1)
Terminated: 05/24/2024
Represented By
Kyra Aiyanna Sinclair
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Elizabeth M. Barros
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/07/2024 3:49 AM PDT
Monday, May 06, 2024
Arrest of Jose Maria Ruiz (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
1 1 OUT OF DISTRICT COMPLAINT as to Jose Maria Ruiz.(gac) (Main Document 1 replaced on 5/15/2024 to unseal) (jpp).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jose Maria Ruiz: Initial Appearance - ODC set for 5/9/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. (no document attached) (mef)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit: Government oral motion to unseal the case is granted. Initial Appearance - Out of District Complaint as to Jose Maria Ruiz held on 5/9/2024. Federal Defenders appointed for Jose Maria Ruiz. Bond set as to Jose Maria Ruiz (1) No Bail. Detention Hearing as to Jose Maria Ruiz held on 5/9/2024. USA oral motion for detention(Flight); motion granted as to Jose Maria Ruiz. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice pending trial. Order of detention to be filed by Court. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Removal/ID Hearing set for 5/23/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit.),(Sealed Clerk Notified) (Interpreter Dan DeCoursey). (CD# 5/9/2024 MMP 24-1:4:11-4:26). (Plaintiff Attorney David Kete AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Arshi Baig FD-S/A). (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Jose Maria Ruiz (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jose Maria Ruiz (ecf)
Related: [-]
6 6 DETENTION ORDER as to Jose Maria Ruiz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 5/9/24. (ecf)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER as to Jose Maria Ruiz: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 5/9/24. (aje)
Related: [-]
11 11 **Docketed in error - Duplicate** ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jose Maria Ruiz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 5/9/24. (ccc) Modified on 5/28/2024 (ecf).
Related: [-]