California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dale A Drozd
Referred: Sean C Riordan
Case #: 2:24-cv-02121
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 01, 2025 12:47 AM PST
Defendant
SCC Pallets, Inc.
Plaintiff
CHEP USA
Represented By
Jonathan Michael Turner
Akerman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
22 22 respm Opposition to Motion Tue 04/29 9:23 PM
OPPOSITION by CHEP USA to20 Motion for Default Judgment,.(Turner, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Jonathan M. Turner
Thursday, April 17, 2025
21 21 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 04/17 3:24 PM
MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 4/17/2025: Defendant's20 Motion for Default Judgment is noticed for a hearing date not designated for the Court's civil motion hearing calendar. On the court's own motion, the hearing on 5/27/2025 is hereby reset for 6/5/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (SCR) before Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan. (Deputy Clerk SH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
20 20 motion Default Judgment Tue 04/15 4:21 PM
MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT Set Aside by SCC Pallets, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (SCR) before Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan.(Warda, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Michael S. Warda,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Segio Colins,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, April 07, 2025
19 19 misc Status Report Mon 04/07 4:47 PM
STATUS REPORT by CHEP USA. (Turner, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
18 18 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 04/02 11:36 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 4/2/2025: The Court is in receipt of Defendant's status report (ECF No.16 ). The Court will set the following schedule: Defendant may file a motion to set aside entry of default by April 15, 2025 and shall set the motion for hearing per Local Rule 230 and Judge Riordan's Civil Standing Orders. Opposition and reply briefing on the motion will be due according to Local Rule 230. Depending on the outcome of that motion, the Court will address Plaintiff's pending motion for default judgment. (Deputy Clerk RAA)
Related: [-]
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Application for Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/02 8:55 AM
PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/1/2025 GRANTING15 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Samual Miller, PHV for CHEP USA. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Deputy Clerk AMW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
16 16 misc Status Report Tue 04/01 11:46 AM
STATUS REPORT by SCC Pallets, Inc.. (Warda, Michael)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Application for Pro Hac Vice and Proposed Order Tue 04/01 7:57 AM
PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by CHEP USA for attorney Samual Miller to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ACAEDC-12130926) (Turner, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 11:02 AM
NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Michael S. Warda on behalf of SCC Pallets, Inc.. Attorney Warda, Michael S. added. (Warda, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
13 13 minutes Motion Hearing ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Order on Motion for Default Judgment Thu 03/13 4:19 PM
MINUTES (Text Only) for MOTION HEARING held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 3/13/2025. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment (ECF No.11 ) came for hearing on March 13, 2025. Plaintiff's counsel, Jonathan Turner, present. Two officers from Defendant SCC Pallets, Inc. ("SCC") were present: Sergio Colin, CEO, and Sylvia Valdez, CFO. The Court advised that a corporation cannot appear pro se. See United States v. High Country Broad. Co., 3 F.3d 1244, 1245 (9th Cir. 1993) ("A corporation may appear in federal court only through licensed counsel."); see also E.D. Cal. Local Rule 183 ("A corporation or other entity may appear only by an attorney."). Mr. Colin and Ms. Valdez advised that they are attempting to obtain counsel and had a meeting set for next week with potential counsel. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that SCC enter an appearance through counsel and file a status report by no later than March 31, 2025 . Counsel for SCC should meet and confer with Plaintiff's counsel in advance of March 31 to determine if the parties can agree as to how the matter should proceed. The status report shall address whether SCC intends to contest the motion for default judgment, and, if so, how promptly an opposition brief may be filed. In the event the parties do not agree on how the matter should proceed, Plaintiff may file its own status report no later than April 7, 2025 . The Court will then issue an order on further proceedings. Court Reporter: ECRO. (Deputy Clerk SH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
12 12 order Minute Order Fri 03/07 8:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 3/7/2025: On the court's own motion, the hearing on 3/13/2025 re Plaintiff's11 Motion for Default Judgment is hereby RESET for the same day, 3/13/2025 at 10:00 AM, via Zoom. Zoom instructions will be sent separately. (Deputy Clerk SH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
11 11 motion Default Judgment Thu 02/06 11:10 PM
MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by CHEP USA. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (SCR) before Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan.(Turner, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mario Birsa in Support of Plaintiff Chep USAs Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jonathan M. Turner in Support of Plaintiff Chep USAs Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff Chep USA's Motion for Default Judgment
Friday, January 17, 2025
10 10 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Fri 01/17 2:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/17/2025: The parties are notified that Plaintiff's9 Motion for Default Judgment has been improperly noticed before District Court Judge Dale A. Drozd, and therefore, the 2/3/2025 hearing date is VACATED. Pursuant to Local Rule 302, this motion shall be heard before assigned Magistrate Judge, Sean C. Riordan. The filer is instructed to contact Magistrate Judge Riordan's courtroom clerk for an available hearing date and time. (Deputy Clerk PAB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
9 9 motion Default Judgment Thu 12/12 4:23 PM
MOTION for DEFAULT JUDGMENT by CHEP USA. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2025 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Turner, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mario Birsa in Support of CHEP USA's Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Declaration of Jonathan M. Turner in Support of CHEP USA's Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
8 8 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 11/27 12:16 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/27/2024: Having considered the failure of defendant to appear in this action to date, the7 clerk's entry of default, and the failure to file a joint status report for scheduling as required by the court's3 order, the court will not issue a scheduling order at this time. The initial scheduling conference currently set for 12/10/2024 is hereby VACATED, to be reset if necessary. (Buzo, P)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
7 7 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 09/20 7:40 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *SCC Pallets, Inc.* (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
6 6 misc Request for Entry of Default Fri 09/13 4:50 PM
REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to SCC Pallets, Inc. by CHEP USA. (Turner, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration
Thursday, August 15, 2024
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/15 2:42 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff CHEP USA. (Turner, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
4 4 3 pgs service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/13 7:42 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: SCC Pallets, Inc. served on 8/12/2024, answer due 9/3/2024. (Turner, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for DAD Tue 08/06 3:32 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 12/10/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Tue 08/06 3:31 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *SCC Pallets, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jonathan Michael Turner* *Akerman LLP* *633 West Fifth Street, Suite 6400* *Los Angeles, CA 90071*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
1 1 56 pgs COMPLAINT by CHEP USA. Attorney Turner, Jonathan Michael added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11672266) (Turner, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet