Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Curtis L Collier
Referred: Michael J Dumitru
Case #: 1:24-cv-00267
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Auto Negligence
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court for McMinn County, Tennessee, 23-CV-436
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 6:40 AM EST
Cross Claimant
Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By
Christopher W Sanders
Tennessee Valley Authority
contact info
David D Ayliffe
Tennessee Valley Authority
contact info
John E Pevy
Tennessee Valley Authority
contact info
Cross Defendant
Jeffrey Wade Simmons
Represented By
Bradley W Eskins
Eskins, King & Marney, P.C.
contact info
Daniel E. Brown
Eskins, King, & Marney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Jeffrey Wade Simmons
Represented By
Bradley W Eskins
Eskins, King & Marney, P.C.
contact info
Daniel E. Brown
Eskins, King, & Marney, PC
contact info
Defendant
Tennessee Valley Authority
Represented By
Christopher W Sanders
Tennessee Valley Authority
contact info
David D Ayliffe
Tennessee Valley Authority
contact info
John E Pevy
Tennessee Valley Authority
contact info
Plaintiff
Rick Self
Represented By
Jay E Kohlbusch
Law Office Of Jay E Kohlbusch
contact info
Andrew Bateman
Rogers Sauceman, PLLC
contact info

GPO Mar 21 2025
MEMORANDUM re 11 MOTION to Stay. The Court will GRANT Simmons's motion to stay the case as to himself. (Doc. 11.) The Court will also GRANT TVA's motion to stay the case in its entirety. (Doc. 18.) Accordingly, the case will be STAYED as to all parties pending the resolution of Simmons's criminal case. Simmons SHALL FILE a report on the status of his criminal case on or before April 4, 2025, and every three months thereafter, until the stay is lifted or the case is otherwise disposed of. See Memorandum for details. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/21/2025. (LCK)

Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 05/06 4:57 PM
ORDER granting 30 Joint MOTION Scheduling Conference To Reschedule from July 10, 2025 filed by Rick Self. (Scheduling Conference reset to 8/7/2025 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Curtis L Collier.) Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 5/6/2025. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
30 30 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/01 1:43 PM
Joint MOTION Scheduling Conference To Reschedule from July 10, 2025 by Rick Self. (Kohlbusch, Jay)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 04/18 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2025 03:00 PM Eastern time in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Parties must read the attached notice. (CBS)
Related: [-]
28 28 2 pgs order Order Lifting Stay Fri 04/18 3:20 PM
ORDER. The Court GRANTS Simmonss motion (Doc. 27.) The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to lift the stay. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 4/18/2025. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
27 27 notice Notice (Other) Wed 04/16 5:00 PM
NOTICE by Jeffrey Wade Simmons re26 Order on Motion to Stay,,,,,,, That the Criminal Matter has Concluded (King, Jr., James)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 03/21 9:59 AM
ORDER granting 11 Motion to Stay and 18 Motion to Stay Contingent Motion to Stay Entire Case . For the reasons set out in the accompanying Memorandum, the Court concludes that staying this case pending resolution of Simmons's criminal case is appropriate. The Court GRANTS Simmons's motion to stay the case as to himself. (Doc. 11.) The Court also GRANTS TVA's motion to stay the case in its entirety. (Doc. 18.) Accordingly, the case is STAYED as to all parties pending the resolution of Simmons's criminal case. Simmons SHALL FILE a report on the status of his criminal case on or before April 4, 2025, and every three months thereafter, until the stay is lifted or the case is otherwise disposed of. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/21/2025. (LCK)
Related: [-]
25 25 9 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Fri 03/21 9:57 AM
MEMORANDUM re 11 MOTION to Stay. The Court will GRANT Simmons's motion to stay the case as to himself. (Doc. 11.) The Court will also GRANT TVA's motion to stay the case in its entirety. (Doc. 18.) Accordingly, the case will be STAYED as to all parties pending the resolution of Simmons's criminal case. Simmons SHALL FILE a report on the status of his criminal case on or before April 4, 2025, and every three months thereafter, until the stay is lifted or the case is otherwise disposed of. See Memorandum for details. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/21/2025. (LCK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
24 24 respm Local Rule 7.1(d) Supplemental Brief Thu 03/13 2:55 PM
LOCAL RULE 7.1(d) SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF to11 MOTION to Stay by Jeffrey Wade Simmons filed by Jeffrey Wade Simmons. (Eskins, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Fri 03/07 3:35 PM
Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Christopher W Sanders terminated. (Ayliffe, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
22 22 3 pgs order Order Thu 03/06 4:52 PM
ORDER. To aid the Court in determining whether this action should be stayed, Defendant/Cross Defendant Simmons shall FILE a supplemental brief under Local Rule 7.1(d) regarding the current status of the criminal case within seven days of this Order. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 3/6/2025. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
21 21 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/18 4:30 PM
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James E. King, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Jeffrey Wade Simmons. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J Dumitru on 02/18/2025. (KRS)
Related: [-]
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Tue 02/18 8:24 AM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: 20 MOTION for James E. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Jeffrey Wade Simmons : Attorney is pending admission; no fee required. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
20 20 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/14 3:06 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Wade Simmons.(Eskins, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/07 11:35 AM
United States Magistrate Judge Mike Dumitru added per SO 25-03. Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee is no longer assigned to this case. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Thu 09/26 9:09 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Tennessee Valley Authority (Sanders, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
18 18 motion Stay Fri 09/13 10:08 AM
MOTION to Stay Contingent Motion to Stay Entire Case by Tennessee Valley Authority. (Sanders, Christopher)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Response to Motion Fri 09/13 10:00 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re11 MOTION to Stay filed by Tennessee Valley Authority. (Sanders, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 09/10 11:39 AM
ORDER: Defendant Jeffrey Wade Simmons (Simmons) filed an answer to the amended complaint on September 5, 2024. (Doc. 14.) The Courts September 4, 2024, Show Cause Order (Doc. 13) is accordingly DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/10/24. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
15 15 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/09 2:18 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re11 MOTION to Stay filed by Rick Self. (Kohlbusch, Jay)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/05 3:06 PM
ANSWER to Complaint FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jeffrey Wade Simmons.(Eskins, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 09/04 2:49 PM
ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry of this Order: (1) Simmons shall respond to the amended complaint; OR (2) Plaintiff shall move for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(a) against Simmons who has not responded to the amended complaint; OR (3) Plaintiff shall show cause why his claims against Simmons should not be dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(b). Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 9/4/2024. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
12 12 7 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support of Motion Fri 08/30 12:37 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re11 MOTION to Stay filed by Jeffrey Wade Simmons.(Eskins, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit EX 1 - AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLAINT,
Att: 2 3 pgs Exhibit EX 2 - INDICTMENT
11 11 motion Stay Fri 08/30 12:34 PM
MOTION to Stay by Jeffrey Wade Simmons. (Eskins, Bradley)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Crossclaim Fri 08/30 12:33 PM
ANSWER to8 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Jeffrey Wade Simmons.(Eskins, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Wed 08/14 1:48 PM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/14/24. (ABF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent
8 8 10 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Wed 08/14 12:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint and , CROSSCLAIM against Jeffrey Wade Simmons by Tennessee Valley Authority.(Sanders, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 11, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Sun 08/11 1:02 AM
ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Daniel E. Brown to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Jeffrey Wade Simmons. This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court. There is no document attached to this entry. You MUST register as an E-Filer here: [LINK:https://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/pscof/regWizard.jsf] . Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan K. Lee on 08/11/2024. (KRS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
misc Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements Fri 08/09 12:44 PM
Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete as to Daniel Brown regarding document: 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice DANIEL E. BROWN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE filed by Jeffrey Wade Simmons (MKM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/08 12:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice DANIEL E. BROWN TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Jeffrey Wade Simmons. (Eskins, Bradley)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Deficiency (Pro Hac) Thu 08/08 9:19 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) as to Daniel E. Brown. c/m Daniel E. Brown, Eskins, King, & Marney, PC, 200 Jefferson Ave, Suite 1510, Memphis, TN 38103. (MKM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Wed 08/07 9:12 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/7/2024. (MKM)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Wed 08/07 9:11 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/7/2024. (MKM)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Wed 08/07 9:11 AM
Order Governing Depositions Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 8/7/2024. (MKM)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 08/07 8:22 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of McMinn County, Tennessee, case number 23-CV-436. (), filed by Tennessee Valley Authority.(Sanders, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 State Court Filings,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Certificate of Filing and Service,
Att: 3 Other Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 08/07 8:54 AM
District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Susan K Lee added. (MKM)
Related: [-]