Alaska District Court
Judge:H Russel Holland
Case #: 3:24-cv-00169
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause46:1101 Violation of Maritime Regulations
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 12:29 AM AKST
Defendant
Alaskan Pearl, O.N. 1243841
Defendant
Black Pearl Fisheries LLC
Defendant
Miron I Basargin
Defendant
Black Pearl, O.N. 1209559
Plaintiff
National Loan Investors, L.P.
Represented By
Lafcadio H. Darling
Holmes Weddle & Barcott, Pc (seattle)
contact info


Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
46 46 notice Notice (Other) Tue 05/06 3:19 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal without prejudice by National Loan Investors, L.P. (Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
45 45 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 04/25 9:10 AM
ORDER re case status: Status Report due by 5/6/2025. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 4/25/25. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
44 44 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 04/22 11:47 AM
ORDER granting re40 Motion to Release Vessel from Arrest & Dismiss Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 4/22/25. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
43 43 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/22 11:34 AM
ORDER granting41 Motion for Expedited Consideration. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 4/22/25. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
42 42 misc Declaration Mon 04/21 12:33 PM
DECLARATION of Lafcadio Darling re41 MOTION for EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION re 40 Motion for Release of Vessel from Arrest & Dismiss Substitute Custodian by National Loan Investors, L.P.. (Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
41 41 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/21 12:29 PM
MOTION for EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION re 40 Motion for Release of Vessel from Arrest & Dismiss Substitute Custodian by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Expedited Consideration
40 40 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 04/21 12:20 PM
MOTION Release of Vessel from Arrest & Dismiss Substitute Custodian (EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION) by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Releasing Vessel from Arrest & Dismiss Substitute Custodian
Thursday, April 10, 2025
39 39 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/10 2:49 PM
ORDER re Case Status. The case appears ready for the entry of a default judgment and foreclosure sale proceedings. In the alternative, plaintiff will please provide the court with an updated status report on or before April 21, 2025. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 4/10/25. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
38 38 service Certificate of Service Fri 03/21 8:58 AM
U.S. Marshal's Bill of Costs as to National Loan Investors, L.P. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
37 37 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 03/03 3:49 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alaskan Pearl, O.N. 1243841, Miron I Basargin, Black Pearl Fisheries LLC. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
36 36 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Default Mon 03/03 3:45 PM
ORDER granting34 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/3/2025. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
35 35 misc Declaration Thu 02/27 8:27 AM
DECLARATION of Lafcadio Darling re34 MOTION for Entry of Default 1) Against In Personam Defendants; and 2) In Rem Against All Parties with an Interest or Claim to the Vessel That Have Not File a Claim of Interest by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -SCRACVS report,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 -Abstract of Title
34 34 motion Entry of Default Thu 02/27 8:23 AM
MOTION for Entry of Default 1) Against In Personam Defendants; and 2) In Rem Against All Parties with an Interest or Claim to the Vessel That Have Not File a Claim of Interest by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order For Default
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
33 33 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/19 10:59 AM
ORDER re Case Status. Status Report due by 3/14/2025 . See Order for details Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/19/2025. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
32 32 service Certificate of Service Wed 02/12 2:01 PM
USM 285 Process Receipt and Return: Vessel released from USMS custody as to F/V Black Pearl, O.N. 1209559 on 02/06/2025. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
31 31 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/06 12:42 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Release F/V Black Pearl from Arrest and Dismiss Substitute Custodian. See Order for details. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/5/2025. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
30 30 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 02/06 12:38 PM
ORDER granting26 Motion to Expedite Consideration. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 2/5/2025. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Affidavit Thu 02/06 12:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Publisher -Anchorage Daily News re BLACK PEARL by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Publisher's Affidavit
28 28 misc Affidavit Thu 02/06 12:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Publisher -Anchorage Daily News re ALASKAN PEARL by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Publisher's Affidavit
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
27 27 misc Declaration Wed 02/05 2:42 PM
DECLARATION of Lafcadio Darling re26 MOTION for EXPEDITE CONSIDERATION re25 MOTION Release of Vessel from Arrest & Dismiss Substitute Custodian (EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION) ,25 MOTION Release of Vessel from Arrest & Dismiss Substitute Custodian (EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION) by National Loan Investors, L.P.. (Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/05 2:40 PM
MOTION for EXPEDITE CONSIDERATION re25 MOTION Release of Vessel from Arrest & Dismiss Substitute Custodian (EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION) by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Expedited Consideration of Dkt 25 Motion
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 02/05 2:27 PM
MOTION Release of Vessel from Arrest & Dismiss Substitute Custodian (EXPEDITED CONSIDERATION) by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order to Release of Vessel from Arrest & to Dismiss Substitute Custodian
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
24 24 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 01/28 4:34 PM
AMENDED USM 285 Process Receipt and Return: Summons Returned Executed as to Miron I Basargin in his capacity as the Registered Agent of Black Pearl Fisheries, LLC. in response to Docket23 . (BJK, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/28 1:23 PM
ORDER re Return of Service. See Order for details. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
22 22 misc Affidavit Thu 01/23 3:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Publisher- Homer News Notice of Arrest and Seizure' re BLACK PEARL by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Publisher's Affidavit
21 21 misc Affidavit Thu 01/23 3:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Publisher- Homer News Notice of Arrest and Seizure' re ALASKAN PEARL by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Publisher's Affidavit
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
20 20 misc Status Report Tue 01/21 12:58 PM
STATUS REPORT re In Personam Service by National Loan Investors, L.P.. (Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
19 19 1 pgs order Order Tue 01/14 1:17 PM
ORDER re proof of service: Plaintiff will please reexamine proof of service and arrest documents for purposes of verifying that all necessary service of process has been effected. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
18 18 service Certificate of Service Mon 12/16 11:46 AM
USM 285 Process Receipt and Return: Warrant in rem served on Alaskan Pearl, O.N. 1243841 on 12/13/2024; U.S. Marshal's Bill of Costs. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Warrant Returned Mon 12/16 11:18 AM
NOTICE OF MARITIME AREST WARRANT as to Alaska Pearl, O.N. 1243841. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 12/16 11:15 AM
USM 285 Process Receipt and Return: Summons Returned Executed as to Miron I Basargin served on 12/13/2024, answer due 1/3/2025; Black Pearl Fisheries LLC (Miron I Basargin) served on 12/13/2024, answer due 1/3/2025. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
15 15 service Certificate of Service Wed 12/11 1:32 PM
USM 285 Process Receipt and Return: Warrant in rem served on Black Pearl on 12/6/2024; U.S. Marshal's Bill of Costs. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Warrant Returned Wed 12/11 1:26 PM
NOTICE OF MARITIME ARREST as to Black Pearl. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 11/13 11:04 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Continue. Service on the in personam defendants shall be effected no later than January 5, 2025. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 11/13/2024. (JDV, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
12 12 motion Continue Fri 11/08 12:35 PM
MOTION to Continue Deadline for Service and Status Report (UNOPPOSED) by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 09/26 2:21 PM
ORDER re10 Status Report. Status Report due by 11/8/2024 . See Order for details . Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 9/26/2024. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
10 10 misc Status Report Wed 09/18 12:17 PM
STATUS REPORT by National Loan Investors, L.P.. (Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 09/09 3:00 PM
ORDER re Case Status. Case Status Report due by 9/23/2024 . See Order for details. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
8 8 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian Fri 08/23 10:55 AM
ORDER granting5 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 8/23/2024. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit - Cert of Custodian
7 7 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem Fri 08/23 10:42 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 8/23/2024. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
order Warrant Issued Fri 08/23 10:46 AM
IN REM WARRANT of arrest issued as to Alaskan Pearl O.N. 1243841. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
order Warrant Issued Fri 08/23 10:48 AM
IN REM WARRANT of arrest issued as to Black Pearl, O.N. 1209559. (HJR, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
6 6 misc Declaration Thu 08/08 4:51 PM
DECLARATION of Certification of Proposed Substitute Custodian re5 MOTION to Appoint Custodian (Substitute Custodian) And For Permission To Allow Boarding And Inspection by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
5 5 motion Appoint Custodian Thu 08/08 4:46 PM
MOTION to Appoint Custodian (Substitute Custodian) And For Permission To Allow Boarding And Inspection by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Appointing Substitute Custodian And For Permission To Allow Boarding And Inspection
4 4 motion Issuance of Warrant in rem Thu 08/08 4:38 PM
MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem Plaintiff's Motion For Order Authorizing Arrest of Vessels by National Loan Investors, L.P..(Darling, Lafcadio)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 In Rem Arrest Warrant,
Att: 3 In Rem Arrest Warrant
3 3 service Unissued Summons Thu 08/08 2:10 PM
Unissued summons re Defendant M. Basargin,(LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Black Pearl
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 08/08 2:08 PM
Civil Cover Sheet (LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/08 2:07 PM
VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE PREFERRED SHIP MORTGAGE IN REM, ENFORCEMENT OF SECURITY INTEREST, AND BREACH OF CONTRACT against Alaskan Pearl, O.N. 1243841, Black Pearl Fisheries LLC (Filing fee $ 405 receipt# 100021401.), filed by National Loan Investors, L.P..(LMH, COURT STAFF, ) Modified on 8/8/2024 to add receipt number(LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 A,
Att: 2 B,
Att: 3 C,
Att: 4 D,
Att: 5 E,
Att: 6 F,
Att: 7 G,
Att: 8 H,
Att: 9 I,
Att: 10 J,
Att: 11 K,
Att: 12 L,
Att: 13 M,
Att: 14 N,
Att: 15 O,
Att: 16 P,
Att: 17 Q,
Att: 18 R,
Att: 19 S,
Att: 20 T,
Att: 21 U
service 1 - Summons Issued Thu 08/08 2:11 PM
Summons Issued as to Alaskan Pearl, O.N. 1243841, Black Pearl Fisheries LLC. (LMH, COURT STAFF, )
Related: [-]