Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Christy Criswell Wiegand
Case #: 2:24-cv-01135
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause15:5(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Terminated:Apr 14, 2025
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:32 AM EST
Defendant
NATIONAL INSPECTION SERVICES, LLC
Represented By
Sunshine R. Fellows
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Chloe C. Zidian
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
Joseph Andrew McGuire
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
contact info
Mediator
CHRISTOPHER MICHALSKI
Represented By
Christopher Michalski
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
BRYE THURLOW
Represented By
Michael A. Josephson
Josephson Dunlap Law Firm
contact info
Olivia R. Beale
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info
Joshua P. Geist
Goodrich & Geist, P.C.
contact info
William F. Goodrich
Goodrich & Geist, P.C.
contact info
Andrew W. Dunlap
Josephson Dunlap Law Firm
contact info
William M. Hogg
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info

GPO Feb 06 2025
IN PART, such that NIS may amend its existing Answer, as more fully set forth by said order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that NIS shall file its amended Answer on or before 2/7/25. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 2/6/2025. (Attachments: # (1) Notice and Consent forms) (bjw)OPINION AND ORDER re 26 Motion to Certify Class and Court-Authorized Notice by Plaintiff BRYE THURLOW and 28 Motion to Amend Answer by Defendant NATIONAL INSPECTION SERVICES, LLC. Plaintiff THURLOW's 26 Motion is hereby GRANTED IN PART, such that the Court has conditionally certified a collective action and authorized notice, and DENIED IN PART, such that the collective action is limited to three years from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the 28 Motion is GRANTED

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
51 51 notice Notice of Consent Filing Mon 05/05 6:03 PM
NOTICE of Consent Filing by BRYE THURLOW. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Forms
Thursday, May 01, 2025
50 50 notice Notice of Consent Filing Thu 05/01 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Consent Filing by BRYE THURLOW. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Consent Forms
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
49 49 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Tue 04/29 3:13 PM
Errata re Quality Control message - Caption/case number of document does not match case, by BRYE THURLOW. Reason for Correction: incorrect document attached. (Hogg, William)
Related: [-]
48 48 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Tue 04/29 12:56 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Written Consent by BRYE THURLOW (Hogg, William) Modified text on 4/29/2025, document removed from view as the case/caption do not match. (tla)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Caption/case number of doc. does not match case Tue 04/29 2:53 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re48 Notice. ERROR: Caption and Case number of document does not match the caption/case number of case. CORRECTION: Attorney is directed to file an Errata with corrected caption/and or case number. (tla)
Related: [-]