New Mexico District Court
Judge:Damian L Martinez
Referred: Magistrate Jud Gregory B Wormuth
Case #: 1:24-cv-00791
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Case in other court:Third Judicial District Court, D-307-CV-24-01623
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 3:26 AM MST
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Company
Represented By
Arturo Ricardo Garcia
Stiff & Garcia LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Patricia Carcena
Represented By
Jacobett E. Rivera
Lovett Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION for Disclosure by Liberty Mutual Company d/b/a Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Garcia, Arturo)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Company d/b/a Safeco Insurance Company of America (Garcia, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Company d/b/a Safeco Insurance Company of America from Third Judicial District Court, case number D-307-CV-2024-01623. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Liberty Mutual Company d/b/a Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Garcia, Arturo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E
Office code correction. Case office code has been changed from 1 (Albuquerque) to 2 (Las Cruces). (bc)
Related: [-]
United States Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez and United States Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth assigned. (bc)
Related: [-]