1
|
|
1
CRIMINAL COMPLAINT as to Hector Luis (1), Raymond Saez (2), Gamalier Rivera (3). (Attachment: #1 Affidavit) (mk)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re:4 Petition by United States of America for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum as to Hector Luis. ERROR: Attachments inadvertently omitted. CORRECTION: Attachments added. (mk)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Derrick W. Lefler APPEARING FOR Hector Luis (Lefler, Derrick)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
PETITION by United States of America for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum. Returnable July 10, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. as to Hector Luis (mk). (Parsons, Brian) (Modified on 7/9/2024 to add attachments) (mk)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order & Writ
|
5
|
|
5
PETITION by United States of America for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum. Returnable July 10, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. as to Raymond Saez(Parsons, Brian)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order and Writ
|
6
|
|
6
PETITION by United States of America for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum. Returnable July 10, 2024 at 8:30 a.m. as to Gamalier Rivera(Parsons, Brian)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Proposed Order and Writ
|
7
|
|
7
MOTION by United States of America for Detention Hearing as to Hector Luis. (Parsons, Brian)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
MOTION by United States of America for Detention Hearing as to Raymond Saez. (Parsons, Brian)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
ORDER granting the4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum. Returnable 7/10/2024 at 8:30 AM as to Hector Luis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/9/2024. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel) (arb)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ad PROSEQUENDUM ISSUED as to Hector Luis for 7/10/2024. 2 copies of writ issued and delivered to U. S. Marshal along with copies of9 Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum and4 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum. Returnable 7/10/2024 at 8:30 AM in Beckley. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
ORDER granting the5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum. Returnable 7/10/2024 at 8:30 AM as to Raymond Saez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/9/2024. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel) (arb)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ad PROSEQUENDUM ISSUED as to Raymond Saez for 7/10/2024. 2 copies of writ issued and delivered to U. S. Marshal along with copies of11 Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum and5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum. Returnable 7/10/2024 at 8:30 AM in Beckley. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
ORDER granting the6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum. Returnable 7/10/2024 at 8:30 AM as to Gamalier Rivera. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/9/2024. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel) (arb)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ad PROSEQUENDUM ISSUED as to Gamalier Rivera for 7/10/2024. 2 copies of writ issued and delivered to U. S. Marshal along with copies of13 Order on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum and6 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum. Returnable 7/10/2024 at 8:30 AM in Beckley. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
MOTION by United States of America for Detention Hearing as to Gamalier Rivera. (Parsons, Brian)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER TO ALL COUNSEL REGARDING BRADY OBLIGATIONS as to Raymond Saez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/10/2024. (cc: Judge, counsel of record) (mk)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER TO ALL COUNSEL REGARDING BRADY OBLIGATIONS as to Gamalier Rivera. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/10/2024. (cc: Judge, counsel of record) (ts)
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT ORDER TO ALL COUNSEL REGARDING BRADY OBLIGATIONS as to Hector Luis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/10/2024. (cc: Judge, counsel of record) (ts)
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
OATH OF COURT INTERPRETER, Ana Lahr, as to Hector Luis. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
OATH OF COURT INTERPRETER, Ana Lahr, as to Raymond Saez. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
OATH OF COURT INTERPRETER, Ana Lahr, as to Gamalier Rivera. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED in case as to Hector Luis, Raymond Saez and Gamalier Rivera. Defendants arrested on 7/10/2024. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
23
|
|
23
INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Hector Luis held by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/10/2024 in Beckley; Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
24
|
|
24
ORDER as to Hector Luis, Pursuant to the hearing held on 7/10/2024, it is noted that Derrick W. Lefler has filed a3 Notice of Appearance of Counsel, therefore, he shall appear for all future proceedings. A Preliminary Hearing is set for 7/12/2024 at 11:30 AM in Bluefield before Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. The7 MOTION by the United States for Detention Hearing is GRANTED and the Detention Hearing shall take place immediately following said Preliminary Hearing. Defendant is remanded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/10/2024. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft) (arb)
Related: [-]
|
25
|
|
25
CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Hector Luis. (tmr)
Related: [-]
|
26
|
|
26
CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Gamalier Rivera. (tmr)
Related: [-]
|
27
|
|
27
CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Raymond Saez. (btm)
Related: [-]
|
28
|
|
28
INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Raymond Saez held by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/10/2024 in Beckley; Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
29
|
|
29
ORDER as to Raymond Saez, Pursuant to the hearing held on 7/10/2024, it is ORDERED that John D. (Jody) Wooton, Jr. is appointed as permanent counsel. A Preliminary Hearing is set for 7/12/2024 at 12:00 PM in Bluefield before Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. The8 MOTION by the United States for Detention Hearing is GRANTED and the Detention Hearing shall take place immediately following said Preliminary Hearing. Defendant is remanded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/10/2024. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft) (arb)
Related: [-]
|
30
|
|
30
INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Gamalier Rivera held by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/10/2024 in Beckley; Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
31
|
|
31
ORDER as to Gamalier Rivera, Pursuant to the hearing held on 7/10/2024, it is ORDERED that G. Todd Houck is appointed as permanent counsel. A Preliminary Hearing is set for 7/12/2024 at 12:30 PM in Bluefield before Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn. The15 MOTION by the United States for Detention Hearing is GRANTED and the Detention Hearing shall take place immediately following said Preliminary Hearing. Defendant is remanded. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/10/2024. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft) (arb)
Related: [-]
|
32
|
|
32
PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Hector Luis. (Grace, Christina)
Related: [-]
|
33
|
|
33
PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Gamalier Rivera. (Grace, Christina)
Related: [-]
|
34
|
|
34
PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Raymond Saez. (Grace, Christina)
Related: [-]
|
35
|
|
35
MOTION by United States of America to Amend1 Complaint filed by United States of America as to Hector Luis, Raymond Saez (Parsons, Brian)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
PROBATION OFFICER ASSIGNMENT FOR PRETRIAL as to Raymond Luis Saez Aviles: Mark T. Ruscello (Baker, Andrew)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
PROBATION OFFICER ASSIGNMENT FOR PRETRIAL as to Hector Luis Gomez De Jesus: Mark T. Ruscello (Baker, Andrew)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
PROBATION OFFICER ASSIGNMENT FOR PRETRIAL as to Gamalier Rivera: Mark T. Ruscello (Baker, Andrew)
Related: [-]
|
36
|
|
36
OATH OF COURT INTERPRETER, Johnnie Benningfield, as to Gamalier Rivera. (tmr)
Related: [-]
|
37
|
|
37
WAIVER OF A PRELIMINARY HEARING by Gamalier Rivera. (tmr)
Related: [-]
|
38
|
|
38
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Gamalier Rivera. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/12/2024. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft) (tmr)
Related: [-]
|
39
|
|
39
APPEARANCE BOND as to Gamalier Rivera in the amount of $10,000 unsecured. (tmr)
Related: [-]
|
40
|
|
40
OATH OF COURT INTERPRETER, Johnnie Benningfield, as to Hector Luis Gomez De Jesus. (mk)
Related: [-]
|
41
|
|
41
APPEARANCE BOND as to Hector Luis Gomez De Jesus in the amount of $10,000.00 Unsecured. (mk)
Related: [-]
|
42
|
|
42
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Hector Luis Gomez De Jesus. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/12/2024. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft) (mk)
Related: [-]
|
43
|
|
43
OATH OF COURT INTERPRETER, Johnnie Benningfield, as to Raymond Luis Saez Aviles. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
44
|
|
44
WAIVER OF PRELIMINARY HEARING by Hector Luis Gomez De Jesus (mk)
Related: [-]
|
45
|
|
45
WAIVER OF A PRELIMINARY HEARING by Raymond Luis Saez Aviles. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
46
|
|
46
APPEARANCE BOND as to Raymond Luis Saez Aviles in the amount of $10,000.00, unsecured. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
47
|
|
47
ORDER SETTING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Raymond Luis Saez Aviles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/12/2024. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, deft) (arb)
Related: [-]
|
49
|
|
49
PRELIMINARY/DETENTION HEARING as to Hector Luis Gomez DeJesus, Raymond Luis Saez Aviles and Gamalier Rivera held by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/12/2024 in Bluefield; Court Reporter: CourtSmart. (arb) [1:24-mj-00060]
Related: [-]
|
50
|
|
50
WITNESS LIST by Hector Luis Gomez DeJesus, Raymond Luis Saez Aviles and Gamalier Rivera re: Preliminary/Detention Hearing held 7/12/2024. (arb) [1:24-mj-00060]
Related: [-]
|
48
|
|
48
ORDER as to Hector Luis Gomez DeJesus and Raymond Luis Saez Aviles granting the35 MOTION by the United States to Amend Complaint to modify the Defendant previously named Hector Luis to be listed as Hector Luis Gomez DeJesus, and to modify the Defendant previously named Raymond Saez to be listed as Raymond Luis Saez Aviles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/15/2024. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, defts) (arb)
Related: [-]
|
51
|
|
51
ORDER as to Hector Luis Gomez DeJesus, Raymond Luis Saez Aviles and Gamalier Rivera; Pursuant to the hearing held on 7/12/2024, it is ORDERED that the35 MOTION by the United States to Amend Complaint is GRANTED by correcting the spelling of Defendants Hector Luis Gomez DeJesus and Raymond Luis Saez Aviles' names; the Criminal Complaint is ORDERED to reflect said correction. The Court granted the United States' oral motion to amend the second code section contained in the Criminal Complaint of 59 U.S.C. § 46309 to 49 U.S.C. § 46306. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall appear for further proceedings. Defendants were released on a Ten Thousand Dollar ($10,000.00) unsecured Appearance Bond and Order Setting Conditions of Release as outlined therein. CJA Panel Attorney Derrick Lefler made an oral motion to be court-appointed to represent Defendant Hector Luis Gomez DeJesus and he is appointed as permanent counsel in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Omar J. Aboulhosn on 7/15/2024. (cc: Judge, USA, USP, USM, counsel, defts, CJA Supervising Attorney) (arb)
Related: [-]
|
52
|
|
52
WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ad PROSEQUENDUM RETURNED EXECUTED as to Hector Luis Gomez DeJesus on 7/10/2024. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
53
|
|
53
WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ad PROSEQUENDUM RETURNED EXECUTED as to Raymond Luis Saez Aviles on 7/10/2024. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
54
|
|
54
WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS ad PROSEQUENDUM RETURNED EXECUTED as to Gamalier Rivera on 7/10/2024. (arb)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
CASE as to Hector Luis Gomez DeJesus, Raymond Luis Saez Aviles, Gamalier Rivera assigned to Senior Judge David A. Faber. (klc)
Related: [-]
|
58
|
|
58
MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Employment Purposes as to Raymond Luis Saez Aviles (Wooton, John)
Related: [-]
|
59
|
|
59
INDICTMENT as to Hector Luis Gomez DeJesus (1) count 1, Raymond Luis Saez Aviles (2) count 1, Gamalier Rivera count 1. (lca)
Related: [-]
|
60
|
|
60
INDICTMENT - Unredacted Copy for Court Users Only as to Hector Luis Gomez DeJesus, Raymond Luis Saez Aviles, Gamalier Rivera. (lca)
Related: [-]
|
61
|
|
61
MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release for Employment Purposes as to Gamalier Rivera (originally filed in Magistrate Case No. 1:24-mj-00060-03 on 8/6/024). (mk)
Related: [-]
|