Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Damon R Leichty
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:24-cv-00663
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:57 AM EST
Defendant
ACA Helpline LLC
Represented By
Lisa A Messner PHV
Mac Murray & Shuster LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Arthur Lee Johnson
Represented By
Anthony I Paronich
Paronich Law PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Failure to Return Consent Form (Standard) Thu 04/10 4:47 PM
NOTICE: Counsel for Arthur Lee Johnson and Counsel for ACA Helpline LLC were directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #15 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. Counsel for Arthur Lee Johnson and Counsel for ACA Helpline LLC shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by correspondence. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
22 22 notice Notice - Other Thu 03/27 9:31 AM
NOTICE by ACA Helpline LLC of Mediator Selection (Messner PHV, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
21 21 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/19 1:54 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACA Helpline LLC. (Messner PHV, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
20 20 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 02/19 10:42 AM
ORDER: Defendant is ORDERED to file a supplement to its Corporate Disclosure Statement by 2/25/2025, to comply fully with the requirements of both Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and General Order 2023-06 as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 2/18/2025. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
19 19 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 02/14 3:36 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACA Helpline LLC. (Messner PHV, Lisa)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Scheduling Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 02/14 3:28 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court ADOPTS, in part, by reference16 . The Court now enters the instant Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order regarding the conduct of discovery and deadlines. The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 2/28/2025. The last date for the parties to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 4/4/2025. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Pla by 10/15/2025; and from Dft by 11/17/2025. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) is due every six weeks until trial. The last date for the completion of ALL DISCOVERY is 12/30/2025. The deadline to file any discovery-related nondispositive motion is 12/2/2025. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 1/30/2026. The parties shall name a mediator no later than 3/28/2025. The deadline for the parties to engage in mediation is 1/16/2026. The Court hereby VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 3/18/2025, at 10:00 a.m. EST. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 2/13/2025. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 02/14 1:12 PM
ORDER - Defendant is ORDERED to file a fully compliant corporate disclosure statement on or before February 21, 2025 in compliance with FRCP 7.1 and General Order 2023-06. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 2/13/25. (mlc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
16 16 misc Report of Rule 26f Planning Meeting Wed 02/12 2:36 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
15 15 misc Mag Consent Forms Sent - Standard with pptc - form will be generated Wed 02/05 10:42 AM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (ers)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/05 10:42 AM
ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2025 at 10:00 AM ET before Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. Joint Proposed Discovery due by 2/26/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 2/5/2025. (ers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 02/04 11:13 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by ACA Helpline LLC.(Messner PHV, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
12 12 5 pgs order Opinion and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 01/28 10:37 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS ACA Helpline's8 Motion to Dismiss and Strike Class Allegations and DISMISSES Mr. Johnson's claim for injunctive relief without prejudice and strikes from the complaint1 the language "23(b)(2) and/or" in paragraph 33. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 1/24/2025. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 10/09 1:54 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Class Allegations filed by ACA Helpline LLC. (Messner PHV, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
10 10 6 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 10/04 9:49 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Class Allegations filed by Arthur Lee Johnson. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
9 9 respm Brief in Support Thu 10/03 1:16 PM
BRIEF in Support of8 MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Class Allegations filed by ACA Helpline LLC. (Messner PHV, Lisa)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs motion Dismiss Thu 10/03 1:15 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Strike Class Allegations by Defendant ACA Helpline LLC. (Messner PHV, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 4 pgs order Order on Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 09/09 3:38 PM
ORDER granting5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lisa A Messner PHV for ACA Helpline LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 9/9/2024. (ace)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 09/06 11:11 AM
Set Deadline per6 Agreed Notice. Defendant ACA Helpline, LLC answer due by 10/4/2024. (ash)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
6 6 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Thu 09/05 1:02 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by ACA Helpline LLC ; answer due by 10/04/2024. (Messner, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
5 5 motion Attorney Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/04 12:09 PM
Application for Attorney Lisa Ann Messner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of ACA Helpline, LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5674822(Messner, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/20 11:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Arthur Lee Johnson. ACA Helpline LLC served on 8/16/2024, answer due 9/6/2024. (Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
3 3 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/14 2:16 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 08/09 8:27 AM
Summons Issued as to ACA Helpline LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kmt)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 08/09 8:26 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 08/08 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ACA Helpline LLC( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5648881.), filed by Arthur Lee Johnson.(Paronich, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons