Indiana Northern District Court
Judge:Cristal C Brisco
Referred: Scott J Frankel
Case #: 3:24-cv-00664
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:57 AM EST
Defendant
Blue Angel Escorts-Pilot Car Service, LLC
Defendant
Hiscox Inc.
Represented By
David F Cutter
Batescarey LLP
contact info
Emily R Tripicchio
Batescarey LLP
contact info
Defendant
Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.
Represented By
David F Cutter
Batescarey LLP
contact info
Emily R Tripicchio
Batescarey LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Trey Culley
Represented By
Nicholas C Deets
Hovde Dassow & Deets LLC
contact info
Tyler J Zipes
Hovde Dassow & Deets LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
36 36 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 03/20 3:32 PM
ORDER: All proceedings and deadlines in this action remain STAYED. The parties shall either file dismissal papers or a status report informing the Court on their progress toward final settlement on or before 5/9/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 3/20/2025. (rmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
35 35 misc Status Report Mon 03/10 10:25 PM
STATUS REPORT by Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. (Cutter, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
34 34 misc Status Report Fri 01/24 3:09 PM
STATUS REPORT by Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. (Cutter, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
33 33 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 01/17 12:28 PM
ORDER DENYING IN PART WITHOUT PREJUDICE32 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Private Mediation and Leave to File Surreply. GRANTING parties' request to stay these proceedings32 . All proceedings in this action are STAYED in order to allow the parties to pursue mediation. The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report advising the Court of the mediation date by 1/27/2025. The parties further are ORDERED to file a status report within 14 days of completing their mediation efforts or 3/28/2025, whichever is earlier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 1/16/2025. (mrm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
32 32 motion Stay Fri 12/27 4:19 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Private Mediation and For Leave to File Surreply in the Event Mediation Fails by Defendants Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. (Tripicchio, Emily)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
31 31 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 12/11 4:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Trey Culley. (Zipes, Tyler)
Related: [-]
30 30 respm Supplement Wed 12/11 3:56 PM
SUPPLEMENT to14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Designation of Evidence filed by Trey Culley.(Zipes, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Hiscox Privilege Log,
Att: 2 Exhibit Hiscox Underwriting Note,
Att: 3 Exhibit Coverage Analysis 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit Coverage Analysis 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit Reservation of Rights Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit Hiscox's Defense Costs
29 29 misc Response/Reply Wed 12/11 3:49 PM
REPLY by Trey Culley to23 Statement of Additional Material Facts . (Zipes, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
28 28 service Certificate of Service Affidavit of Service Wed 12/04 2:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Trey Culley re5 State Court Complaint , AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgement served on Blue Angel Escorts - Pilot Car Service on September 3, 2024, filed by Trey Culley.(Zipes, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
27 27 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 11/27 12:53 PM
ORDER: For reasons stated in the order, this court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE the24 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 11/27/2024. (kmt)
Related: [-]
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 11/27 12:16 PM
ORDER granting in part25 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs deadline to file a reply in support of his motion is extended to December 11, 2024. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 11/27/2024. (ers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 11/21 12:30 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Trey Culley. (Deets, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
24 24 motion Protective Order Fri 11/15 11:30 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc..(Cutter, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Protective Order
Thursday, November 14, 2024
23 23 respm Statement Thu 11/14 2:30 PM
STATEMENT Response to Statement of Material Facts re16 Brief in Support filed by Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. (Cutter, David)
Related: [-]
22 22 respm Response to Motion Thu 11/14 2:27 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. (Cutter, David)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 11/14 2:24 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. (Cutter, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 10/28 1:13 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for Defendants to file their reply is EXTENDED until 11/14/2024, as requested. The Court ADVISES the Defendants, through counsel, to use care to comply fully with applicable deadlines and Court rules going forward. Future extension requests that fail to meet the requirements of the rules may be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 10/25/2024. (nhc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/22 6:07 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 Response to Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. (Cutter, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/17 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David F Cutter on behalf of Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. (Cutter, David)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Response to Motion Thu 10/17 3:20 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Trey Culley. (Deets, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Brief in Support Thu 10/17 3:19 PM
BRIEF in Support of15 MOTION for Summary Judgment ,14 MOTION for Summary Judgment Designation of Evidence filed by Trey Culley. (Deets, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Summary Judgment Thu 10/17 3:17 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Trey Culley. (Deets, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Summary Judgment Thu 10/17 3:15 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Designation of Evidence by Plaintiff Trey Culley.(Deets, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Triple R Letter Re: Subject Transport, July 6, 2020,
Att: 2 Exhibit Oversize/Overweight Vehicle Permit,
Att: 3 Exhibit Michiana's Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 4 Exhibit Route Survey and Route Survey Notes,
Att: 5 Exhibit Blue Angel's Amended Responses to Plaintiff's Interrogatories,
Att: 6 Exhibit Pilot Car Escort Best Practices Guidelines,
Att: 7 Exhibit Bucket Truck Escort Agreement between Buchanan and Morphey,
Att: 8 Exhibit Plaintiff's Responses to Buchanan's Interrogatories,
Att: 9 Exhibit Coby Bain Deposition, Vol. 2 (Select Pages),
Att: 10 Exhibit Allen Martensen T.R. 30(B)(6) Deposition (Select Pages),
Att: 11 Exhibit Jamin Bates Deposition, Vol. 2 (Select Pages),
Att: 12 Exhibit Trey Culley Deposition, Vol. 1 (Select Pages),
Att: 13 Exhibit Complaint in Underlying Action,
Att: 14 Exhibit Plaintiff's Interrogatories to Blue Angel,
Att: 15 Exhibit Plaintiff's Requests for Production to Blue Angel,
Att: 16 Exhibit Blue Angel's Responses to Plaintiff's Requests for Production,
Att: 17 Exhibit Policy Declarations Page,
Att: 18 Exhibit Blue Angel Website
Thursday, September 19, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 09/19 5:41 PM
ORDER granting12 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response as to8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Response to be filed by 10/17/2024. Text entry order by Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel on 9/19/2024. (ers)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 09/18 10:01 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Plaintiff Trey Culley. (Zipes, Tyler)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/16 10:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tyler J Zipes on behalf of Trey Culley (Zipes, Tyler)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/16 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas C Deets on behalf of Trey Culley (Deets, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
9 9 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Thu 09/05 3:45 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc.. (Tripicchio, Emily)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 09/05 3:04 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc..(Tripicchio, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Underlying Lawsuit 4th Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Hiscox Policy
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
7 7 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 08/14 2:16 PM
Pursuant to General Order 2024-22 and the retirement of Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr., this case is now reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott J Frankel. (ksc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 08/13 9:00 AM
Set Deadline per6 Agreed Notice. Defendants Hiscox Inc., and Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., answer due by 9/5/2024. (ash)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
6 6 notice Agreed Notice to Extend Time to File Answer Mon 08/12 4:07 PM
AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. ; answer due by September 5, 2024. (Tripicchio, Emily)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 08/12 8:52 AM
**NEW CASE** Judge Cristal C Brisco and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (kmt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/08 12:41 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ALTHOA INC, Corporate Parent Hiscox Ltd, Corporate Parent Hiscox Holdings Inc. for Hiscox Insurance Company Inc... (Tripicchio, Emily)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/08 12:39 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hiscox Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hiscox Ltd, Corporate Parent Hiscox Holdings Inc. for Hiscox Inc... (Tripicchio, Emily)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/08 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Emily R Tripicchio on behalf of Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc. (Tripicchio, Emily)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 08/08 11:56 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5648928.) from St. Joseph County, Indiana Superior Court, Cause No. 71D04-2407-CT-000336, filed by Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., Hiscox Inc..(Tripicchio, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
Friday, July 05, 2024
5 5 cmp State Court Complaint Mon 08/12 8:51 AM
STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Blue Angel Escorts-Pilot Car Service, LLC, Hiscox Inc., Hiscox Insurance Company Inc., filed by Trey Culley in St Joseph Superior Court 71D04-2407-CT-000336.(kmt)
Related: [-]