Rhode Island District Court
Judge:Melissa R Dubose
Referred: Patricia A Sullivan
Case #: 1:24-cv-00316
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 4:55 AM EST
Defendant
Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen F. Del Sesto
Pierce Atwood LLP
contact info
Stanley F. Pupecki
Stanley F. Pupecki, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
GPI TX-A, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen P. Cooney
Higgins, Cavanagh & Cooney, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
UAG Stevens Creek II, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen P. Cooney
Higgins, Cavanagh & Cooney, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
20 20 answer Answer to Third Party Complaint Counterclaim Fri 05/09 9:57 AM
ANSWER to10 Third Party Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc. by GP Brothers Corp., Giorgi Papidze.(Matlach, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 04/15 2:02 PM
TEXT ORDER granting17 Motion for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines. Joinder of Parties due by 6/4/2025. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 4/15/2025. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
19 19 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/04 3:23 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.. (Del Sesto, Stephen)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/04 3:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.. GP Brothers Corp. waiver sent on 4/3/2025, answer due 6/2/2025. (Del Sesto, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
17 17 motion Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 04/03 4:28 PM
Assented MOTION for Extension of Scheduling Order Deadlines filed by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 4/17/2025. (Del Sesto, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
16 16 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/05 11:20 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.. (Pupecki, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
15 15 service Summons Issued Wed 02/26 3:22 PM
Summons Issued as to GP Brothers Corp., Giorgi Papidze.(Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
14 14 service Summons Request Wed 02/26 2:21 PM
Summons Request filed by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.. (Pupecki, Stanley)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Request Wed 02/26 2:20 PM
Summons Request filed by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.. (Pupecki, Stanley)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Request Wed 02/26 10:26 AM
Summons Request filed by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.. (Pupecki, Stanley) Please disregard and refer to ECF14 Modified Text on 2/26/2025 (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Request Wed 02/26 10:25 AM
Summons Request filed by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.. (Pupecki, Stanley) Please disregard and refer to ECF13 Modified Text on 2/26/2025 (Hill, Cherelle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
10 10 cmp Third Party Complaint Thu 02/20 3:11 PM
THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against GP Brothers Corp., Giorgi Papidze, filed by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Thu 02/20 3:05 PM
TEXT ORDER granting8 Motion for Leave to File Third-Party Complaint. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 2/20/2025. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order (form attached) Tue 02/04 1:16 PM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2025; Joinder of Parties due by 4/4/2025; Factual Discovery to close by 9/12/2025; Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosures shall be made by 10/14/2025; Defendant's Expert Disclosures shall be made by 11/13/2025; Expert Discovery to close by 12/13/2025; and Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2025. So Ordered by District Judge Melissa R. DuBose on 2/4/2025. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Leave to File Document Tue 02/04 10:49 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Third-Party Complaint filed by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc.. Responses due by 2/18/2025.(Del Sesto, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Third-Party Complaint
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 01/21 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stanley F. Pupecki on behalf of Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc. (Pupecki, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/17 11:37 AM
NOTICE by UAG Stevens Creek II, Inc. Proposed Joint Scheduling Order (Cooney, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 01/14 3:50 PM
TEXT ORDER: This matter is hereby transferred to the calendar of District Judge Melissa R. DuBose for all further proceedings. Senior District Judge William E. Smith no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Senior District Judge William E. Smith on 1/14/2025.(Simoncelli, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
order Order Fri 12/27 9:35 AM
TEXT ORDER: The parties are directed to file a joint proposed scheduling order for review by January 10, 2025. If the parties cannot agree on a schedule, they should reach out the judge's case manager, Nisshy Urizandi, to request a conference. So Ordered by District Judge William E. Smith on 12/27/2024. (Urizandi, Nissheneyra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 11/12 3:36 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc..(Del Sesto, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 08/20 2:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UAG Stevens Creek II, Inc.. Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc. waiver sent on 8/19/2024, answer due 10/18/2024. (Cooney, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 08/08 4:15 PM
Summons Issued as to Beacon Shipping Logistics, Inc. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Case Opening Notice (Form Attached) Thu 08/08 4:11 PM
CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Thu 08/08 2:59 PM
COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 405.00, receipt number ARIDC-2028867 ), filed by UAG STEVENS CREEK II, INC., GPI TX-A, INC. D/BA AUDI GRAPEVINE.(Cooney, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 08/08 4:10 PM
Case assigned to District Judge William E. Smith and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Gonzalez Gomez, Viviana)
Related: [-]