California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Stephanie S Christensen
Case #: 2:24-cv-06720
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 1:51 AM PST
Defendant
9021 Somerset Bellflower LLC
Defendant
Reclaimed Wood Source, LLC
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jesus Garcia
Represented By
Jason J. Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason T Yoon
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Kevin Hyunjong Hong
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info
Jason J Kim
So Cal Equal Access Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, October 10, 2024
16 16 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Thu 10/10 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by PLAINTIFF Jesus Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 09/25 10:57 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jesus Garcia, upon Defendant 9021 Somerset Bellflower LLC served on 9/23/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JOSHUA SHADPOUR, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 09/25 10:55 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Jesus Garcia, upon Defendant Reclaimed Wood Source, LLC served on 9/23/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon JOSHUA SHADPOUR, AS AGENT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
13 13 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Wed 08/28 6:09 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DECLINING Supplemental Jurisdiction and Dismissing State-Law Claims Without Prejudice by Judge Josephine L. Staton: The Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim and other state-law claims in this action, and the claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to filing in state court. (jp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
12 12 misc Response Thu 08/22 3:20 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Jesus Garciato Order to Show Cause,9 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Declaration
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
11 11 adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Wed 08/14 5:13 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (jp)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 08/14 4:24 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (cr)
Related: [-]
9 9 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 08/14 11:35 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) Order to Show Cause Re Supplemental Jurisdiction by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause, in writing, no later than ten (10) days from the date of this Order, why the Court should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's Unruh Act claim and other state-law claims. See document for further information. (jp)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 08/12 11:29 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants 9021 Somerset Bellflower LLC, Reclaimed Wood Source, LLC. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 08/12 11:25 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 08/12 11:24 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 08/12 11:24 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Stephanie S. Christensen. (lh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
4 4 notice Summons Request Thu 08/08 12:38 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Jesus Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 08/08 12:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Thu 08/08 12:37 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jesus Garcia. (Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 08/08 12:37 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37988266 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Jesus Garcia(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)
Related: [-]