North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Louise Wood Flanagan
Case #: 5:24-cv-00457
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Case in other court:Pennsylvania Eastern, 2:23-cv-04353
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 6:25 AM EST
Defendant
PAMELA C. ROUEN
Represented By
Susan Groves Renton
Law Offices Of G. Grady Richardson, Jr., P.C.
contact info
SHANE P. SIMON
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
George Grady Richardson, Jr.
Law Offices Of G. Grady Richardson, Jr., P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN
Represented By
Susan Groves Renton
Law Offices Of G. Grady Richardson, Jr., P.C.
contact info
SHANE P. SIMON
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
George Grady Richardson, Jr.
Law Offices Of G. Grady Richardson, Jr., P.C.
contact info
Defendant
DAVID L. ROUEN, III
Represented By
Susan Groves Renton
Law Offices Of G. Grady Richardson, Jr., P.C.
contact info
SHANE P. SIMON
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
George Grady Richardson, Jr.
Law Offices Of G. Grady Richardson, Jr., P.C.
contact info
Defendant
DAVID L. ROUEN, JR.
Represented By
Susan Groves Renton
Law Offices Of G. Grady Richardson, Jr., P.C.
contact info
SHANE P. SIMON
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
George Grady Richardson, Jr.
Law Offices Of G. Grady Richardson, Jr., P.C.
contact info
Defendant
SME, INC. USA
Represented By
Susan Groves Renton
Law Offices Of G. Grady Richardson, Jr., P.C.
contact info
SHANE P. SIMON
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
George Grady Richardson, Jr.
Law Offices Of G. Grady Richardson, Jr., P.C.
contact info
Defendant
SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC.
Represented By
Susan Groves Renton
Law Offices Of G. Grady Richardson, Jr., P.C.
contact info
SHANE P. SIMON
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
George Grady Richardson, Jr.
Law Offices Of G. Grady Richardson, Jr., P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
ARI FUCHS
Represented By
LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Allen L. West
Hamilton Stephens Steele And Martin PLLC
contact info
ERIK L. COCCIA
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Graham Bryce Morgan
Hamilton Stephens Steele & Martin, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
HILARY MACKLER
Represented By
LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Allen L. West
Hamilton Stephens Steele And Martin PLLC
contact info
ERIK L. COCCIA
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Graham Bryce Morgan
Hamilton Stephens Steele & Martin, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
MARSHALL MACKLER
Represented By
LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Allen L. West
Hamilton Stephens Steele And Martin PLLC
contact info
ERIK L. COCCIA
Dilworth Paxson LLP
contact info
Graham Bryce Morgan
Hamilton Stephens Steele & Martin, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, October 03, 2024
40 40 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 10/03 3:21 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by ARI FUCHS, HILARY MACKLER, MARSHALL MACKLER as to All Defendants. (Morgan, Graham)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
39 39 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 09/19 4:13 PM
ORDER granting 37 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to 34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, 34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Responses due by 10/4/2024. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/19/2024. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/18 4:01 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Allen L. West on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (West, Allen)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 09/18 3:51 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ARI FUCHS, HILARY MACKLER, MARSHALL MACKLER. (Morgan, Graham)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
36 36 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/18 3:42 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Graham Bryce Morgan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Morgan, Graham)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
35 35 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Fri 08/30 1:32 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding34 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR., SME, INC. USA, SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC.. Related [+]
Related: [-] nton, Susan
Att: 1 Declaration of G. Grady Richardson, Jr.,
Att: 2 Ex. A to Richardson Dec.,
Att: 3 Ex. B to Richardson Dec.
34 34 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 08/30 1:15 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR., SME, INC. USA, SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC.. Related [+]
Related: [-] nton, Susan
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss
Thursday, August 22, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/22 9:20 AM
ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding 7 Amended Complaint. PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR. SME, INC. USA and SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC. answer due 9/5/2024. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/20/2024. Copy sent via US mail to counsel for plaintiffs. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 08/21 3:49 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR - WRONG CASE ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, 7 Amended Complaint. PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR. SME, INC. USA and SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC. answer due 9/5/2024. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/20/2024. Copy sent via US mail to counsel for plaintiffs. (Collins, S) Modified on 8/21/2024 (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
31 31 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 08/19 2:12 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN Related [+]
Related: [-] nton, Susan
30 30 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 08/19 2:11 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by PAMELA C. ROUEN Related [+]
Related: [-] nton, Susan
29 29 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 08/19 2:10 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by DAVID L. ROUEN, III Related [+]
Related: [-] nton, Susan
28 28 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 08/19 2:09 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by DAVID L. ROUEN, JR. Related [+]
Related: [-] nton, Susan
27 27 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 08/19 2:08 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by SME, INC. USA Related [+]
Related: [-] nton, Susan
26 26 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Mon 08/19 2:07 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC. Related [+]
Related: [-] nton, Susan
25 25 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Mon 08/19 2:03 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by George Grady Richardson, Jr on behalf of PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR., SME, INC. USA, SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC. substituting for Shane P. Simon. (Richardson, George)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Mon 08/19 5:23 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 08/16 4:41 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 Amended Complaint filed by PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR., SME, INC. USA, SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC.. Related [+]
Related: [-] nton, Susan
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension
notice Notice of Deficiency - Filing is not text searchable Fri 08/16 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Filing is not text searchable. Local Civil Rule 5.1 requires that all documents submitted for filing be in a text searchable format. Counsel shall refile. (Collins, S)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 08/15 3:37 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to7 Amended Complaint filed by PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR., SME, INC. USA, SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC.. Related [+]
Related: [-] nton, Susan
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension
Monday, August 12, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/12 12:07 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Susan Groves Renton on behalf of All Defendants. Related [+]
Related: [-] nton, Susan
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/12 12:00 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by George Grady Richardson, Jr on behalf of All Defendants. (Richardson, George)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
20 20 notice Notice-other Thu 08/08 4:22 PM
Notice to Parties regarding Transfer of Case to the Eastern District of North Carolina. Counsel should read the notice in its entirety for additional information. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
19 19 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Thu 08/08 4:09 PM
Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern. Case Number 2:23-cv-04353. Transfer order and docket sheet obtained from transferring district.
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order Thu 08/08 3:08 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER (DOC. NO. 10) IS GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE CLERK OF COURT FOR THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF NORTH CAROLINA AND TO CLOSE THE CASE IN THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/8/2024. 8/8/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
17 17 16 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Thu 08/08 3:07 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 8/8/2024. 8/8/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ahf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
16 16 Audio File 07/24/2024 10:30 AM, regarding Motion Hearing held on 07/24/2024 in courtroom 12A, before DISTRICT JUDGE CYNTHIA M. RUFE (ked) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
15 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE CYNTHIA M. RUFE Motion Hearing held on 07/24/2024 (nd) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
14 14 ORDER THAT A HEARING ON DEFENDANTS'10 MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina IS HEREBY SET FOR 7/24/2024 AT 10:30 AM IN Courtroom 12A BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE CYNTHIA M. RUFE. ALL PARTIES, WITNESSES, AND COUNSEL ARE ATTACHED FOR THIS DATE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 7/16/2024. 7/16/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kp) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
13 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina or, in the alternative MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ARI FUCHS, HILARY MACKLER, MARSHALL MACKLER. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
12 12 RESPONSE in Support re10 MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina or, in the alternative MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR., SME, INC. USA, SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC.. (SIMON, SHANE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
11 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re10 MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina or, in the alternative MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ARI FUCHS, HILARY MACKLER, MARSHALL MACKLER.(RODRIGUEZ, LISA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
10 10 MOTION to Transfer to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina or, in the alternative , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR., SME, INC. USA, SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC..Memorandum of Law, Declaration of Counsel, and Certificate of Service.(SIMON, SHANE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Shane P. Simon,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Shane P. Simon,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Shane P. Simon,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
9 9 ORDER THAT THE MOTION IS GRANTED. DEFENDANTS MAY FILE A COMBINED BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THEIR FORTHCOMING MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1404(A) OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FED. RI. CIV. P. 12(B)(6) MOTION TO DISMISS THAT EXCEEDS 15 PAGES BUT THAT DOES NOT EXCEED 30 PAGES. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 1/23/24.1/24/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
8 8 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR., SME, INC. USA, SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC..Certification of Concurrence and Certificate of Service.(SIMON, SHANE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
7 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ARI FUCHS, HILARY MACKLER, MARSHALL MACKLER.(RODRIGUEZ, LISA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
6 6 NOTICE of Appearance by ERIK L. COCCIA on behalf of ARI FUCHS, HILARY MACKLER, MARSHALL MACKLER with Certificate of Service(COCCIA, ERIK) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
5 5 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEFENDANTS TIME TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING AND ESTABLISHING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 12/7/23. 12/7/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
4 4 STIPULATION Extending Defendants' Time to File Responsive Pleading and Establishing Briefing Schedule by PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR., SME, INC. USA, SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC.. (SIMON, SHANE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by SHANE P. SIMON on behalf of PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR., SME, INC. USA, SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC. (SIMON, SHANE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
2 2 Summons Issued as to PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR., SME, INC. USA, SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC. EMAILED To: COUNSEL on 11/8/23. (jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT against PAMELA C. ROUEN, ROSEMARY FURMAN ROUEN, DAVID L. ROUEN, III, DAVID L. ROUEN, JR., SME, INC. USA, SUPERIOR MEDICAL EQUIPMENT GROUP INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-17058142.), filed by ARI FUCHS, HILARY MACKLER, MARSHALL MACKLER.(RODRIGUEZ, LISA) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/8/2024.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form,
Att: 3 Case Management Form