Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Chad F Kenney
Case #: 2:24-cv-04097
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Case Filed:Aug 08, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Feb 06, 2025 5:50 AM EST
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
BEATRIZ T. SAIZ
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC
Represented By
PAUL E. HAROLD
Southbank Legal, LLC
contact info
NATHANIEL S. POLLOCK
Southbank Legal, LLC
contact info
GLEN EDWARD FROST
Frost & Associates, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
32 32 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/16 1:52 PM
ORDER AND MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE PARTIES JOINT MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. THE DEADLINE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS IS 5/27/25 AT 12:00 P.M.. MOTIONS IN LIMINE SHALL BE DUE BY 12:00 P.M. ON 7/24/25. PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM ARE DUE BY 8/7/25. A DATE CERTAIN JURY TRIAL WILL COMMENCE ON 8/25/25 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11B; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/16/25.4/16/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 04/16 1:48 PM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 7/24/2025. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 5/27/2025. PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 8/7/2025. TRIAL DATE SET FOR 8/25/2025 09:00 AM IN Courtroom 11B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY. (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
31 31 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 04/09 10:46 AM
Joint MOTION that deadline for motions for summary judgment be extended by an additional 21 days and that the scheduling order be modified so that all remaining dates are extended by 45 days re16 Scheduling Order,, filed by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC.Certificate of Service.(POLLOCK, NATHANIEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
30 30 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 04/04 1:55 PM
ORDER THAT THE FILING DEADLINE FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS BE EXTENDED FROM 12:00 P.M. ON 4/14/25 TO 12:00 P.M. ON 5/5/25; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/4/25. 4/4/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
29 29 minutes Status Conference Fri 04/04 12:45 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY Status Conference held on 4/4/25. (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
28 28 misc Status Report Thu 04/03 10:06 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC. (POLLOCK, NATHANIEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
27 27 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/02 3:32 PM
ORDER THAT THE FOLLOW UP IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 4/11/25 IS NOW RESCHEDULED TO BE HELD ON 4/4/25 AT 10:30 A.M. BY TELEPHONE; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 4/2/25. 4/2/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
26 26 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 03/24 1:32 PM
ORDER THAT THE FOLLOW UP IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 4/4/25 IS NOW RESCHEDULED TO BE HELD ON 4/11/25 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11-B; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/24/25. 3/24/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 03/20 7:59 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/4/2025 09:00 AM IN Courtroom 11B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY. (JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Fri 02/28 1:47 PM
ORDER THAT A FOLLOW UP IN PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD ON 4/4/25 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11B; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 2/28/25. 2/28/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
24 24 minutes Docket Call Wed 02/26 11:41 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY OFF THE RECORD CONFERENCE held on 2/26/25. (JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
23 23 misc Status Report Tue 02/25 8:22 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC. (POLLOCK, NATHANIEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/08 10:26 AM
ORDER OF 1/8/25 THAT THE PARTIES MUST APPEAR FOR AN IN-PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE ON WEDNESDAY, FEBRUARY 26, 2025 AT 11:00AM IN COURTROOM 11B. LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT MUST APPEAR IN PERSON. THE COURT WILL NOT PERMIT SUBSTITUTES OR VIDEO APPEARANCES. SIGNED BY JUDGE: CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/8/25. 1/8/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
21 21 misc Status Report Mon 01/06 11:40 AM
STATUS REPORT (Joint) by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (SAIZ, BEATRIZ)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order Mon 01/06 10:06 AM
ORDER THAT THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 1/7/25 AT 8:30 A.M. IS RESCHEDULED TO A DATE TO BE DETERMINED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/6/25. 1/6/25 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
misc Remark Thu 12/05 7:54 AM
PAPER #7 MAILED TO UNREP (JL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 12/05 7:52 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER ISSUED 11/12/24 IS GRANTED AND THE TRIAL SET TO BEGIN 7/7/25 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11B WILL BE A JURY TRIAL; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/4/24.12/5/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 12/05 7:49 AM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: TRIAL DATE SET FOR 7/7/2025 09:00 AM IN Courtroom 11B BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY. (JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
18 18 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 11/22 1:19 PM
MOTION Amend re16 Scheduling Order,, for Trial by Jury filed by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC.Certificate of Service.(HAROLD, PAUL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement Tue 11/12 3:30 PM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI TO CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/12/24. 11/12/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/12 10:37 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER THAT THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI FOR THE SCHEDULING OF A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. THE PARTIES SHALL ATTEND AN IN-PERSON STATUS CONFERENCE ON 1/7/25 AT 8:30 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11B. EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY 3/24/25. ANY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND DAUBERT MOTION ARE DUE BY 4/14/25 AT 12:00 P.M.. MOTIONS IN LIMINE ARE DUE BY 12:00 P.M. ON 6/9/25. PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM ARE DUE BY 6/23/25. A DATE CERTAIN NON-JURY TRIAL WILL COMMENCE ON 7/7/25 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11B; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 11/12/24. 11/12/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Tue 11/12 9:47 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY RULE 16 Pretrial Conference held on 11/12/24. Court Reporter: ESR. (JL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
14 14 misc Report Of Thu 11/07 8:35 AM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC. (POLLOCK, NATHANIEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
13 13 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge-Settlement ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 10/16 3:27 PM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE CAPTIONED CASE IS HEREBY REFERRED TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE LYNNE A. SITARSKI TO CONDUCT A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. AN ON THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (RULE 16) IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/12/24 AT 9:00 A.M. IN COURTROOM 11 B; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 10/16/24. 10/16/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/15 3:54 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(SAIZ, BEATRIZ)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
11 11 service Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Mon 08/19 11:22 AM
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (dt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/14 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL E. HAROLD on behalf of OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC (HAROLD, PAUL)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/14 12:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by NATHANIEL S. POLLOCK on behalf of OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC (POLLOCK, NATHANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/13 1:25 PM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATIONS FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF NATHANIEL S. POLLAK AND PAUL E. HAROLD ARE GRANTED; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/13/24. 8/13/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Tue 08/13 1:17 PM
ORDER THAT COUNSEL CONTEMPLATING FILING A MOTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), (E), OR (F), SHALL FIRST CONTACT OPPOSING COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THE SUBSTANCE OF THE CONTEMPLATED MOTION AND TO PROVIDE AN OPPORTUNITY TO CURE ANY ALLEGED PLEADING DEFICIENCIES OR STRIKE CERTAIN MATTER. THIS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE AT LEAST SEVEN (7) DAYS BEFORE THE FILING OF THE MOTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 8/13/24. 8/13/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
6 6 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 08/12 1:12 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Paul E. Harold by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17667325.).(FROST, GLEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 08/12 1:10 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathaniel S. Pollock by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17667310.).(FROST, GLEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, August 09, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 08/09 10:08 AM
Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: U.S. Attorney on 8/9/24 (dt)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
3 3 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 08/08 5:07 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC.(FROST, GLEN)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/08 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GLEN EDWARD FROST on behalf of OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC (FROST, GLEN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 08/08 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17662822.), filed by OSTROFF INJURY LAW PC.(FROST, GLEN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form